This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 04/19/2021 at 23:56:25 (UTC).

BRISTOL vs XPERIENCE RESTAURANT GROUP

Case Summary

On 12/17/2019 BRISTOL filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against XPERIENCE RESTAURANT GROUP. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Craig Riemer. The case status is Other - Stayed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6111

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Craig Riemer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JYOJI BRISTOL

Defendants

XPERIENCE RESTAURANT GROUP

FM RESTAURANTS LLC

RM ACAPULCO RESTAURANTS LLC

ACAPULCO RESTAURANT OF ENCINITAS INC

REAL MEX RESTAURANTS INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ALLEN FLATT BALLISDIS & LESLIE

Attorney at ALLEN FLATT BALLISDIS & LESLIE

4400 Macarthur Blvd #370

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Defendant Attorneys

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

650 E Hospitality Lane #600

San Bernardino, CA 92408

Christopher Anthony McIntire

 

Court Documents

Notice of Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal After Unconditional Settlement (CRC 3.1385(b))

04/15/2021: Notice of Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal After Unconditional Settlement (CRC 3.1385(b))

Notice of Settlement of Entire Case (CM-200)

04/09/2021: Notice of Settlement of Entire Case (CM-200)

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File

03/15/2021: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File

Certificate of Mailing

03/15/2021: Certificate of Mailing

Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

03/15/2021: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing

03/11/2021: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing

Case Management Statement

03/08/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

03/05/2021: Case Management Statement

Stipulation for Protective Order

02/04/2021: Stipulation for Protective Order

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS on 1st Amended Complaint JYOJI BRISTOL

01/26/2021: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS on 1st Amended Complaint JYOJI BRISTOL

Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing (Riverside)

01/25/2021: Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing (Riverside)

Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint on 1st Amended Complaint JYOJI BRISTOL

01/25/2021: Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint on 1st Amended Complaint JYOJI BRISTOL

Certificate of Mailing

01/22/2021: Certificate of Mailing

Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

01/22/2021: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

Notice of Document Return.

01/14/2021: Notice of Document Return.

Case Management Statement

01/05/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement on 1st Amended Complaint JYOJI BRISTOL

01/05/2021: Case Management Statement on 1st Amended Complaint JYOJI BRISTOL

1st Amended Complaint JYOJI BRISTOL

12/29/2020: 1st Amended Complaint JYOJI BRISTOL

66 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing on Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal After Unconditional Settlement Pursuant to CRC 3.1385(b); Judicial Officer: Craig Riemer; Location/Courtroom: Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference Hearing (Riverside); Judicial Officer: Craig Riemer; Location/Courtroom: Department 1; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • HearingType: Order to Show Cause as to why sanctions not to exceed $1,500.00 or dismissal should not be imposed for Failure to timely file proof of service on complaint pursuant to CRC 3.110(b & f) as to ALLEN FLATT BALLISDIS & LESLIE, JYOJI BRISTOL; Judicial Officer: Craig Riemer; Location/Courtroom: Department 1; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal After Unconditional Settlement (CRC 3.1385(b))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Settlement of Entire Case (CM-200)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference Hearing (Riverside); Judicial Officer: Craig Riemer; Location/Courtroom: Department 1; Disposition: Continued Hearing Not Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • HearingType: Court on its Own Motion; Judicial Officer: Craig Riemer; Location/Courtroom: Department 1; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Certificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
64 More Docket Entries
  • 02/28/2020
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited response: answer or other first paper filed by each party other than plaintiff amount over $25,000 including UD; includes response by party to petition for relief in discovery dispute related to out-of-state case (GC70612); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 02/28/2020; Fine Description: Check #151786 Receipt No.: CV200303-0552-CK.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Jury Fee Deposit; Amount: $150.00; Paid: $150.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 02/28/2020; Fine Description: Check #151786 Receipt No.: CV200303-0553-CK.1; Paid: $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on the Complaint of BRISTOL served on XPERIENCE RESTAURANT GROUP with service date of 01/31/20 filed.(Personal Service) on Complaint of JYOJI BRISTOL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Amendment to Complaint of BRISTOL Naming Does 01 to be FM RESTAURANTS LLC filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 12/17/2019; Fine Description: Check #3703144 Receipt No.: CV191217-0374-CK.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: NOTICE OF DEPARTMENT ASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued on Complaint of BRISTOL and filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92553.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint Filed Fast Track. (Riverside)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RM Acapulco LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where REAL MEX RESTAURANTS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where XPERIENCE RESTAURANT GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCINTIRE, CHRISTOPHER A