This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 11/20/2019 at 01:09:29 (UTC).

BLUE FOUNTAIN PARK VS ALBERTINE

Case Summary

On 04/05/2019 BLUE FOUNTAIN PARK filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ALBERTINE. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Hemet Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0645

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Hemet Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BLUE FOUNTAIN PARK, INC.

Defendant

ROBYN MICHELLE ALBERTINE

Other

UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHANA, HARMEET K

810 E Commonwealth Avenue

Fullerton, CA 92831

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DET

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000. (HEMET)

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92583.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DET

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/05/2019 OF BLUE FOUNTAIN PARK,INC. AND FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, U

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/05/2019 OF BLUE FOUNTAIN PARK,INC. AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO ROBYN MICHELLE ALBERTINE WITH SERVICE DATE OF 04/05/19 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE)

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT O

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/05/2019 OF BLUE FOUNTAIN PARK,INC. AS TO ROBYN MICHELLE ALBERTINE FILED.

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE O

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/05/2019 OF BLUE FOUNTAIN PARK,INC. AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S), WITH POSTING AND MAILING DATE OF 04/05/19 FILED(ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS)

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR R

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF CLERK DEF

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF CLERK DEFAULT JUDGMENT (DEFAULT ONLY PREVIOUSLY ENTERED) FILED.

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSU

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY BLUE FOUNTAIN PARK,INC..

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK -

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK - POSSESSION ONLY FILED 04/24/19

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2019
  • DATE TO SEND NOTICE RE OSC ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK - POSSESSION ONLY FILED 04/24/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY BLUE FOUNTAIN PARK,INC..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR RIVERSIDE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF CLERK DEFAULT JUDGMENT (DEFAULT ONLY PREVIOUSLY ENTERED) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • --ALSO ENTRY OF DEFAULT ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/05/2019 OF BLUE FOUNTAIN PARK,INC. AS TO ALL DEFENDANTS UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)--

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • FAX FILING BY BLUE FOUNTAIN PARK,INC. ($2.00 PER PAGE).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/05/2019 OF BLUE FOUNTAIN PARK,INC. AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S), WITH POSTING AND MAILING DATE OF 04/05/19 FILED(ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/05/2019 OF BLUE FOUNTAIN PARK,INC. AS TO ROBYN MICHELLE ALBERTINE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 04/15/2019
  • RETURNED DOCUMENT: PARTIAL FAX- PROOFS OF SERVICE, REQ DEFAULT SUBMITTED BY BLUE FOUNTAIN PARK,INC..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/05/2019 OF BLUE FOUNTAIN PARK,INC. AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION ATTACHED TO THE COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92583.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • HEARING RE: UD OSC SET 6/04/19 AT 8:00 IN CLEH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT H1 - UNLAWFUL DETAINER. (HEMET)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000. (HEMET)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHANA LAW FIRM - HARMEET K CHANA