This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/11/2018 at 15:51:19 (UTC).

BERRY VS NAKKA

Case Summary

On 02/07/2014 BERRY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against NAKKA. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0196

  • Filing Date:

    02/07/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Respondents and Minors

LIAM BERRY

SAVANNA FISHER

BRANDON BERRY JR

CHRISTIAN FISHER

SEBASTIAN FISHER

COLDWELL BANKER RESIDENTIAL REAL ESTATE LLC

COLDWELL BANKER REAL ESTATE LLC

ROBERT SUNDBACK

NICHOLE WATSON

KIVETT REALTORS INC

Defendants, Appellants and Cross Plaintiffs

SREENIVASA NAKKA

HEMALATHA NAKKA

COLDWELL BANKER RESIDENTIAL REAL ESTATE LLC

COLDWELL BANKER REAL ESTATE LLC

ROBERT SUNDBACK

NICHOLE WATSON

KIVETT REALTORS INC

7 SUMMIT PROPERTIES 1, LLC

7 SUMMIT PROPERTIES 2, LLC

7 SUMMIT PROPERTIES, LLC

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Defendants

COLDWELL BANKER RESIDENTIAL REAL ESTATE LLC

COLDWELL BANKER REAL ESTATE LLC

ROBERT SUNDBACK

NICHOLE WATSON

KIVETT REALTORS INC

NICOLE SUNDBACK

Not Classified By Court

COURT OF APPEAL FOURTH APPELLATE DISTRICT

21 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Respondent and Minor Attorneys

MCNALLY LAW OFFICE

225 South Lake Ave #1100

Pasadena, CA 91101-4889

TAYLOR & RING

1230 Rosecrans Ave Ste 360

Manhattan Beach, CA 90266

GORDON & REES LLP

633 West Fifth St 52Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

RELAW APC

699 Hampshire Road #105

Westlake Village, CA 91361

CHANDLER LAW FIRM

3800 Orange St, Ste 270

Riverside, CA 92501

Defendant, Appellant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

HESS, EDWARD W.

601 N. Parkcenter Dr #107-108

Santa Ana, CA 92705

SLOVAK BARON EMPEYMURPHY & PINKNEY

1800 East Tahquitz Canyon Way

Palm Springs, CA 92262

Respondent, Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

GORDON & REES LLP

633 West Fifth St 52Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

RELAW APC

699 Hampshire Road #105

Westlake Village, CA 91361

CHANDLER LAW FIRM

3800 Orange St, Ste 270

Riverside, CA 92501

HESS, EDWARD W.

601 N. Parkcenter Dr #107-108

Santa Ana, CA 92705

SLOVAK BARON EMPEYMURPHY & PINKNEY

1800 East Tahquitz Canyon Way

Palm Springs, CA 92262

DAVIS WOJCIK DUARTE APLC

1001 E Morton Pl, Ste A

Hemet, CA 92543

Not Classified By Court Attorney

COURT OF APPEALS FOURTH DISTRICT

3389 12Th Street

Riverside, CA 92501

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MTN TO

NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MTN TO COMPEL RESPONSES INTERROGATORIES AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS BY SREENIVASA NAKKA, HEMALATHA NAKKA FILED.

SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES SET 2

SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES SET 2 RE HEMALATHA NAKKA FILED.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL BY 7 SUMMIT PROPERTIES1, LLC, 7 SUMMIT PROPERTIES2, LLC FILED.

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAIN

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF LIAM BERRY BY 7 SUMMIT PROPERTIES1, LLC, 7 SUMMIT PROPERTIES2, LLC REPRESENTED BY DAVIS WOJCIK DUARTEAPLC FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

DECLARATION OF VEE B SOTELO IN

DECLARATION OF VEE B SOTELO IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO AMEND ANSWER FILED

ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE F

ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED ANSWER; HONORABLE JUDGE ANGEL M. BERMUDEZ.

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUT

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS RE 7 SUMMIT MOTION FILED.

DECLARATION OF QUYNHVI (VEE) B

DECLARATION OF QUYNHVI (VEE) B. SOTELO IN SUPPORT OF REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY FILED

OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR LEAVE

OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMEND COMPLAINT BY SREENIVASA NAKKA, HEMALATHA NAKKA FILED

ANSWER TO 2ND AMENDED COMPLAIN

ANSWER TO 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT OF LIAM BERRY BY 7 SUMMIT PROPERTIES1, LLC REPRESENTED BY DAVIS WOJCIK DUARTEAPLC FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

NOTICE OF NON-RECEIPT OF OPPOS

NOTICE OF NON-RECEIPT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS BY ROBERT SUNDBACK FILED.

OBJECTION TO NAKKA DEFENDANTS

OBJECTION TO NAKKA DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY LIAM BERRY, SAVANNA FISHER, BRANDON BERRY JR, CHRISTIAN FISHER, SEBASTIAN FISHER

PLAINTIFFS TRIAL BRIEF

PLAINTIFFS TRIAL BRIEF

ORDER APPOINTING GUARDIAN AD L

ORDER APPOINTING GUARDIAN AD LITEM ON COMPLAINT FILED 02/07/2014 OF LIAM BERRY FOR SAVANNA FISHER APPOINTING IVY FISHER AS GUARDIAN; HONORABLE JUDGE GLORIA CONNOR TRASK.

COUNSELS NOTICE OF UNAVAILABIL

COUNSELS NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

STIPULATION TO /RE: HEARING DA

STIPULATION TO /RE: HEARING DATE FOR PENDING DEMURRERS FILED.

JUDGMENT FILED; HONORABLE GLOR

JUDGMENT FILED; HONORABLE GLORIA CONNOR TRASK

RECEIPT FOR RECORDS ON APPEAL

RECEIPT FOR RECORDS ON APPEAL FILED - NTC OF APPEAL PKT.

211 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2018
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: DISMISSAL AFTER CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385(C).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • JURY TRIAL; Disposition: Hearing Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • HEARING RE: MOTION TO BIFURCATE ISSUE OF LIABILITY FROM DAMAGES BY SREENIVASA NAKKA, HEMALATHA NAKKA; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: Not Settled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE IS SET 7/24/18 AT 14:30 IN DEPT. 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • JURY TRIAL; Disposition: Continued Not Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • HEARING RE: MOTION TO BIFURCATE ISSUE OF LIABILITY FROM DAMAGES BY SREENIVASA NAKKA, HEMALATHA NAKKA; Disposition: Continued Not Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: Not Settled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF MINUTE ORDER DATED 03/23/18.

    Read MoreRead Less
570 More Docket Entries
  • 08/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER APPOINTING GUARDIAN AD LITEM ON COMPLAINT FILED 02/07/2014 OF LIAM BERRY FOR SAVANNA FISHER APPOINTING IVY FISHER AS GUARDIAN; HONORABLE JUDGE GLORIA CONNOR TRASK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2014
  • RETURNED DOCUMENT: APPL/ORDER FOR GUARDIAN AD LITEM & SUMMONS SUBMITTED BY SAVANNA FISHER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER APPOINTING GUARDIAN AD LITEM ON COMPLAINT FILED 02/07/2014 OF LIAM BERRY FOR BRANDON BERRY JR APPOINTING BRANDON BERRY SR AS GUARDIAN; HONORABLE JUDGE GLORIA CONNOR TRASK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER APPOINTING GUARDIAN AD LITEM ON COMPLAINT FILED 02/07/2014 OF LIAM BERRY FOR LIAM BERRY APPOINTING IVY FISHER AS GUARDIAN; HONORABLE JUDGE GLORIA CONNOR TRASK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2014
  • NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF DEPARTMENT TO DEPARTMENT 03.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2014
  • RETURNED DOCUMENT: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT SUBMITTED BY LIAM BERRY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92544.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2014
  • DIRECTLY ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 06. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2014
  • CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 11 FOR LAW AND MOTION PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED - FAST TRACK

    Read MoreRead Less