This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 12/01/2019 at 01:28:46 (UTC).

BLOHM VS SYNFAST OIL

Case Summary

On 09/07/2018 BLOHM filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against SYNFAST OIL. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5426

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Courthouse:

    Palm Springs Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BLOHM

JULIE BLOHM

WILLIAM BLOHM

Defendants

SYNFAST OIL

NISSAN NORTH AMERICAN

VIP MOTOR CARS LTD

SYNFAST OIL CHANGE

M TRUST AUTOCARE LLLP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF MICHAEL GELLER INC

3576 Arlington Ave Ste 210

Riverside, CA 92506

 

Court Documents

MINUTE ORDER: CHANGE TO ORDER

MINUTE ORDER: CHANGE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING ON 9/4/19

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED 0

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED 09/07/2018 OF WILLIAM BLOHM NAMING DOES 1 TO BE M TRUST AUTOCARE LLLP FILED.

AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMP

AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 09/07/2018 OF WILLIAM BLOHM AND FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL ON TH

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 09/07/2018 OF WILLIAM BLOHM SERVED ON M TRUST AUTOCARE LLLP FILED; DATE OF MAILING 07/15/19

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT O

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 09/07/2018 OF WILLIAM BLOHM AS TO M TRUST AUTOCARE LLLP FILED.

DECLARATION OF MICHAEL GELLER

DECLARATION OF MICHAEL GELLER RESPONSE TO OSC RE FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OR

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE.

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL ON TH

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 09/07/2018 OF WILLIAM BLOHM SERVED ON NISSAN NORTH AMERICAN FILED; DATE OF MAILING 11/16/18

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ON COMPL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ON COMPLAINT FILED 09/07/2018 OF WILLIAM BLOHM AS TO DEFENDANT VIP MOTOR CARS LTD, NISSAN NORTH AMERICAN FILED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

MINUTE ORDER: RE 3/8/19 HEARIN

MINUTE ORDER: RE 3/8/19 HEARING

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OS

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OSC WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT O

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 09/07/2018 OF WILLIAM BLOHM AS TO VIP MOTOR CARS LTD FILED.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT O

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 09/07/2018 OF WILLIAM BLOHM AS TO SYNFAST OIL CHANGE FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 09/07/2018 OF WILLIAM BLOHM AS TO SYNFAST OIL CHANGE; MAILING DATE OF 10/05/18 FILED.

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (P

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (PALM SPRINGS)

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92260.

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEP

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT PS1. (PALM SPRINGS)

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FI

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 09/07/2018 OF WILLIAM BLOHM AND FILED.

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2020
  • WILLIAM BLOHM, JULIE BLOHM/LAW OFFICE OF MICHAEL GELLER INC IS ORDERED TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE, IF ANY, WHY SANCTIONS NOT TO EXCEED $1500.00 OR DISMISSAL SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR OBTAIN A DEFAULT JUDGMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • RETURNED DOCUMENT: (PROPOSED)DEFAULT JUDGMENT PACKET SUBMITTED BY WILLIAM BLOHM, JULIE BLOHM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • WILLIAM BLOHM, JULIE BLOHM/LAW OFFICE OF MICHAEL GELLER INC IS ORDERED TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE, IF ANY, WHY SANCTIONS NOT TO EXCEED $1500.00 OR DISMISSAL SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE /APPLY FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT.; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTE ORDER: CHANGES TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE 10/30/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • RETURNED DOCUMENT: (PROPOSED)DEFAULT COURT JUDGMENT PACKET SUBMITTED BY WILLIAM BLOHM, JULIE BLOHM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • ESUBMIT FEE BY PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF MICHAEL GELLER RESPONSE TO OSC RE FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • RETURNED DOCUMENT: (PROPOSED)DEFAULT COURT JUDGMENT PACKET SUBMITTED BY WILLIAM BLOHM, JULIE BLOHM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • RETURNED DOCUMENT: (PROPOSED)DEFAULT COURT JUDGMENT SUBMITTED BY WILLIAM BLOHM, JULIE BLOHM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • WILLIAM BLOHM/LAW OFFICE OF MICHAEL GELLER INC IS ORDERED TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE, IF ANY, WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSE FOR FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT (CRC 3.110).; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 11/13/2018
  • NPSCTH HEARING SET FOR 11/06/18 AT 08:30 IS VACATED -FOR THE REASON: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON ALL PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • NON-PROOF OF SERVICE CLERK'S TRACKING HEARING (NON-APPEARANCE); Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 09/07/2018 OF WILLIAM BLOHM AS TO SYNFAST OIL CHANGE; MAILING DATE OF 10/05/18 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 09/07/2018 OF WILLIAM BLOHM AS TO VIP MOTOR CARS LTD; MAILING DATE OF 10/05/18 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 09/07/2018 OF WILLIAM BLOHM AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT PS1. (PALM SPRINGS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • NON-PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 11/06/18 AT 8:30 IN DEPT CLKP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92260.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (PALM SPRINGS)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VIP MOTOR CARS LTD. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA PALM SPRINGS HYUNDAI is a litigant

Latest cases where Nissan North America Inc is a litigant