This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 06/24/2020 at 00:12:36 (UTC).

BOREMAN vs SCOTT

Case Summary

On 01/23/2019 BOREMAN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SCOTT. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0558

  • Filing Date:

    01/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Palm Springs Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

ALBERTI POPAJ

BRET BOREMAN

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

DAVID E SCOTT DESIGN BUILDERS

DAVID E SCOTT

DECORATORS DEPOT DIVERSIFIED INTERIORS INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

GURALNICK & GILLILAND

40004 Cook Street Suite 3

Palm Desert, CA 92211

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

ROVER ARMSTRONG

75100 Mediterranean

Palm Desert, CA 92211

LONDON FISCHER LLP

2505 Mccabe Way #100

Irvine, CA 92614

TYSON & MENDES

5661 La Jolla Blvd

La Jolla, CA 92037

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR LEAV

STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR LEAVE TO FILE CROSS COMPLAINT IS GRA; HONORABLE JUDGE KIRA L KLATCHKO.

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF CA

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT ON ALL INTERESTED PARTIES WITH A MAILING DATE OF 11/20/19 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT)

ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL ON THE

ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL ON THE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF BRET BOREMAN AS TO DEFENDANT DAVID E SCOTT DESIGN BUILDERS ADDING ATTORNEY LONDON FISCHER LLP FILED.

MINUTE ORDER: CHANGES TO CASE

MINUTE ORDER: CHANGES TO CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 9/4/19

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY BRET BOREMAN, ALBERTI POPAJ

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DECORATORS DEPOT DIVERSIFIED INTERIORS INC

MINUTE ORDER: CHANGE TO CASE M

MINUTE ORDER: CHANGE TO CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON 7/23/19

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAIN

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF BRET BOREMAN BY DECORATORS DEPOT DIVERSIFIED INTERIORS INC REPRESENTED BY TYSON & MENDES FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAIN

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF BRET BOREMAN BY DAVID E SCOTT DESIGN BUILDERS REPRESENTED BY ROVER ARMSTRONG FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAIN

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF BRET BOREMAN BY DAVID E SCOTT REPRESENTED BY ROVER ARMSTRONG FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION TO STR

NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION TO STRIKE EXEMPLARY DAMAGES OFF CALENDAR BY DECORATORS DEPOT DIVERSIFIED INTERIORS INC FILED.

FILED: PLAINTIFFS DEMAND FOR T

FILED: PLAINTIFFS DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY AND NOTICE OF JURY FEE DEPOSIT

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF DECORATORS

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF DECORATORS DEPOT DIVERSIFIED INTERIORS INC REPRESENTED BY ROVER ARMSTRONG FILED (SUPERIOR COURT)

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 01/23/2019 OF BRET BOREMAN AS TO DAVID E SCOTT DESIGN BUILDERS; MAILING DATE OF 01/31/19 FILED.

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEP

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT PS1. (PALM SPRINGS)

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CA

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING.

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 01/23/2019 OF BRET BOREMAN AS TO DECORATORS DEPOT DIVERSIFIED INTERIORS INC; MAILING DATE OF 01/28/19 FILED.

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (P

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (PALM SPRINGS)

39 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2020
  • HearingDept: PS1; Action text: TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketTRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketTRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketRETURNED DOCUMENT: STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 06/22/20 SUBMITTED BY DAVID E SCOTT, DECORATORS DEPOT DIVERSIFIED INTERIORS INC, DAVID E SCOTT DESIGN BUILDERS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION AND ORDER FOR LEAVE TO FILE CROSS COMPLAINT IS GRA; HONORABLE JUDGE KIRA L KLATCHKO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE FOR HEARING RE: TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE ON 06/22/20 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT PS1.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketTRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Continued Not Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • DocketSTIPULATION AND ORDER FEE PAID BY DAVID E SCOTT, DECORATORS DEPOT DIVERSIFIED INTERIORS INC, DAVID E SCOTT DESIGN BUILDERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketCOURT ON ITS OWN MOTION: CHANGES TO TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE SET ON 3/20/20; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketCOURT ON ITS OWN MOTION SET ON 3/18/20 AT 8:00 IN DEPARTMENT PS1

    Read MoreRead Less
85 More Docket Entries
  • 03/04/2019
  • Docket-- AND CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 03/04/2019 OF DECORATORS DEPOT DIVERSIFIED INTERIORS INC (CROSS-COMPLAINT) SERVED ON BRET BOREMAN, ALBERTI POPAJ AND MAILED ON 03/04/19 --

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 01/23/2019 OF BRET BOREMAN AS TO DAVID E SCOTT; MAILING DATE OF 01/31/19 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 01/23/2019 OF BRET BOREMAN AS TO DAVID E SCOTT DESIGN BUILDERS; MAILING DATE OF 01/31/19 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 01/23/2019 OF BRET BOREMAN AS TO DECORATORS DEPOT DIVERSIFIED INTERIORS INC; MAILING DATE OF 01/28/19 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (PALM SPRINGS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT PS1. (PALM SPRINGS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92270.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • DocketNON-PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 3/25/19 AT 8:30 IN DEPT CLKP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 01/23/2019 OF BRET BOREMAN AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less