This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 09/19/2019 at 20:45:37 (UTC).

BERMUDEZ VS CASTRO

Case Summary

On 03/13/2015 BERMUDEZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CASTRO. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1236

  • Filing Date:

    03/13/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Palm Springs Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Defendants, Cross Defendants and Intervenor Defendants

GARY BERMUDEZ

CHONA CASTRO

THERESA IRENE BALL

JACQUELINE CACCAVARI

White Water, CA 92282

Intervenor Plaintiff and Intervenor

PEERLESS INSURANCECOMPANY

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs, Cross Defendants and Intervenor Defendants

CHONDA CASTRO

ARNULFO ALVAREZ

RANDY MEYERS

ARNULFO LLAMAS ALVAREZ

RANDY MYERS

CHONA CASTRO

RANDY G MYERS & NURSERIES

SERENITY HOSPICE LLC

ARMANDO CASTRO

SERENITY HOSPICE

CHONA SANTOS CASTRO

Not Classified By Court

"PSC 1600492 CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT"

"PSC 1601669 CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT"

"PSC1601476 CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT"

12 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

TOMALAS LAW FIRM

901 Dove Street Suite 120

Newport Beach, CA 92660-3018

LAW OFFICES OF JOHN C YE

3660 Wilshire Blvd #1040

Los Angeles, CA 90010

LAW FIRM OF RIVERSJ MORRELL III

27201 Puerta Real, Ste 470

Mission Viejo, CA 92691

B& D LAW GROUP

10700 Santa Monica Blvd #200

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Intervenor Plaintiff and Intervenor Attorneys

AUSTIN BROWNWOOD CANNON & SANTA CRUZ

Po Box 85462

San Diego, CA 92186-5462

LAW OFFICES OF SANTA CRUZ BROWNWOOD & CANNO

Po Box 85462

San Diego, CA 92186-5462

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff, Cross Defendant and Intervenor Defendant Attorneys

MUSICK PEELER & GARRETT

One Wilshire Blvd Suite 2000

Los Angeles, CA 90017

LAW OFFICES OF VIVIAN L SCHWARTZ

Po Box 258829

Oklahoma City, OK 73125-8829

HARTSUYKER STRATMAN & WILLIAMS-ABREGO SANTA

Po Box 258829

Oklahoma City, OK 73125-8829

RAFFALOW RHOADS & BRETOI

1000 Lakes Drive #350

West Covina, CA 91790-2914

RAFFALOW BRETOI & ADAMS

444 W Ocean Blvd Ste 1800

Long Beach, CA 90802

Not Classified By Court Attorney

CONSOLIDATED CASE NUMBER

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT FILED 02/02/2016 OF "PSC 1600492 CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT" AS TO ARNULFO LLAMAS ALVAREZ; MAILING DATE OF 02/18/16 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE CONSOL

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT FILED 02/02/2016 OF "PSC 1600492 CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT" SERVED ON ARMANDO CASTRO WITH SERVICE DATE OF 02/22/16 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

NOTICE OF TAKING MTN TO COMPEL

NOTICE OF TAKING MTN TO COMPEL FUR RESPONSES TO DEF FORM ROGS SET ONE OFF CALENDAR BY ARNULFO ALVAREZ, RANDY MYERS FILED.

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT FO

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT FOR CASE MANAGEMENT AND TRIAL ASSIGNMENT PURPOSES

MOTION TO/FOR SET ASIDE DISMIS

MOTION TO/FOR SET ASIDE DISMISSAL AND TO REINSTATE THE ACTION BY JACQUELINE CACCAVARI FILED

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY ARNULFO ALVAREZ, RANDY MYERS

MINUTE ORDER: RE 11/08/18 HEAR

MINUTE ORDER: RE 11/08/18 HEARING

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CL

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING.

FILED: JOINT STATUS REPORT

FILED: JOINT STATUS REPORT

ORDER OF DISMISSAL; HONORABLE

ORDER OF DISMISSAL; HONORABLE JUDGE CRAIG G. RIEMER.

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEP

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT PS2. (PALM SPRINGS)

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY CHONA CASTRO

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF ARNULFO ALV

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF ARNULFO ALVAREZ, RANDY MYERS REPRESENTED BY MUSICK PEELER & GARRETT FILED (SUPERIOR COURT)

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NO

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF DEPARTMENT ASSIGNMENT.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON CONSOLIDATED

SUMMONS ISSUED ON CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT FILED 03/30/2016 OF CHONA CASTRO AND FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92262.

MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE PSC 1501

MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE PSC 1501236 PSC 1600492 AND PSC1601476 BY ARNULFO ALVAREZ, RANDY MYERS FILED

NOTICE OF RULING RE: MOTION TO

NOTICE OF RULING RE: MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE (07-14-16) FILED

119 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2019
  • JACQUELINE CACCAVARI/PRO/PER IS ORDERED TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE, IF ANY, WHY SANCTIONS NOT TO EXCEED $1500.00 OR DISMISSAL SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR AT TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE.; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • OSC HEARING RE: DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION PSC 1601669 FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE ACTION AS TO JACQUELINE CACCAVARI.; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF ORDER OF DISMISSAL FILED 5/21/19.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER OF DISMISSAL; HONORABLE JUDGE CRAIG G. RIEMER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • JACQUELINE CACCAVARI/PRO/PER IS ORDERED TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE, IF ANY, WHY SANCTIONS NOT TO EXCEED $1500.00 OR DISMISSAL SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR AT TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE.; Disposition: Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • HEARING RE: TRIAL SETTING CONF ON CONSOLIDATED CASE PSC1601669; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • CIVIL CASE AUDIT FORM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • STATUS CONFERENCE - MEDIATION; Disposition: Hearing Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • FILED: JOINT STATUS REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
242 More Docket Entries
  • 06/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE BY GARY BERMUDEZ FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2015
  • RANDY MYERS ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS RANDY MEYERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 03/13/2015 OF GARY BERMUDEZ BY ARNULFO ALVAREZ, RANDY MYERS REPRESENTED BY MUSICK PEELER & GARRETT FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 03/13/2015 OF GARY BERMUDEZ SERVED ON ARNULFO ALVAREZ WITH SERVICE DATE OF 03/28/15 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 03/13/2015 OF GARY BERMUDEZ SERVED ON CHONDA CASTRO WITH SERVICE DATE OF 03/31/15 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 03/13/2015 OF GARY BERMUDEZ SERVED ON RANDY MEYERS WITH SERVICE DATE OF 03/29/15 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92262.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (PALM SPRINGS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT PS2. (PALM SPRINGS)

    Read MoreRead Less