This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/29/2016 at 06:26:58 (UTC).

BINDLE CORPORATION VS SCHOOLEY

Case Summary

On 01/10/2014 BINDLE CORPORATION filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against SCHOOLEY. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Temecula Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0076

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Temecula Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BINDLE CORPORATIONINC

Defendants

PATRICIA BEATON

DAVID SCHOOLEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TYLER & BURSCH, LLP

24910 Las Brisas Rd., Ste. 110

Murrieta, CA 92562

 

Court Documents

LIMITED CIVIL UNLAWFUL DETAINE

LIMITED CIVIL UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92562.

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

1ST AMENDED UNLAWFUL DETAINER

1ST AMENDED UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT OF BINDLE CORPORATIONINC FILED. (LIMITED CIVIL AMENDED COMPLAINT)

AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED ON 1ST

AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED ON 1ST AMENDED UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT OF BINDLE CORPORATIONINC AND FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE 1ST AM

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE 1ST AMENDED UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT OF BINDLE CORPORATIONINC SERVED ON DAVID SCHOOLEY WITH SERVICE DATE OF 01/19/14 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON 1ST AMENDED UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT OF BINDLE CORPORATIONINC AS TO PATRICIA BEATON; MAILING DATE OF 01/21/14 FILED.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT O

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE 1ST AMENDED UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT OF BINDLE CORPORATIONINC AS TO DAVID SCHOOLEY FILED.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT A

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY ON THE 1ST AMENDED UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT OF BINDLE CORPORATIONINC AS TO PATRICIA BEATON

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK -

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK - POSSESSION ONLY FILED 02/06/14

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR R

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSU

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY BINDLE CORPORATIONINC.

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SE

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SERVED; RIVERSIDE COUNTY

DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGME

DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER CCP 585(D)) FILED.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF COURT DEF

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT (DEFAULT CLERK PREVIOUSLY ENTERED) FILED.

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY COURT U

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY COURT UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED . SIGNED BY HONORABLE JUDGE GORDON R. BURKHART.

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED AS

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY UNSATISFIED FILED.

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY UNSATISFIED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2015
  • CONFIDENTIAL STATEMENT OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER FILED. (FORM WG-035)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2015
  • CONFIDENTIAL STATEMENT OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER FILED. (FORM WG-035)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2015
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED; RIVERSIDE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY COURT UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED . SIGNED BY HONORABLE JUDGE GORDON R. BURKHART.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2014
  • JUDGMENT RECEIVED AND FORWARDED TO ORIGINATING COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2014
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT REVIEW - WESTERN (NON-APPEARANCE) SET 4/29/14 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. DJW.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT (DEFAULT CLERK PREVIOUSLY ENTERED) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER CCP 585(D)) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SERVED; RIVERSIDE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 01/15/2014
  • FAX FILING BY BINDLE CORPORATIONINC ($1.50 PER PAGE).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2014
  • RETURNED DOCUMENT: AMENDED COMPLAINT AND SUMMONS SUBMITTED BY BINDLE CORPORATIONINC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2014
  • FAX FILING BY BINDLE CORPORATIONINC ($1.50 PER PAGE).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2014
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92562.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2014
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT T1 (UNLAWFUL DETAINER (TEMECULA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2014
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE SET 3/14/14 AT 8:00 IN DEPT. T1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • LIMITED CIVIL UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less