Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 08/10/2016 at 12:37:41 (UTC).

BLAKE BAGGETT MOTORSPORTS INC VS. PRO CIRCUIT RACI

Case Summary

On 10/27/2015 BLAKE BAGGETT MOTORSPORTS INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PRO CIRCUIT RACI. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2862

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BLAKE BAGGETT MOTORSPORTS INC

BLAKE BAGGETT

Defendant

PRO CIRCUIT RACINGINC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF ROBERT VOSBURG

16501 Ventura Blvd #400

Encino, CA 91436

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OR

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OR OTHER CONTACT INFORMATION BY BLAKE BAGGETT MOTORSPORTS INC, BLAKE BAGGETT FILED.

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED 10/27/2015 OF BLAKE BAGGETT MOTORSPORTS INC AS TO PRO CIRCUIT RACINGINC WITH RECEIPT DATE OF 11/09/15

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92860.

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (R

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (RIVERSIDE)

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PRE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2016
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OR OTHER CONTACT INFORMATION BY BLAKE BAGGETT MOTORSPORTS INC, BLAKE BAGGETT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED 10/27/2015 OF BLAKE BAGGETT MOTORSPORTS INC AS TO PRO CIRCUIT RACINGINC WITH RECEIPT DATE OF 11/09/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92860.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2015
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 01. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2015
  • CHANGE ATTORNEY ON BLAKE BAGGETT MOTORSPORTS INC, BLAKE BAGGETT FROM PRO/PER TO LAW OFFICES OF ROBERT VOSBURG ON ALL COMPLAINTS.

    Read MoreRead Less