This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/05/2018 at 11:42:14 (UTC).

BUDGET FUNDING VS WOLCOTT

Case Summary

On 04/09/2009 BUDGET FUNDING filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against WOLCOTT. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Blythe Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0083

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BUDGET FUNDING I LLC

Defendants

ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS

JOHN WOLCOTT

TERI WOLCOTT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THE WOLF FIRM

2955 E Main Street Second Floor

Irvine, CA 92614

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DET

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000

NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER CO

NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT BY CLERK.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DET

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/09/2009 OF BUDGET FUNDING I LLC AND FILED.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ON UNLAW

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/09/2009 OF BUDGET FUNDING I LLC AS TO DEFENDANT TERI WOLCOTT FILED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF THE WOLF FIRM FILED

ORDER FOR POSTING AND MAILING

ORDER FOR POSTING AND MAILING OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED; SIGNED BY HONORABLE JUDGE SARAH A CHRISTIAN.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL A

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE BY POSTING AN

PROOF OF SERVICE BY POSTING AND MAILING OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/09/2009 OF BUDGET FUNDING I LLC AS TO JOHN WOLCOTT WITH A MAILING DATE OF 05/06/09

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT A

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/09/2009 OF BUDGET FUNDING I LLC AS TO JOHN WOLCOTT, ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS

PROOF OF SERVICE BY POSTING AN

PROOF OF SERVICE BY POSTING AND MAILING OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/09/2009 OF BUDGET FUNDING I LLC AS TO ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS WITH A MAILING DATE OF 05/06/09

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR R

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK F

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER POSSESSION FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES FILED

APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WR

APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED (FORM RI-003).

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL A

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED.

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SA

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SATISFIED; RIVERSIDE COUNTY

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2010
  • DATE TO SET OSC RE DESTRUCTION ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER CLERKS JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SATISFIED; RIVERSIDE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED (FORM RI-003).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2009
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR THE COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER POSSESSION FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2009
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/09/2009 OF BUDGET FUNDING I LLC AS TO JOHN WOLCOTT, ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS (SINGLE DEFENDANT ONLY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY POSTING AND MAILING OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/09/2009 OF BUDGET FUNDING I LLC AS TO ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS WITH A MAILING DATE OF 05/06/09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/09/2009 OF BUDGET FUNDING I LLC AS TO JOHN WOLCOTT, ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 05/01/2009
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR POSTING AND MAILING OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF THE WOLF FIRM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/09/2009 OF BUDGET FUNDING I LLC AS TO DEFENDANT TERI WOLCOTT FILED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2009
  • HEARING RE: UD OSC SET 5/26/09 AT 8:00 IN CLKB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/09/2009 OF BUDGET FUNDING I LLC AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2009
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT BY CLERK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2009
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 260 - BLYTHE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Budget Funding I, LLC is a litigant