Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/11/2018 at 17:37:50 (UTC).

BOSMAN VS VEGGIE & TEA HOUSE

Case Summary

On 07/20/2006 BOSMAN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against VEGGIE TEA HOUSE. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Indio Larson Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0224

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2006

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indio Larson Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MATTHEW BOSMAN

Intervenor Plaintiff

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY A CALIFO

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs, Cross Defendants and Intervenor Defendants

VEGGIE & TEA HOUSE

PACIFIC CONTINENTAL INVESTMENTPARTNERS LLC

FORMOSAN FARMS

WHBA INVESTORS INC

APQ#2 LLC

CHUN NAN LO

FORMOSAN FARMS LLP

SPINELLO PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC

SUILO INVESTMENT CORPORATION

DARLING INTERNATIONAL INC

APQ#3 LLC

WHBA REAL ESTATE LIMITEDPARTNERSHIP

15 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TRUSSELL, SAMUEL

45926 Oasis St

Indio, CA 92201

Intervenor Plaintiff Attorneys

ARKO, RICHARD D

2244 Walnut Grove Avenue Suite 331

Rosemead, CA 91770

LAW OFFICES OF LISA DELORME

2244 Walnut Grove Ave 3Rd Floor

Rosemead, CA 91770

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff, Cross Defendant and Intervenor Defendant Attorneys

DOUGLAS LOPEZ & RUMM LLP

333 S. Anita Drive #780

Orange, CA 92868

EARLY MASLACH & VAN DUECK

700 South Flower Street Suite 2800

Los Angeles, CA 90017

HIGGINS HARRIS SHERMAN & ROHR

45445 Portola Ave #1

Palm Desert, CA 92260

TUCKER & ASSOCIATES

268 W Hospitality Ln Ste 202

San Bernardino, CA 92408-3271

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - S

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - SUMMONS ISSUED.

ORIGINAL SUMMONS FILED

ORIGINAL SUMMONS FILED

SUMMONS ON 1ST AMENDED CROSS C

SUMMONS ON 1ST AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT OF VEGGIE & TEA HOUSE FILED

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED 0

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED 07/20/2006 OF MATTHEW BOSMAN NAMING DOES 5 TO BE FORMOSAN FARMS FILED.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ON COMPL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ON COMPLAINT FILED 07/20/2006 OF MATTHEW BOSMAN AS TO DEFENDANT WHBA INVESTORS INC FILED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

AMENDMENT TO 1ST AMENDED CROSS

AMENDMENT TO 1ST AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT OF VEGGIE & TEA HOUSE NAMING DOES 1 TO BE PACIFIC CONTINENTALINVESTMENTPARTNERS LLC FILED.

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL BY SPINE

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL BY SPINELLO PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC FILED

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED 0

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED 07/20/2006 OF MATTHEW BOSMAN NAMING DOES 07 TO BE FORMOSAN FARMS LLP FILED.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY S

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY SPINELLO PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 3.725.

LETTER RECEIVED FROM ATTY FOR

LETTER RECEIVED FROM ATTY FOR SPINELLO PROPERTY RE: MTN TO COMPEL TO BE VACATED AND FILED

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY SOUTHERN CALIFORNIAEDISON COMPANY A CALIFO

STATEMENT (SEPARATE) IN SPPT O

STATEMENT (SEPARATE) IN SPPT OF MTN TO COMPEL FILED BY MATTHEW BOSMAN

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTO

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL-CIVIL FOR FORMOSAN FARMS BY MAY LIOU FILED

RESPONSE TO TO SEPARATE STATEM

RESPONSE TO TO SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS BY VEGGIE & TEA HOUSE FILED.

RESPONSE TO TO PLAINTIFFS OBJE

RESPONSE TO TO PLAINTIFFS OBJECTIONS TO EVIDENCE BY APQ#2 LLC, APQ#3 LLC, SPINELLO PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC FILED.

REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE T

REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO SEPARATE STAEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS BY APQ#2 LLC, APQ#3 LLC, SPINELLO PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC FILED

REPLY TO ALL OTHER PARTIES OPP

REPLY TO ALL OTHER PARTIES OPPOSITIONS TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT & SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES BY APQ#2 LLC FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED ON 1ST AMENDED

SUMMONS ISSUED ON 1ST AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT OF APQ#2 LLC AND FILED.

167 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2040
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2012
  • DATE TO SET OSC RE DESTRUCTION OF FILE (DISMISSAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2011
  • POST UNCLAIMED - JURY DEPOSIT CCP 631.3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2011
  • TRUST VOID - JURY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2011
  • HEARING ON DEFAULT COMPLAINT FILED 07/20/2006 OF MATTHEW BOSMAN AS TO CHUN NAN LO; Disposition: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2011
  • HEARING ON DEFAULT SET 8/26/11 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 2F.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2011
  • JURY TRIAL; Disposition: Hearing Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF 1ST AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT OF APQ#2 LLC FILED WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF COMPLAINT INTERVENTION FILED 11/03/2006 OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIAEDISON COMPANY A CALIFO FILED WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
309 More Docket Entries
  • 10/19/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2006
  • -- AND CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 10/19/2006 OF VEGGIE & TEA HOUSE (CROSS-COMPLAINT) SERVED ON WHBA REAL ESTATE LIMITEDPARTNERSHIP, APQ#2 LLC, APQ#3 LLC, SPINELLO PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC AND MAILED ON 10/16/06 --

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • CROSS-COMPLAINT OF VEGGIE & TEA HOUSE REPRESENTED BY MAY LIOU FILED (SUPERIOR COURT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2006
  • NON-PROOF OF SERVICE (NON-APPEARANCE) HEARING; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 07/20/2006 OF MATTHEW BOSMAN BY VEGGIE & TEA HOUSE REPRESENTED BY MAY LIOU FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 07/20/2006 OF MATTHEW BOSMAN SERVED ON VEGGIE & TEA HOUSE WITH SERVICE DATE OF 07/25/06 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 2H FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FORMOSAN FARMS is a litigant

Latest cases where VEGGIE & TEA HOUSE is a litigant

Latest cases where APQ#2 LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where SPINELLO PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC is a litigant