This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/11/2018 at 14:40:38 (UTC).

BESERRA VS K HOVNANIAN

Case Summary

On 09/16/2011 BESERRA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against K HOVNANIAN. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5257

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ROBERTO DELGADO

MARCIA J DELGADO

MARIA CERVANTES

JOSE GOPAR

FRANK JASON GUEVARA

YOLANDA GUEVARA

LEONEL GUTIERREZ

CYNTHIA GUTIERREZ

JOSHUA BRAMBILA HAYS

MARTHA HAYS

MIKE HICKEY

TRACHELLE HICKEY

JESSE HILL SR

MAUNA LOA HILL ]

ANDREW ISAAC

ANNETTE ISAAC

CONCEPCION JOSE LEDESMA

JORGE BORGETTI

SAMUEL LOPEZ

ROCIO LOPEZ

65 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHINNICK & RYAN LLP

1650 Hotel Circle North Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92108

Other Attorneys

GREEN & HALL A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

2999 Douglas Blvd. Ste. 315

Roseville, CA 95661

LEWIS, BRISBOIS, BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

650 Town Center Drive Suite 1400

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

HAMMONS & BALDINO LLP

2601 Airport Drive Ste 105

Torrance, CA 90505

TUCKER ELLIS LLP

515 S. Flower St. 42Nd Fl.

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2223

LAW OFFICES OF KEVIN PEGAN

One Mac Arthur Place #650

Santa Ana, CA 92707

BREMER WHYTE BROWN& OMEARA LLP

501 West Broadway Suite 1700

San Diego, CA 92101

DIEDERICH & ASSOCIATES

1901 Orange Tree Lane #100

Redlands, CA 92374

GREEN & HALL APC

3741 Douglas Blvd #290

Roseville, CA 95661

THOMAS LUCAS

9191 Towne Centre Dr, Ste 190

San Diego, CA 92122

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ON COMPLAINT FILED 09/16/2011 OF RICHARD BESERRA AS TO PLAINTIFF JOSE J ORTIZ, YOLANDA M SANCHEZ, CESAR G TORRES FILED

EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS IN SUPP

EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MTN TO DISMISS OR STAY ACTION FILED BY RICHARD BE

DECLARATION OF OF MEGAN M CHOD

DECLARATION OF OF MEGAN M CHODZKO,ESQ IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE FILED FILED

DECLARATION OF MEGAN M CHODZKO

DECLARATION OF MEGAN M CHODZKO ESQ IN SPPT OF BESERRA PLTFS SUPP PTS & AUTH IN SPPT OF OPPO TO MTN TO CONSOLIDATE FILED

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FI

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED

AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE BY MA

AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF MOTION TO LIFT THE STAY AND FOR CONSOLIDATION ON ALL INTERESTED PARTIES WITH A MAILING DATE OF 07/18/12 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT)

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILE

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 04/20/2012 OF K. HOVNANIAN COMMUNITIES INC BY HEARTH & HOME TECHNOLOGIES INC REPRESENTED BY TUCKER ELLIS LLP FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

REPLY TO /BRIEF RE:MOTION TO L

REPLY TO /BRIEF RE:MOTION TO LIFT THE STAY AND FOR CONSOLIDATION BY K. HOVNANIAN COMMUNITIES INC, K HOVNANIAN FORECAST HOMES INC FILED

NOTICE OF RULING RE: HEARING 8

NOTICE OF RULING RE: HEARING 8/14/12 LIFT THE STAY & FOR CONSOLIDATION FILED

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILE

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 04/20/2012 OF K. HOVNANIAN COMMUNITIES INC BY FENCEWORKS INC REPRESENTED BY LAW OFFICES OF CRAIG J SILVER FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY WESTERN INSULATIONL.P.

DECLARATION OF SERVICE OF NOTI

DECLARATION OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRMS NAME ADDRESS AND TELEP BY LEONARD ROOFING INC; SERVED K HOVNANIAN FORECAST HOMES INC, WESTERN INSULATIONL.P. SERVICE DATE OF 10/31/12

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME FILED; CHANGE FIRM LAW OFFICES OF OSMAN & ASSOCIATES FOR PARTY(S) INTEGRITY WINDOW COMPANY INC TO FIRM DIEDERICH & ASSOCIATES.

WITHDRAWAL OF ASSOCIATED COUNS

WITHDRAWAL OF ASSOCIATED COUNSEL FOR LEONARD ROOFING INC

DECLARATION OF BRUCE LEONARD R

DECLARATION OF BRUCE LEONARD RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FILED

AMENDED DECLARATION OF RYAN N

AMENDED DECLARATION OF RYAN N MEYER FILED BY K. HOVNANIAN COMMUNITIES INC, K HOVNANIAN FORECAST HOMES INC

REQUEST FOR DISM AS TO XDEFT B

REQUEST FOR DISM AS TO XDEFT BRUDVIK INC W/PREJUDICE BY ATTY FOR XCOMP FILED.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL A

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED.

156 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2016
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: DISMISSAL AFTER UNCONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385(B).; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2016
  • COURT ON ITS OWN MOTION: RE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR 12/5/16; Disposition: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • K. HOVNANIAN COMMUNITIES INC DECLARATION FOR THE DECEMBER 5,2016 OSC HEARING RE DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AS TO CROSS COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE ON K HOVNANIAN COMMUNITIES FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY BY K. HOVNANIAN COMMUNITIES INC FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ON THE CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 04/20/2012 OF K. HOVNANIAN COMMUNITIES INC AS TO FENCEWORKS INC FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ON THE CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 04/20/2012 OF K. HOVNANIAN COMMUNITIES INC AS TO LEONARD ROOFING INC FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
257 More Docket Entries
  • 01/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ON COMPLAINT FILED 09/16/2011 OF RICHARD BESERRA AS TO PLAINTIFF JOSE J ORTIZ, YOLANDA M SANCHEZ, CESAR G TORRES FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2011
  • NON-PROOF OF SERVICE (NON-APPEARANCE) HEARING; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 09/16/2011 OF RICHARD BESERRA SERVED ON K. HOVNANIAN COMMUNITIES INC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 11/01/11 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 09/16/2011 OF RICHARD BESERRA FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2011
  • COMPLEX CASE DESIGNATION FEE PAID ON COMPLAINT FILED 09/16/2011 OF RICHARD BESERRA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2011
  • CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 02 FOR LAW AND MOTION PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2011
  • NON PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 11/15/11 AT 8:00 IN DEPT CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2011
  • DIRECTLY ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 10. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less