This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/26/2018 at 06:02:19 (UTC).

BOAS VS. CRAVENS

Case Summary

On 08/09/2007 BOAS filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against CRAVENS. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Indio Larson Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9550

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2007

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indio Larson Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TIMOTHY L BOAS

Defendants

CYNERGI INC

TIM WELBERRY

JOSEPHINE M CRAVENS

PICKFORD REAL ESTATE INC

RICHARD ENRIGHT

PACIFIC UNION GMAC

PRUDENTIAL CALIFORNIA REALTY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF TERENCE DANIEL DOYLE

571 Hartz Avenue

Danville, CA 94526

Defendant Attorneys

MANNING & MARDER KASS ELLROD RAMIREZ LLP

801 S Figueroa Street 15Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017

DONALD R HOLBEN & ASSOCIATES

5030 Camino De La Siesta Suite 350

San Diego, CA 92108

MAXIE RHEINHEIMER STEPHENS & VREVICH

350 10Th Avenue Suite 900

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

EXHIBITS A TO COMPLAINT

EXHIBITS A TO COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 08/09/2007 OF TIMOTHY BOAS AS TO TIM WELBERRY; MAILING DATE OF 09/24/07 FILED.

OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS OBJEC

OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS OBJECTION TO DEPOSITION NOTICE BY TIMOTHY L BOAS FILED

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 08/0

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 08/09/2007 OF TIMOTHY BOAS BY RICHARD ENRIGHT, PICKFORD REAL ESTATE INC REPRESENTED BY MAXIE RHEINHEIMER STEPHENS & VREVICH FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY NOV 1

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY NOV 19 & NOV 23 & DEC 24 2007 AND JANUARY 1 2008 BY TIMOTHY L BOAS FILED.

OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO COMP

OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT BY TIMOTHY L BOAS FILED

FILED: REPLY MPAS IN SUPPORT O

FILED: REPLY MPAS IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY JOSEPHINE M CRAVENS

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY T

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY TIM WELBERRY, CYNERGI INC FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 3.725.

NOTICE OF FURTHER CASE MANAGEM

NOTICE OF FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE BY TIMOTHY L BOAS FILED.

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAIN

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF TIMOTHY BOAS BY RICHARD ENRIGHT, PICKFORD REAL ESTATE INC REPRESENTED BY MAXIE RHEINHEIMER STEPHENS & VREVICH FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR STIP

STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR STIPULATION IS GRANTED; HONORABLE JUDGE HAROLD W HOPP.

MOTION TO/FOR CONTEST GOOD FAI

MOTION TO/FOR CONTEST GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT OF DEFENDANTS CYNERGI INC DBA PACIFIC UNION REAL ESTATE GMAC BY RICHARD ENRIGHT FILED

DECLARATION OF V.L. EKELUND I/

DECLARATION OF V.L. EKELUND I/S OF TIM WELBERRY AND CYNERGI INC DBA PACIFIC UNION REAL ESTATE GMACS OPPO TO RICHAR FILED

STIPULATION TO RE: TELEPHONIC

STIPULATION TO RE: TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE AT MSC FILED.

DECLARATION AND ORDER FOR REFU

DECLARATION AND ORDER FOR REFUND OF MONIES FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE HAROLD W HOPP.

ORDER TO REFUND JURY FEES POST

ORDER TO REFUND JURY FEES POSTED IN THE AMOUNT OF $150.00 BY LAW OFFICES OF TERENCE DANIEL DOYLE ON 02/18/10. SIGNED, HONORABLE JUDGE HAROLD W HOPP. (NOT USED SINCE 2010)

45 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2011
  • DATE TO SET OSC RE DESTRUCTION OF FILE (DISMISSAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2010
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: DISMISSAL AFTER SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 3.1385(B).; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2010
  • REJECTED DOCUMENT: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL SUBMITTED BY TIMOTHY L BOAS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2010
  • RETURN TO COURT'S CONTROL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2010
  • REFUND CHECK MAILED TO LAW OFFICES OF TERENCE DANIEL DOYLE DOC#1902804612, IN THE AMOUNT OF $150.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO REFUND JURY FEES POSTED IN THE AMOUNT OF $150.00 BY LAW OFFICES OF TERENCE DANIEL DOYLE ON 02/18/10. SIGNED, HONORABLE JUDGE HAROLD W HOPP. (NOT USED SINCE 2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2010
  • TRUST EXONERATION - JURY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION AND ORDER FOR REFUND OF MONIES FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE HAROLD W HOPP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2010
  • JURY TRIAL; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
72 More Docket Entries
  • 10/22/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED 08/09/2007 OF TIMOTHY BOAS BY TIM WELBERRY, CYNERGI INC REPRESENTED BY MANNING & MARDER KASS ELLROD RAMIREZ LLP FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2007
  • CYNERGI INC ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS PACIFIC UNION GMAC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2007
  • FAX FEE PAID FOR ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 08/09/2007 OF TIMOTHY BOAS BY JOSEPHINE M CRAVENS REPRESENTED BY DONALD R HOLBEN & ASSOCIATES FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 08/09/2007 OF TIMOTHY BOAS SERVED ON JOSEPHINE M CRAVENS WITH SERVICE DATE OF 09/20/07 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • EXHIBITS A TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2007
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 2G FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less