This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 02/03/2017 at 04:09:43 (UTC).

BEAN VS MAYFIELD

Case Summary

On 09/16/2016 BEAN filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MAYFIELD. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Moreno Valley Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3378

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CATALINA BEAN

JAMES BEAN

Defendants

DEANDRA REI MAYFIELD

DONNIE MAYFIELD

MONETTE MARIE MAYFIELD

ISABEL PECINA

Other

UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF ROBERT A KRASNEY

362 West 6Th St

San Bernardino, CA 92401

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSU

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY JAMES BEAN, CATALINA BEAN.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT A

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY ON THE 1ST AMENDED UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT OF JAMES BEAN AS TO DONNIE MAYFIELD, ISABEL PECINA, MONETTE MARIE MAYFIELD, DEANDRA REI MAYFIELD, UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR R

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK -

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK - POSSESSION ONLY FILED 10/25/16

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE O

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, 1ST AMENDED UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT OF JAMES BEAN AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO DEANDRA REI MAYFIELD; AND MAILED ON 10/03/16 FILED.

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE O

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, 1ST AMENDED UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT OF JAMES BEAN AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S), WITH POSTING AND MAILING DATE OF 10/03/16 FILED(ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS)

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE O

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, 1ST AMENDED UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT OF JAMES BEAN AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO MONETTE MARIE MAYFIELD; AND MAILED ON 10/03/16 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, 1

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, 1ST AMENDED UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT OF JAMES BEAN AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO DONNIE MAYFIELD WITH SERVICE DATE OF 10/02/16 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE O

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, 1ST AMENDED UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT OF JAMES BEAN AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO ISABEL PECINA; AND MAILED ON 10/02/16 FILED.

1ST AMENDED UNLAWFUL DETAINER

1ST AMENDED UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT OF JAMES BEAN FILED. (AMENDED COMPLAINT - SUPERIOR COURT)

AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLA

AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 09/16/2016 OF JAMES BEAN AND FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DET

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 09/16/2016 OF JAMES BEAN AND FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92551.

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DET

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000.(MORENO VALLEY)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2016
  • DocketDATE TO SEND NOTICE RE OSC ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR RIVERSIDE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY JAMES BEAN, CATALINA BEAN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY ON THE 1ST AMENDED UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT OF JAMES BEAN AS TO DONNIE MAYFIELD, ISABEL PECINA, MONETTE MARIE MAYFIELD, DEANDRA REI MAYFIELD, UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK - POSSESSION ONLY FILED 10/25/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, 1ST AMENDED UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT OF JAMES BEAN AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO DEANDRA REI MAYFIELD; AND MAILED ON 10/03/16 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, 1ST AMENDED UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT OF JAMES BEAN AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S), WITH POSTING AND MAILING DATE OF 10/03/16 FILED(ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, 1ST AMENDED UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT OF JAMES BEAN AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO MONETTE MARIE MAYFIELD; AND MAILED ON 10/03/16 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, 1ST AMENDED UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT OF JAMES BEAN AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO DONNIE MAYFIELD WITH SERVICE DATE OF 10/02/16 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 09/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 09/16/2016 OF JAMES BEAN AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 09/16/2016 OF JAMES BEAN AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2016
  • DocketPREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION ATTACHED TO THE COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2016
  • DocketHEARING RE: UD OSC SET 11/15/16 AT 8:00 IN FWMV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92551.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2016
  • DocketUNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2016
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000.(MORENO VALLEY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2016
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT MV1UD - UNLAWFUL DETAINER. (MORENO VALLEY)

    Read MoreRead Less