Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 12/06/2017 at 12:48:38 (UTC).

BELTRAN; ET AL VS JOHN F KENNEDY;ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/29/2010 BELTRAN filed an Other lawsuit against JOHN F KENNEDY. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Indio Larson Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3724

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indio Larson Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ARACELI M BELTRAN

CARLOS TARANGO

Defendants

JOHN F KENNEDY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL

VALLEY WOMANCARE

GARY S BERNARD DO

HERB S BRAR MD

HARBINDER BRAR MD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHELS & WATKINS

11755 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1300

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Defendant Attorneys

AGAJANIAN MCFALL WEISS TETREAULT & CRIST LL

AGAJANIAN MCFALL WEISS TETREAULT & CRIST

346 N Larchmont Blvd

Los Angeles, CA 90004

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

221 N. Figueroa St. Suite 1200

Los Angeles, CA 90012

LA FOLLETTE, JOHNSON, DE HAAS & FESLER

2677 N. Main Street Suite 901

Santa Ana, CA 92701

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - S

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - SUMMONS ISSUED.

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEP

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 2F FOR CASE MANAGEMENT PURPOSES.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FI

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 04/29/2010 OF ARACELI BELTRAN AND FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 04/29/2010 OF ARACELI BELTRAN AS TO VALLEY WOMANCARE; MAILING DATE OF 10/11/10 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 04/29/2010 OF ARACELI BELTRAN AS TO GARY S BERNARD DO; MAILING DATE OF 10/13/10 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 04/29/2010 OF ARACELI BELTRAN AS TO HERB S BRAR MD; MAILING DATE OF 10/13/10 FILED.

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE BY ARAC

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE BY ARACELI M BELTRAN FILED.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY A

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY ARACELI M BELTRAN, CARLOS TARANGO FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 3.725.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 04/2

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 04/29/2010 OF ARACELI BELTRAN BY HARBINDER BRAR MD REPRESENTED BY LA FOLLETTE, JOHNSON, DE HAAS &FESLER FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 04/2

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 04/29/2010 OF ARACELI BELTRAN BY VALLEY WOMANCARE, GARY S BERNARD DO REPRESENTED BY LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITHLLP FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL BY VALLE

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL BY VALLEY WOMANCARE, GARY S BERNARD DO FILED

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 04/2

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 04/29/2010 OF ARACELI BELTRAN BY JOHN F KENNEDY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL REPRESENTED BY AGAJANIAN MCFALL WEISS TETREAULT & CRIST FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONF

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE BY ARACELI M BELTRAN, CARLOS TARANGO FILED.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY ARACELI M BELTRAN, CARLOS TARANGO

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY VALLEY WOMANCARE, GARY S BERNARD DO, HARBINDER BRAR MD

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PRE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION FILED

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL A

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED.

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2012
  • DATE TO SET OSC RE DESTRUCTION OF FILE (DISMISSAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2011
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY VALLEY WOMANCARE, GARY S BERNARD DO, HARBINDER BRAR MD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY ARACELI M BELTRAN, CARLOS TARANGO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE BY ARACELI M BELTRAN, CARLOS TARANGO FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 04/29/2010 OF ARACELI BELTRAN BY JOHN F KENNEDY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL REPRESENTED BY AGAJANIAN MCFALL WEISS TETREAULT & CRIST FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL BY VALLEY WOMANCARE, GARY S BERNARD DO FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 04/29/2010 OF ARACELI BELTRAN BY VALLEY WOMANCARE, GARY S BERNARD DO REPRESENTED BY LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITHLLP FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 10/21/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASE BY ARACELI M BELTRAN FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 04/29/2010 OF ARACELI BELTRAN AS TO HERB S BRAR MD; MAILING DATE OF 10/13/10 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 04/29/2010 OF ARACELI BELTRAN AS TO GARY S BERNARD DO; MAILING DATE OF 10/13/10 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 04/29/2010 OF ARACELI BELTRAN SERVED ON JOHN F KENNEDY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL WITH SERVICE DATE OF 10/08/10 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 04/29/2010 OF ARACELI BELTRAN AS TO VALLEY WOMANCARE; MAILING DATE OF 10/11/10 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2010
  • NON-PROOF OF SERVICE (NON-APPEARANCE) HEARING; Disposition: OSC SET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 04/29/2010 OF ARACELI BELTRAN AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 2F FOR CASE MANAGEMENT PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JFK MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant