This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/11/2018 at 17:30:25 (UTC).

BAY SHORE OIL COMPANY VS WOODPARK DEVELOPMENT ETAL

Case Summary

On 03/05/2002 BAY SHORE OIL COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against WOODPARK DEVELOPMENT ETAL. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Indio Larson Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****7701

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2002

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BAY SHORE OIL COMPANY

Defendants

RAYMOND T TROLL AN INDIVIDUALAND TRUSTEE

THOMAS DEEMER

WOODPARK DEVELOPMENT COMPANY INC

TROLL-WOODPARK DEVELOPMENT

RAY TROLL DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION

111 VENTURE LLC

JOANN TROLL TESTAMENTARY TRUST

G SCOTT GAYNER

RAYMOND THOMAS TROLL TRUST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOSEPH A GIBBS & ASSOCIATES

74900 Highway 111 #222

Indian Wells, CA 92210

Defendant Attorney

ANDERHOLT BONNHEIM& CASDEN LLP

74770 Highway 111 #201

Indian Wells, CA 92210

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - S

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - SUMMONS ISSUED.

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEP

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 2H FOR ALL PURPOSES.

170.6 FILED BY BAY SHORE OIL C

170.6 FILED BY BAY SHORE OIL COMPANY AGAINST JUDGE CHRISTOPHER J. SHELDON GRANTED.

DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED 03

DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED 03/05/2002 OF BAY SHORE OIL COMPANY BY WOODPARK DEVELOPMENT COMPANY INC, TROLL-WOODPARK DEVELOPMENT, 111 VENTURE LLC, RAY TROLL DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION, RAYMOND THOMAS TROLL TRUST, JOANN TROLL TESTAMENTARY TRUST, RAYMOND T TROLL ANINDIVIDUALAND TRUSTEE, G SCOTT GAYNER, THOMAS DEEMER REPRESENTED BY ANDERHOLT BONNHEIM& CASDEN LLP FILED.

NOTICE OF DEFENDANTS DEMURRER

NOTICE OF DEFENDANTS DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FILED BY ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANTS

MEMO OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES I

MEMO OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT BY ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANTS.

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FI

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED

MOTION TO/FOR STRIKE PLAINTIFF

MOTION TO/FOR STRIKE PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT/MPAS BY WOODPARK DEVELOPMENT COMPANY INC, TROLL-WOODPARK DEVELOPMENT, 111 VENTURE LLC, RAY TROLL DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION, RAYMOND THOMAS TROLL TRUST, JOANN TROLL TESTAMENTARY TRUST, RAYMOND T TROLL ANINDIVIDUALAND TRUSTEE, G SCOTT GAYNER FILED

170.6 FILED BY WOODPARK DEVELO

170.6 FILED BY WOODPARK DEVELOPMENT COMPANY INC, TROLL-WOODPARK DEVELOPMENT, 111 VENTURE LLC, RAY TROLL DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION, RAYMOND THOMAS TROLL TRUST, JOANN TROLL TESTAMENTARY TRUST, RAYMOND T TROLL ANINDIVIDUALAND TRUSTEE, G SCOTT GAYNER AGAINST JUDGE CHARLES E STAFFORD GRANTED.

MEMO OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES I

MEMO OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS DEMURRER TO BAY SHORES COMPLAINT BY ATTORNEYS FOR PLAINTIFF.

MEMO OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES I

MEMO OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STRIKE BY ATTORNEYS FOR PLAINTIFF.

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FI

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED

OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS REQUE

OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE BY ATTORNEYS FOR DEFENDANT FILED

REPLY TO MPAS IN SUPPORT OF DE

REPLY TO MPAS IN SUPPORT OF DEFTS DEMUR TO PLFFS COMPLNT BY WOODPARK DEVELOPMENT COMPANY INC, TROLL-WOODPARK DEVELOPMENT, 111 VENTURE LLC, RAY TROLL DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION, RAYMOND THOMAS TROLL TRUST, JOANN TROLL TESTAMENTARY TRUST, RAYMOND T TROLL ANINDIVIDUALAND TRUSTEE, G SCOTT GAYNER FILED

REPLY TO MPAS IN SUPPORT OF MT

REPLY TO MPAS IN SUPPORT OF MTN TO STRIKE BY WOODPARK DEVELOPMENT COMPANY INC, TROLL-WOODPARK DEVELOPMENT, 111 VENTURE LLC, RAY TROLL DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION, RAYMOND THOMAS TROLL TRUST, JOANN TROLL TESTAMENTARY TRUST, RAYMOND T TROLL ANINDIVIDUALAND TRUSTEE, G SCOTT GAYNER FILED

MOTION TO/FOR LIFT STAY BY BAY

MOTION TO/FOR LIFT STAY BY BAY SHORE OIL COMPANY FILED

NOTICE OF LODGMENT IN SUPPORT

NOTICE OF LODGMENT IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF BAY SHORE OIL COMPANYS MOTION TO LIFT STAY FILED

MEMO OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES I

MEMO OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PLFF BAY SHORE OIL COMPANYS MOTION TO LIFT STAY BY ATTORNEYS FOR PLAINTIFF.

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2004
  • DATE TO SET OSC RE DESTRUCTION OF FILE (DISMISSAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2003
  • STATUS CONFERENCE; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2003
  • STATUS CONFERENCE; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2002
  • FILE SENT TO FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2002
  • STATUS CONFERENCE; Disposition: Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF STATUS CONFERENCE FILED BY ATTY FOR BAY SHORE OIL COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RULING RE: PLTFFS MOTION TO LIFT STAY FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2002
  • FILE SENT TO VOL 1 FILING VOL 5 IMAGING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2002
  • MOTION TO/FOR LIFT STAY BY BAY SHORE OIL COMPANY (HEARING); Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 03/19/2002
  • EX PARTE HEARING RE: REASSIGNMENT AND/OR HEARING SET 3/19/02 AT 8:30 IN DEPT 2H

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • 170.6 FILED BY BAY SHORE OIL COMPANY AGAINST JUDGE CHRISTOPHER J. SHELDON GRANTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2002
  • EX PARTE HEARING RE: REASSIGNMENT AND/OR HEARING SET 3/19/02 AT 8:30 IN DEPT 2H - RESCHEDULED TO:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2002
  • EX PARTE HEARING RE: REASSIGNMENT AND/OR HEARING SET 3/19/02 AT 8:30 IN DEPT 2F

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2002
  • STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING SET 9/03/02 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 2H - RESCHEDULED TO:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2002
  • STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING SET 9/03/02 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 2F

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2002
  • EX PARTE HEARING RE: REASSIGNMENT AND/OR HEARING; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 2H FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2002
  • STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING SET 9/03/02 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 2H

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less