This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/30/2018 at 14:17:15 (UTC).

BRADY VS GOMEZ

Case Summary

On 11/15/2011 BRADY filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GOMEZ. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Banning Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0385

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

KATELYNN BRADY

Defendant and Appellant

AL GOMEZ

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FO

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FOR PRO/PER REPRESENTING KATELYNN BRADY FILED.

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPE

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR AL GOMEZ BY KATELYNN BRADY FILED. HONORABLE JUDGE SAMUEL DIAZ. (SMALL CLAIMS)

SMALL CLAIMS NOTICE OF APPEAL

SMALL CLAIMS NOTICE OF APPEAL ON PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - BANNING FILED 11/15/2011 OF KATELYNN BRADY FILED BY AL GOMEZ - BANNING.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF SMALL CLAIM

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF SMALL CLAIMS JUDGMENT FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILE

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY KATELYNN BRADY IS GRANTED; HONORABLE JUDGE JAMES T WARREN (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

PROOF OF SERVICE-SMALL CLAIMS

PROOF OF SERVICE-SMALL CLAIMS ON THE PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - BANNING FILED 11/15/2011 OF KATELYNN BRADY SERVED ON AL GOMEZ WITH SERVICE DATE OF 11/15/11 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE) SERVICE FEE OF $0.00.

PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - MORE THAN

PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - MORE THAN $5000 BUT LESS THAN OR EQUAL TO $7500 BY NATURAL PERSONS ONLY FILED. (BANNING)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketDATE TO SET OSC RE DESTRUCTION OF FILE (JUDGMENT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2012
  • DocketABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2012
  • DocketFEE WAIVER FOR KATELYNN BRADY WAS GRANTED FOR ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT; $25.00 WAIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2012
  • DocketJUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAMINATION ON AL GOMEZ BY KATELYNN BRADY - SMALL CLAIMS (BANNING); Disposition: Sworn/Examined

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FOR PRO/PER REPRESENTING KATELYNN BRADY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2012
  • DocketREJECTED DOCUMENT: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS SUBMITTED BY KATELYNN BRADY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2012
  • DocketFEE WAIVER FOR KATELYNN BRADY WAS GRANTED FOR ORDER TO PRODUCE STATEMENT OF ASSETS; $40.00 WAIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2012
  • DocketJUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAMINATION SET FOR 4/16/12 AT 13:30 IN DEPT. B1 - SMALL CLAIMS (BANNING)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR AL GOMEZ BY KATELYNN BRADY FILED. HONORABLE JUDGE SAMUEL DIAZ. (SMALL CLAIMS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2012
  • DocketHEARING ON SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL FROM BANNING COURT - BANNING.; Disposition: Remanded to Municipal Court

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 12/19/2011
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS HEARING - BANNING; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2011
  • DocketINITIAL FEE WAIVER FOR KATELYNN BRADY TO BE RETURNED BY 11/17/11. (CLERK'S CALENDAR); Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2011
  • DocketFEE WAIVER FOR KATELYNN BRADY WAS GRANTED FOR PLAINTIFFS CLAIM; $75.00 WAIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY KATELYNN BRADY IS GRANTED; HONORABLE JUDGE JAMES T WARREN (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE-SMALL CLAIMS ON THE PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - BANNING FILED 11/15/2011 OF KATELYNN BRADY SERVED ON AL GOMEZ WITH SERVICE DATE OF 11/15/11 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE) SERVICE FEE OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2011
  • DocketFEE WAIVER RETURNED SET 11/17/11 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. FWBA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2011
  • DocketREQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY KATELYNN BRADY (FORM FW-001).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2011
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS HEARING SET 12/19/11, AT 13:30, IN B1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2011
  • DocketACTIVE MILITARY DUTY AS TO NONE (BANNING)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - MORE THAN $5000 BUT LESS THAN OR EQUAL TO $7500 BY NATURAL PERSONS ONLY FILED. (BANNING)

    Read MoreRead Less