This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 12/17/2018 at 12:49:41 (UTC).

BRASHEAR VS. BANK OF AMERICA,N.A.

Case Summary

On 12/26/2012 BRASHEAR filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BANK OF AMERICA,N A. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8862

  • Filing Date:

    12/26/2012

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

FAITH LYNN BRASHEAR

Corona, CA 92882

Defendants and Respondents

MERS (MERS CORP)

INDYMAC BANK FSB

ONE WEST BANK FSB

FREDDIE MAC OR FANNIE MAE

IRS (US DEPARTMENTOF TREASURY)

FDIC (FEDERAL DEPOSIT OF INSURANCE

THE CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU

BANK OF AMERICA N A

RECONTRUST COMPANYN A

DEUTSCH ALT A SECURITIES MORTGAGE LOAN

DB STRUCTURED PRODUCTS INC

DEUTSCHE BANK SECURITIES INC

ACE SECURITIES CORP.

WELLS FARGO BANK NA

CLAYTON FIXED INCOME SERVICES INC

US BANK N A

HSBC BANK OF USA

COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS INC

FREDDIE MAC

11 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF CAMERON H TOTTEN

4000 W Magnolia Bvld, Ste G

Burbank, CA 91505

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

ALLEN, MATKINS, LECK, GAMBLE

515 S. Figueroa St, 8Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

BRYAN CAVE LLP

3161 Michelson Dr #1500

Irvine, CA 92612

Other Attorneys

COURT OF APPEALS FOURTH DISTRICT

3389 12Th Street

Riverside, CA 92501

 

Court Documents

1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF FAITH

1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF FAITH BRASHEAR FILED. (AMENDED COMPLAINT - SUPERIOR COURT)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE 1ST AM

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF FAITH BRASHEAR SERVED ON COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS INC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 01/22/13 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF MOTION FOR

PROOF OF SERVICE OF MOTION FOR INJUNCTION (PERSONAL SERVE) SERVED ON COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS SERVED 01/28/13 FILED (NON-COMPLAINT)

OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR PRELI

OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION BY BANK OF AMERICA N A, RECONTRUST COMPANYN A, DEUTSCH ALT A SECURITIES MORTGAGE LOAN, DEUTSCHE BANK SECURITIES INC, MERS (MERS CORP) FILED

DECLARATION RE NON SERVICE OF

DECLARATION RE NON SERVICE OF SUMMONS & AMENDED COMPLAINT ON DEUTSCH BANK AG FILED

1ST MEMORANDUM TO 1ST AMENDED

1ST MEMORANDUM TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY FAITH LYNN BRASHEAR

DEMURRER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLA

DEMURRER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF FAITH BRASHEAR BY INDYMAC BANK FSB, ONE WEST BANK FSB REPRESENTED BY ALLEN, MATKINS, LECK, GAMBLE FILED.

ORIGINAL CIVIL SUBPOENA FILED

ORIGINAL CIVIL SUBPOENA FILED WITH PROOF OF SERVICE AS TO RECONTRUST COMPANY, SERVED ON DATE OF 01/22/13.

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FI

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 1ST,2ND,3R

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 1ST,2ND,3RD MEMO TO 1ST AMENDED COMPL/MTN/RESP/ETC SERVED ON ONE WEST BANK FSB SERVED 04/16/13 FILED (NON-COMPLAINT)

MOTION TO/FOR STRIKE PLAINTIFF

MOTION TO/FOR STRIKE PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT BY BANK OF AMERICA NA FILED

DEMURRER TO 2ND AMENDED COMPLA

DEMURRER TO 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT OF FAITH BRASHEAR BY INDYMAC BANK FSB, ONE WEST BANK FSB REPRESENTED BY ALLEN, MATKINS, LECK, GAMBLE FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF MEMO.IN SU

PROOF OF SERVICE OF MEMO.IN SUPP.OF MTN/EXHIBITS/REQ.CONT.CMC/1ST MEMO SERVED ON ONE WEST BANK FSB (PERSONAL SERVE) SERVED 06/19/13 FILED (NON-COMPLAINT)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF MEMO.IN SU

PROOF OF SERVICE OF MEMO.IN SUPP.OF MTN/EXHIBITS/REQ.CONT.CMC/1ST MEMO SERVED ON MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC (PERSONAL) SERVED 06/19/13 FILED (NON-COMPLAINT)

REQUEST FOR STIPULATION OF CON

REQUEST FOR STIPULATION OF CONTINUANCE/ REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NO

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING.

NOTICE OF DEFAULT

NOTICE OF DEFAULT

JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL OF ONEWE

JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL OF ONEWEST BANK FSB

201 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (SUMMARY) IN THE AMOUNT OF $$840.00 BY ONE WEST BANK FSB FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • COPY(S) MADE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER FROM DISTRICT COURT OF APPEAL PET FOR REHEARING IS DENIED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2015
  • OPINION RECEIVED AND FORWARDED TO JUDGE JUDGE CRAIG G. RIEMER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF RESONDENTS BRIEF OF BANK OF AMERICA NA ON ALL PARTIES WITH A MAILING DATE OF 11/10/14 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2014
  • REGARDING B CAVE DOC#1906048962 WAS FOR $5.40 AND DOC#1906143596 WAS FOR $1.80 TOTAL OF $7.20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2014
  • TRUST EXONERATION - APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2014
  • TRUST EXONERATION - APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2014
  • REFUND CHECK MAILED TO LAW OFFICS OF C TOTTEN DOC#1906048960, IN THE AMOUNT OF $383.20.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2014
  • REFUND CHECK MAILED TO ALLEN MATKINS LECK GAMBLE DOC#1906048961, IN THE AMOUNT OF $7.20.

    Read MoreRead Less
398 More Docket Entries
  • 01/07/2013
  • CIVIL SUBPOENA ISSUED AS TO FREDDIE MAC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2013
  • EXHIBIT "H" (ADDITION TO EXHIBITS) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2013
  • NON PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET ON 2/04/13 @ 8:00 IN DEPARTMENT CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF FAITH BRASHEAR FILED. (AMENDED COMPLAINT - SUPERIOR COURT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2012
  • COMPLEX CASE DESIGNATION FEE PAID ON COMPLAINT FILED 12/26/2012 OF FAITH BRASHEAR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 12/26/2012 OF FAITH BRASHEAR FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92881.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2012
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 04 (COMPLEX CASE).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2012
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING - COMPLEX CASE SET 2/25/13 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 04.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED - COMPLEX CASE - SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less