This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 12/20/2017 at 19:06:27 (UTC).

BENNETT VS PETERS

Case Summary

On 06/27/2017 BENNETT filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PETERS. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Murrieta Southwest Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1254

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Murrieta Southwest Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Other

RODGER BENNETT

Murrieta, CA 92562

Defendants and Others

BARBARA PETERS

Menifee, CA 92584

CRAIG PETERS

Menifee, CA 92584

RODGER BENNETT

Murrieta, CA 92562

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - OVER $1500

PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - OVER $1500 AND LESS THAN OR EQUAL TO $5000 FILED. (SOUTHWEST)

DEFENDANT'S CLAIM AND ORDER-OV

DEFENDANT'S CLAIM AND ORDER-OVER $1500 AND LESS THAN OR EQUAL TO $5000 FILED BY CRAIG PETERS, BARBARA PETERS

PROOF OF SERVICE-SMALL CLAIMS

PROOF OF SERVICE-SMALL CLAIMS ON THE PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - SOUTHWEST FILED 06/27/2017 OF RODGER BENNETT SERVED ON CRAIG PETERS WITH SERVICE DATE OF 09/07/17 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE) SERVICE FEE OF $0.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED)

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED) SMALL CLAIMS ON PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - SOUTHWEST FILED 06/27/2017 OF RODGER BENNETT AS TO BARBARA PETERS, MAILING DATE OF 09/14/17 FILED. COSTS OF $0.00.

DECLARATION RE NON SERVICE OF

DECLARATION RE NON SERVICE OF DEFENDANTS CLAIM ON RODGER BENNETT FILED

NOTICE OF LODGMENT OF PLAINTIF

NOTICE OF LODGMENT OF PLAINTIFFS DECLARATION FILED BY RODGER BENNETT.

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF NO

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF NOTICE OF LODGMENT ON CRAIG PETERS AND BARBARA PETERS WITH A MAILING DATE OF 10/10/17 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT)

SMALL CLAIMS SETTLEMENT AGREEM

SMALL CLAIMS SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT, HONORABLE JUDGE ALBERT J. WOJCIK FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE-SMALL CLAIMS

PROOF OF SERVICE-SMALL CLAIMS ON THE DEFENDANT'S CLAIM FILED 09/12/2017 OF CRAIG PETERS SERVED ON RODGER BENNETT WITH SERVICE DATE OF 10/11/17 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE) SERVICE FEE OF $20.00.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE-SMALL CLAIMS ON THE DEFENDANT'S CLAIM FILED 09/12/2017 OF CRAIG PETERS SERVED ON RODGER BENNETT WITH SERVICE DATE OF 10/11/17 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE) SERVICE FEE OF $20.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT, HONORABLE JUDGE ALBERT J. WOJCIK FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • RETURNED DOCUMENT: NOTICE OF LODGMENT SUBMITTED BY RODGER BENNETT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING - SOUTHWEST.; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL ON PLAINTIFF'S AND DEFENDANT'S CLAIM.; Disposition: Hearing Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • FAX FILING BY RODGER BENNETT ($2.00 PER PAGE).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF NOTICE OF LODGMENT ON CRAIG PETERS AND BARBARA PETERS WITH A MAILING DATE OF 10/10/17 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF LODGMENT OF PLAINTIFFS DECLARATION FILED BY RODGER BENNETT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • FAX FILING BY RODGER BENNETT ($2.00 PER PAGE).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE NON SERVICE OF DEFENDANTS CLAIM ON RODGER BENNETT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 09/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE-SMALL CLAIMS ON THE PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - SOUTHWEST FILED 06/27/2017 OF RODGER BENNETT SERVED ON CRAIG PETERS WITH SERVICE DATE OF 09/07/17 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE) SERVICE FEE OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • RETURNED DOCUMENT: PROOF OF SERVICES SUBMITTED BY RODGER BENNETT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL ON PLAINTIFF'S AND DEFENDANT'S CLAIMS SET 10/11/17 AT 8:00 IN DEPT. S205

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFENDANT'S CLAIM AND ORDER-OVER $1500 AND LESS THAN OR EQUAL TO $5000 FILED BY CRAIG PETERS, BARBARA PETERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • COPY(S) MADE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING SET ON 10/11/17, AT 8:00, IN DEPT. S205 (SOUTHWEST).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • CLAIM AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • ACTIVE MILITARY DUTY AS TO NONE (SOUTHWEST).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - OVER $1500 AND LESS THAN OR EQUAL TO $5000 FILED. (SOUTHWEST)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENT S205. (SOUTHWEST)

    Read MoreRead Less