Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 01/05/2018 at 13:23:42 (UTC).

BENNETT & BENNETT

Case Summary

On 03/21/2017 BENNETT BENNETT was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Hemet Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0709

  • Filing Date:

    03/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hemet Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

TODD W BENNETT

Temecula, CA 92592

Respondent

TRACEY R BENNETT

Not Classified By Court

JACKSON D BENNETT

LUCAS W BENNETT

ABBY E BENNETT

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2017
  • CHILD SUPPORT CASE REGISTRY FORM RECEIVED BY TODD W BENNETT ON 08/09/17 FOR FORWARDING TO CALIF. STATE DISBURSEMENT UNIT. (FL-191)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED - DATE MARITAL STATUS TERMINATES 09/26/17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION FILED BY TODD W BENNETT. (FL-170)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • JUDGMENT FOR DISSOLUTION BY DECLARATION FILED BY TODD W BENNETT; JUDGE H RONALD DOMNITZ. (FL-180)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • JUDGMENT FORWARDED TO DEPARTMENT H5 FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW ON 08/07/17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • JUDGMENT PACKET RECEIVED ON 08/04/17 AND FORWARDED TO THE JUDGMENT DESK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • RETURNED JUDGMENT SUBMITTED BY TODD W BENNETT FOR THE REASON: THE JUDGMENT ISINCOMPLETE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT DATE RE: DEFAULT/RESPONSE SET ON 9/11/17 AT 8:00 IN DEPT. CLEH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OR OTHER CONTACT INFORMATION FILED BY TODD W BENNETT. (MC-040)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • --ALSO SERVED DEUCCJ/DEC DISC/SAD/IED/DEC RES/FLCMO ON TRACEY R BENNETT WITH SERVICE DATE OF 03/25/17--

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 03/21/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDGE MICHAEL J. RUSHTON IN DEPARTMENT H5. (JUDGE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • FAMILY LAW PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • HEARING RE: FAILURE TO BRING CASE TO TRIAL/JUDGMENT SET 3/21/22 AT 8:00 IN DEPT. CLEH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • HEARING RE: NON PROOF OF SERVICE SET ON 3/20/20 AT 8:00 IN DEPT CLEH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT DATE RE: PROOF OF SERVICE SET ON 5/22/17 AT 8:00 IN DEPT. CLEH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • SUMMONS FILED - DISSOLUTION WITH CHILD(REN) FILED 03/21/2017 OF TODD BENNETT (FL-110/FL-210/FL-510)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • DATE OF SEPARATION (PETITIONER): 02/23/17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • PETITION FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • PETITIONER'S PLACE OF RESIDENCE TEMECULA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • DATE OF MARRIAGE (PETITIONER): 07/09/06

    Read MoreRead Less