This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/25/2016 at 15:34:10 (UTC).

BOCKMAN VS BOCKMAN

Case Summary

On 01/15/2003 BOCKMAN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BOCKMAN. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****7597

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2003

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Respondents, Defendants, Plaintiffs, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

3 DAY BLINDS INC

KPI ULTRASOUND INC.

JEFF BOCKMAN

RICHARD D BOCKMAN

BOCKMAN WINDOW COVERING INSTALLATION

Riverside, CA 92504

KCI COMPANIES

JEFFREY ALLAN BOCKMAN

Plaintiff, Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Appellant

KPI ULTRASOUND INC.

Not Classified By Court

COURT OF APPEAL FOURTH APPELLATE DISTRICT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent, Plaintiff, Cross Defendant and Appellant Attorneys

BRAGG,SEROTA & KULUVA

610 W. Ash St. Suite 1105

San Diego, CA 92101

LAW OFFICES OF HARVEY W WIMER

P.O. Box 1548

Riverside, CA 92502

MANLY & MCGUIRE

555 Anton Blvd Ste 1200

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

REID & HELLYER

3880 Lemon Street Fifth Floor P O Box 1300

Riverside, CA 92502-1300

MANLY, MCGUIRE & STEWART

4220 Von Karman Avenue Suite 200

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Defendant, Plaintiff, Cross Plaintiff and Appellant Attorney

REID & HELLYER

3880 Lemon Street Fifth Floor P O Box 1300

Riverside, CA 92502-1300

Respondent, Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

BRAGG, SEROTA & KULUVA

3090 Bristol Street Suite 640

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

LAW OFFICES OF HARVEY W WIMER

P.O. Box 1548

Riverside, CA 92502

HUGHES, E AURORA

9333 Baseline Rd Suite 100 Forecast Professional Center

Rancho Cucamonga, CA 91730

REID & HELLYER

3880 Lemon Street Fifth Floor P O Box 1300

Riverside, CA 92502-1300

GRAVES & KING LLP

30448 Rancho Viejo Road Suite 200

San Juan Capistrano, CA 92675

Respondent, Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

BRAGG,SEROTA & KULUVA

610 W. Ash St. Suite 1105

San Diego, CA 92101

BRAGG, SEROTA & KULUVA

3090 Bristol Street Suite 640

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

LAW OFFICES OF HARVEY W WIMER

P.O. Box 1548

Riverside, CA 92502

HUGHES, E AURORA

9333 Baseline Rd Suite 100 Forecast Professional Center

Rancho Cucamonga, CA 91730

MANLY & MCGUIRE

555 Anton Blvd Ste 1200

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

GRAVE & KING

P.O. Box 1548

Riverside, CA 92502

Respondent, Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Appellant Attorneys

BRAGG, SEROTA & KULUVA

3090 Bristol Street Suite 640

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

REID & HELLYER

3880 Lemon Street Fifth Floor P O Box 1300

Riverside, CA 92502-1300

Not Classified By Court Attorney

COURT OF APPEALS FOURTH DISTRICT

3389 12Th Street

Riverside, CA 92501

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 01/15/2003 OF RICHARD BOCKMAN SERVED ON KPI ULTRASOUND INC. WITH SERVICE DATE OF 01/28/03 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

ORDER OF THE COURT HEARING ON

ORDER OF THE COURT HEARING ON 12/03/03 FILED.

ORDER ON GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

ORDER ON GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED REGARDING COMPLAINT FILED 01/15/2003 OF RICHARD BOCKMAN AND 3 DAY BLINDS INC.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (SUMMARY)

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (SUMMARY) IN THE AMOUNT OF $$1234.00 BY KPI ULTRASOUND INC. FILED.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY 3

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY 3 DAY BLINDS INC FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 212(G)(1)

ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL ON THE

ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 01/15/2003 OF RICHARD BOCKMAN AS TO DEFENDANT JEFF BOCKMAN ADDING ATTORNEY GRAVE & KING FILED.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY 3 DAY BLINDS INC

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ON THE 1ST AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT OF KPI ULTRASOUND INC. AS TO JEFF BOCKMAN FILED.

EX PARTE APPLICATION RE: ORDER

EX PARTE APPLICATION RE: ORDER TEMPORARILY STAYING TRANSFER OF PLAINTIFF

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 03/07/2003 OF 3 DAY BLINDS INC BY 3 DAY BLINDS INC FILED

SEPARATELY BOUND INDEX OF EXHI

SEPARATELY BOUND INDEX OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED

MEMO OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES I

MEMO OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF/TO OPPOSITION TO MSJ BY KPI ULTRASOUND INC. FILED.

MEMO OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES I

MEMO OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN REPLY OF/TO PLTFFS OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT BY 3 DAY BLINDS INC FILED.

NOTICE OF RULING RE: MOTION FO

NOTICE OF RULING RE: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED

NOTICE OF APPEAL IN SUPERIOR C

NOTICE OF APPEAL IN SUPERIOR COURT FILED BY KPI ULTRASOUND, INC. ON 07/27/05 FROM A CERTAIN JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 06/22/05.

ORDER FROM DISTRICT COURT OF A

ORDER FROM DISTRICT COURT OF APPEAL DISMISSAL VACATED APPEAL IS REINSTATED.

MAIL RETURNED BY POST OFFICE;

MAIL RETURNED BY POST OFFICE; MINUTE ORDER/ JUDGMENT; REASON - NO SUCH NUMBER, AS TO E AURORA HUGHES.

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FO

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FOR COUNSEL REPRESENTING 3 DAY BLINDS INC, 3 DAY BLINDS INC. ADDRESS CHANGED FOR BRAGG,SEROTA & KULUVA FILED.

117 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • REMITTITUR FROM COURT OF APPEAL FILED; RULING AFFIRMED; JUSTICE GAUT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2006
  • HEARING RE: STATUS OF APPEAL; Disposition: Off-Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FOR COUNSEL REPRESENTING 3 DAY BLINDS INC, 3 DAY BLINDS INC. ADDRESS CHANGED FOR BRAGG,SEROTA & KULUVA FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • MAIL RETURNED BY POST OFFICE; MINUTE ORDER/ JUDGMENT; REASON - NO SUCH NUMBER, AS TO E AURORA HUGHES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION FOR APPOINTMENT TEMPORARY JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2006
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2006
  • HEARING RE: MEDIATION COMPLETION DATE; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL - BY RICHARD D BOCKMAN FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2006
  • HEARING RE: MEDIATION COMPLETION DATE; Disposition: Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF COMPLAINT FILED 01/15/2003 OF RICHARD BOCKMAN FILED WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
200 More Docket Entries
  • 02/10/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • CROSS-COMPLAINT OF KPI ULTRASOUND INC. REPRESENTED BY REID & HELLYER FILED (SUPERIOR COURT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2003
  • KPI ULTRASOUND INC. ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS KCI COMPANIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 01/15/2003 OF RICHARD BOCKMAN BY KPI ULTRASOUND INC. REPRESENTED BY REID & HELLYER FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMONS AND COMPLAINT AS TO KPI COMPANIES FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 01/15/2003 OF RICHARD BOCKMAN SERVED ON 3 DAY BLINDS INC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 01/23/03 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 01/15/2003 OF RICHARD BOCKMAN SERVED ON JEFF BOCKMAN WITH SERVICE DATE OF 01/15/03 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFIED COPY(S) MADE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2003
  • NON PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 3/27/03 AT 8:00 IN DEPT CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2003
  • DIRECTLY ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 02 FOR ALL PURPOSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KPI Healthcare, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where 3 Day Blinds LLC is a litigant