This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 09/25/2021 at 02:47:02 (UTC).

BRADSTREET vs PULTE HOME CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 06/07/2019 BRADSTREET filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against PULTE HOME CORPORATION. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Sunshine Sykes and SUNSHINE S SYKES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3258

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judges

Sunshine Sykes

SUNSHINE S SYKES

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CECELIA WELLER

STEVEN DAY

BETTY MARQUES

LINDA BRADSTREET

CHARLES CARTER

LYN PATRICK

SUANNE HARRIS

JAMES HARRIS

LARRY BENDIX

JENELLE PICKETT TRUST

JUANITA CARTER

TRENE BALDERAS

LLOYD MOORE

KAREN DUNN

LINDA PHERIGO

ROBERT KINGSBURY

ELAINE GIOMETTI

CHARLES GIOMETTI

JANET MARIE OHARA

ROBERT JACKSON

11 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MILSTEIN JACKSON FAIRCHILD & WADE LLP

Attorney at MILSTEIN JACKSON FAIRCHILD & WADE LLP

10250 Constellation Blvd Suite 1400

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Other Attorneys

SOOY & SCHLIGHTING

Attorney at SOOY & SCHLIGHTING

555 West Beech Street Suite 240

San Diego, CA 92101

BRANDY PAULINE TYLER

KIMBERLY ANN BLAKE

Raymond M. Buddie

MELODY RUSSELL PENDLETON

Justin G. Reden

ERIC J LARSON

Robert Joseph Hatem

Matthew John Liedle

 

Court Documents

Answer to Cross-Complaint on Cross-Complaint of PULTE HOME CORPORATION

09/20/2021: Answer to Cross-Complaint on Cross-Complaint of PULTE HOME CORPORATION

Notice of Document Quality Assurance

09/20/2021: Notice of Document Quality Assurance

Proof of Service on Cross-Complaint of PULTE HOME CORPORATION

09/20/2021: Proof of Service on Cross-Complaint of PULTE HOME CORPORATION

Answer to Cross-Complaint on Cross-Complaint of PULTE HOME CORPORATION

09/17/2021: Answer to Cross-Complaint on Cross-Complaint of PULTE HOME CORPORATION

Homesite Services, Inc. a California Corporation's Answer to Cross-Complaint on Cross-Complaint of PULTE HOME CORPORATION

09/16/2021: Homesite Services, Inc. a California Corporation's Answer to Cross-Complaint on Cross-Complaint of PULTE HOME CORPORATION

Cal West Underground, Inc.'s Answer to Cross-Complaint on Cross-Complaint of PULTE HOME CORPORATION

09/16/2021: Cal West Underground, Inc.'s Answer to Cross-Complaint on Cross-Complaint of PULTE HOME CORPORATION

Answer to Cross-Complaint on Cross-Complaint of PULTE HOME CORPORATION

09/16/2021: Answer to Cross-Complaint on Cross-Complaint of PULTE HOME CORPORATION

Notice of Document Return.

09/16/2021: Notice of Document Return.

Notice of Document Quality Assurance

09/16/2021: Notice of Document Quality Assurance

ALCAL SPECIALTY CONTRACTING INC DBA ALCAL/ARCADE CONTRACTING INC'S ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT on Cross-Complaint of PULTE HOME CORPORATION

09/16/2021: ALCAL SPECIALTY CONTRACTING INC DBA ALCAL/ARCADE CONTRACTING INC'S ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT on Cross-Complaint of PULTE HOME CORPORATION

Proof of Service of Summons on Cross-Complaint of PULTE HOME CORPORATION

09/15/2021: Proof of Service of Summons on Cross-Complaint of PULTE HOME CORPORATION

Proof of Service on Cross-Complaint of PULTE HOME CORPORATION

09/15/2021: Proof of Service on Cross-Complaint of PULTE HOME CORPORATION

Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing - Complex Case.

09/14/2021: Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing - Complex Case.

Notice of Order to Show Cause Hearing

09/13/2021: Notice of Order to Show Cause Hearing

Certificate of Mailing

09/13/2021: Certificate of Mailing

Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

09/13/2021: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

Total Comfort Inc's Answer to Cross-Complaint on Cross-Complaint of PULTE HOME CORPORATION

09/13/2021: Total Comfort Inc's Answer to Cross-Complaint on Cross-Complaint of PULTE HOME CORPORATION

Proof of Service on Cross-Complaint of PULTE HOME CORPORATION

09/10/2021: Proof of Service on Cross-Complaint of PULTE HOME CORPORATION

132 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2021
  • HearingType: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal of Any Party Not at Issue as to SOOY & SCHLIGHTING, PULTE HOME CORPORATION; Judicial Officer: Sunshine Sykes; Location/Courtroom: Department 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference Hearing - Complex Case.; Judicial Officer: Sunshine Sykes; Location/Courtroom: Department 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request for Telephonic Appearance at Order to Show Cause and Case Management Conference; Filed By: PULTE HOME CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eSubmit (SAP 821157); Amount: $2.00; Paid: $2.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 09/21/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *0951 Receipt No.: 20210921-00379.1; Paid: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eSubmit (SAP 821157); Amount: $2.00; Paid: $2.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 09/21/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *0951 Receipt No.: 20210921-00555.1; Paid: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited response: answer or other first paper filed by each party other than plaintiff amount over $25,000 including UD; includes response by party to petition for relief in discovery dispute related to out-of-state case (GC70612); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 09/20/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *3627 Receipt No.: 20210920-00834.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited response: answer or other first paper filed by each party other than plaintiff amount over $25,000 including UD; includes response by party to petition for relief in discovery dispute related to out-of-state case (GC70612); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 09/20/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *3627 Receipt No.: 20210920-00834.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eSubmit (SAP 821157); Amount: $2.00; Paid: $2.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 09/20/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *3627 Receipt No.: 20210920-00834.1; Paid: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited response: answer or other first paper filed by each party other than plaintiff amount over $25,000 including UD; includes response by party to petition for relief in discovery dispute related to out-of-state case (GC70612); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 09/20/2021; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20210920-00271.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited response: answer or other first paper filed by each party other than plaintiff amount over $25,000 including UD; includes response by party to petition for relief in discovery dispute related to out-of-state case (GC70612); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 09/20/2021; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20210920-00268.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
236 More Docket Entries
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Case Management Statement filed by PAUL BRADSTREET, LINDA BRADSTREET, JOHN COVINGTON, BARBARA ITAGAKI COVINGTON, BENTZ DENISE L TRUST; Filed By: PAUL BRADSTREET; LINDA BRADSTREET; JOHN COVINGTON; BARBARA ITAGAKI COVINGTON; BENTZ DENISE L TRUST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Case Management Order filed; Honorable Judge Sunshine S Sykes.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 06/07/2019; Fine Description: Check #D3682863 Receipt No.: CV190607-0395-CK.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Jury Fee Deposit; Amount: $150.00; Paid: $150.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 06/07/2019; Fine Description: Check #D3682863 Receipt No.: CV190607-0405-CK.1; Paid: $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: NTC OF ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENT AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (CRC 3.722).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of posting jury fees by PAUL BRADSTREET.; Filed By: PAUL BRADSTREET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92545.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued on Complaint of BRADSTREET and filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint Filed - Complex Case. (Riverside)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Eric John Larson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BUDDIE, RAYMOND M.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BLAKE KIMBERLY A.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TYLER, BRANDY P