This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/11/2018 at 19:59:40 (UTC).

BRIAN W DAVIES VS NDEX WEST LLC

Case Summary

On 10/23/2009 BRIAN W DAVIES filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against NDEX WEST LLC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Indio Larson Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0697

  • Filing Date:

    10/23/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

BRIAN W DAVIES

Indio, CA 92203

Respondents and Defendants

JAMES J SCARCELLA

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY

FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION

MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS IN

INDYMAC BANK(ONE WEST BANK)

ONE WEST BANK FSB A FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK

LENNAR HOME OF CALIFORNIA INC

NDEX WEST LLC

UNIVERSAL AMERICANMORTGAGE COMPANY OF

JAMES SCARCELLA

INDYMAC MORTGAGE SERVICES A DIVISION

OPTEUM

MERSCORP INC

UAMC LLC

LENNAR HOMES OF CALIFORNIA INC

Not Classified By Court

COURT OF APPEAL FOURTH APPELLATE DISTRICT

Riverside, CA 92501

9 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

MIDDLEBROOK KAISERHENGESBACH & DAWSON

801 E Tahquitz Canyon Way Ste 101

Palm Springs, CA 92262

BARRETT DAFFIN FRAPPIER TREDER& WEISS LLP

20955 Pathfinder Road #300

Diamond Bar, CA 91765

K & L GATES

10100 Santa Monica Boulevard S Eventh Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

TREDER & WEISS LLP

20955 Pathfinder Road Suite 300

Diamond Bar, CA 91765

Not Classified By Court Attorney

COURT OF APPEAL FOURTH DISTRICT

3389 12Th Street

Riverside, CA 92501

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - S

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - SUMMONS ISSUED.

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEP

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 2J FOR CASE MANAGEMENT PURPOSES.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FI

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 10/23/2009 OF BRIAN DAVIES AND FILED.

ORDER FOR LIS PENDENS IS GRANT

ORDER FOR LIS PENDENS IS GRANTED AND FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE RANDALL D WHITE.

NOTICE OF PENDING ACTION BY BR

NOTICE OF PENDING ACTION BY BRIAN W DAVIES FILED.

1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF BRIAN

1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF BRIAN DAVIES FILED. (AMENDED COMPLAINT - SUPERIOR COURT)

SUMMONS ISSUED ON 1ST AMENDED

SUMMONS ISSUED ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF BRIAN DAVIES AND FILED.

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONF

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE BY BRIAN W DAVIES FILED.

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT OF SUMMONS AND 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF BRIAN DAVIES AS TO UNIVERSAL AMERICANMORTGAGE COMPANY OF WITH RECEIPT DATE OF 12/18/09

NOTICE OF FILING OF AMENDED DE

NOTICE OF FILING OF AMENDED DECLARATION OF NON-MONETARY S TATUS BY NDEX WEST LLC FILED.

AMENDED DECLARATION OF NON-MON

AMENDED DECLARATION OF NON-MONETARY STATUS FILED BY NDEX WEST LLC

OBJECTIONS TO NDEX WEST LLC FI

OBJECTIONS TO NDEX WEST LLC FILING OF AMENDED DECLARATION OF NON MONETARY STATUS BY BRIAN W DAVIES FILED

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE 1ST AM

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF BRIAN DAVIES SERVED ON DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY WITH SERVICE DATE OF 01/15/10 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE 1ST AM

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF BRIAN DAVIES SERVED ON INDYMAC MORTGAGE SERVICES A DIVISION WITH SERVICE DATE OF 01/14/10 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

DEMURRER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLA

DEMURRER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF BRIAN DAVIES BY NDEX WEST LLC REPRESENTED BY TREDER & WEISS LLP FILED.

MEMO OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES I

MEMO OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF GENERAL DEMURRER BY NDEX WEST LLC.

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE 1ST AM

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF BRIAN DAVIES SERVED ON NDEX WEST LLC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 01/14/10 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

294 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2012
  • DATE TO SET OSC RE DESTRUCTION OF FILE (DISMISSAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2012
  • REFUND CHECK MAILED TO BRIAN W DAVIES DOC#1904222581, IN THE AMOUNT OF $100.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2012
  • TRUST EXONERATION - APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2011
  • APPEALS REQUEST FOR PAYMENT/DISBURSEMENT FOR RECORD ON APPEAL FORWARDED TO ACCOUNTING LAURETTA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • REMITTITUR FROM COURT OF APPEALS FILED; RULING APPEAL DISMISSED; JUSTICE CODRINGTON.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER FROM DISTRICT COURT OF APPEAL APPEAL DISMISSED AS UNTIMELY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT FOR RECORDS ON APPEAL - COPY OF DESIGNATIONS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • FILED: NOTICE OF DEFAULT RE: REPORTER DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • APPELLANT BRIAN W DAVIES'S DESIGNATION OF RECORD ON APPEAL RE: CLERKS AND REPORTERS TRANSCRIPTS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • FILED: NOTICE OF DEFAULT FOR FAILURE TO TIMELY DESIGNATE THE RECORD ON APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
491 More Docket Entries
  • 12/08/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF BRIAN DAVIES AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF BRIAN DAVIES FILED. (AMENDED COMPLAINT - SUPERIOR COURT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2009
  • NPS HEARING SET FOR 03/22/10 AT 08:30 IS VACATED -FOR THE REASON: 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2009
  • REJECTED DOCUMENT: 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT & SUMMONS SUBMITTED BY BRIAN W DAVIES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF PENDING ACTION BY BRIAN W DAVIES FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER FOR LIS PENDENS IS GRANTED AND FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE RANDALL D WHITE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 10/23/2009 OF BRIAN DAVIES AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 2J FOR CASE MANAGEMENT PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNIVERSAL AMERICAN MORTGAGE CO is a litigant

Latest cases where MERSCORP is a litigant

Latest cases where INDYMAC BANK, F.S.B. is a litigant

Latest cases where NDEX WEST LLC is a litigant