This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/30/2016 at 13:56:09 (UTC).

BEELINE VS FLORES

Case Summary

On 06/19/2014 BEELINE filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against FLORES. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Temecula Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1358

  • Filing Date:

    06/19/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Temecula Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BEELINE AS AGENTS FOR LAURIE BALLARD

Defendant

OLGA FLORES

Lake Elsinore, CA 92532

Other

UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HOLT, CHRISTINA M

570 Central Ave Suite D1

Lake Elsinore, CA 92530

LAW OFFICES OF CHRISTINE M HOLT

570 Central Ave Suite D1

Lake Elsinore, CA 92530

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DET

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000. (TEMECULA)

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92532.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES.

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER CO

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/19/2014 OF BEELINE AS AGENTS FOR LAURIE BALLARD BY OLGA FLORES REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. ($10,000 OR UNDER)

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF AN

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF ANSWER ON CHRISTINA M HOLT WITH A MAILING DATE OF 06/27/14 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT)

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILE

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY OLGA FLORES IS GRANTED; CLERK CSMITH (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE O

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/19/2014 OF BEELINE AS AGENTS FOR LAURIE BALLARD AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S), WITH POSTING AND MAILING DATE OF 06/26/14 FILED(ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS)

REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-

REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY BEELINE AS AGENTS FOR LAURIE BALLARD - TEMECULA (FORM UD-150).

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, U

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/19/2014 OF BEELINE AS AGENTS FOR LAURIE BALLARD AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO OLGA FLORES WITH SERVICE DATE OF 06/25/14 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE)

CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECO

CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR (APPLICABLE UNIT OF MEDIUM WAS 07/18/14 T1 COMMISSIONER JOAN F BURGESS).

NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS

NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS - ENTIRE CASE AUTOMATIC STAY FILING IN ANOTHER COURT (BANKRUPTCY, ETC) BY OLGA FLORES FILED (FORM CM-180).

JUDGMENT AFTER TRIAL BY COURT

JUDGMENT AFTER TRIAL BY COURT UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED SIGNED BY HONORABLE COMMISSIONER JOAN F BURGESS.

FILED: RELIEF FROM BANKRUPTCY

FILED: RELIEF FROM BANKRUPTCY STAY

CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECO

CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR (APPLICABLE UNIT OF MEDIUM WAS 08/22/14 T1 COMMISSIONER JOAN F BURGESS).

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSU

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY BEELINE AS AGENTS FOR LAURIE BALLARD.

FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT O

FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT OF POSSESSION AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY; UNSATISFIED FILED.

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT OF POSSESSION AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY; UNSATISFIED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY BEELINE AS AGENTS FOR LAURIE BALLARD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2014
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR RIVERSIDE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR (APPLICABLE UNIT OF MEDIUM WAS 08/22/14 T1 COMMISSIONER JOAN F BURGESS).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • FILED: RELIEF FROM BANKRUPTCY STAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT AFTER TRIAL BY COURT UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED SIGNED BY HONORABLE COMMISSIONER JOAN F BURGESS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2014
  • COURT TRIAL UNLAWFUL DETAINER - TEMECULA.; Disposition: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2014
  • DATE TO SEND NOTICE RE OSC ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS - ENTIRE CASE AUTOMATIC STAY FILING IN ANOTHER COURT (BANKRUPTCY, ETC) BY OLGA FLORES FILED (FORM CM-180).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR (APPLICABLE UNIT OF MEDIUM WAS 07/18/14 T1 COMMISSIONER JOAN F BURGESS).

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 06/27/2014
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY OLGA FLORES (FORM FW-001).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/19/2014 OF BEELINE AS AGENTS FOR LAURIE BALLARD BY OLGA FLORES REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. ($10,000 OR UNDER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2014
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2014
  • HEARING RE: UD OSC SET 8/18/14 AT 8:00 IN TCLRK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92532.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000. (TEMECULA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2014
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT T1 - UNLAWFUL DETAINER. (TEMECULA)

    Read MoreRead Less