This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 04/18/2018 at 06:47:47 (UTC).

BAUTISTA-RUANO VS PACIFIC HARVEST

Case Summary

On 06/14/2017 BAUTISTA-RUANO filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against PACIFIC HARVEST. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3139

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Palm Springs Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARIO BAUTISTA-RUANO

Defendants

PACIFIC HARVEST INC

PRIME TIME PACKINGLLC

TRI-COLOR FARMS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BEAMAN LAW

73733 Fred Waring Dr Suite 203

Palm Desert, CA 92260

Defendant Attorneys

KIRK & SIMAS

2550 Professional Parkway

Santa Maria, CA 93455

JACKSON LEWIS PC

200 Spectrum Center Dr Ste 500

Irvine, CA 92618

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF BEAMAN LAW FILED (ADDRESS PREVIOUSLY CHANGED ON SYSTEM)

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE FILED - CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT CRC 3.1385 (05B*RMCCOND) FORM CM-200.

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OF

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING REGARDING DISMISSAL.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PACIFIC HARVEST INC

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY TRI-COLOR FARMS LLC, PRIME TIME PACKINGLLC

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (P

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (PALM SPRINGS)

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92254.

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEP

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT PS2. (PALM SPRINGS)

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FI

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 06/14/2017 OF MARIO BAUTISTA-RUANO AND FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILE

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY MARIO BAUTISTA-RUANO IS DENIED; HONORABLE JUDGE CHARLES F HAINES (DENIED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Denied

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 06/14/2017 OF MARIO BAUTISTA-RUANO AS TO TRI-COLOR FARMS LLC; MAILING DATE OF 08/08/17 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 06/14/2017 OF MARIO BAUTISTA-RUANO AS TO PRIME TIME PACKINGLLC; MAILING DATE OF 08/08/17 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 06/14/2017 OF MARIO BAUTISTA-RUANO AS TO PACIFIC HARVEST INC; MAILING DATE OF 08/08/17 FILED.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 06/1

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 06/14/2017 OF MARIO BAUTISTA-RUANO BY PACIFIC HARVEST INC REPRESENTED BY KIRK & SIMAS FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 06/1

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 06/14/2017 OF MARIO BAUTISTA-RUANO BY TRI-COLOR FARMS LLC, PRIME TIME PACKINGLLC REPRESENTED BY JACKSON LEWIS PC FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2018
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: DISMISSAL AFTER CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385(C).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING REGARDING DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: DISMISSAL AFTER CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385(C) SET 7/16/18 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. PS2.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE FILED - CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT CRC 3.1385 (05B*RMCCOND) FORM CM-200.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • CHANGE ATTORNEY ON MARIO BAUTISTA-RUANO FROM BEAMAN LAW TO BEAMAN LAW ON ALL COMPLAINTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF BEAMAN LAW FILED (ADDRESS PREVIOUSLY CHANGED ON SYSTEM)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING; Disposition: TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE SET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY TRI-COLOR FARMS LLC, PRIME TIME PACKINGLLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • FAX FILING BY PACIFIC HARVEST INC ($2.00 PER PAGE).

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 06/16/2017
  • INITIAL FEE WAIVER FOR MARIO BAUTISTA-RUANO TO BE RETURNED BY 06/16/17. (CLERK'S CALENDAR); Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY MARIO BAUTISTA-RUANO IS DENIED; HONORABLE JUDGE CHARLES F HAINES (DENIED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • FWR HEARING SET FOR 06/16/17 AT 08:30 IS VACATED -FOR THE REASON: FEE WAIVER DENIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • NON-PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 8/14/17 AT 8:30 IN DEPT CLKP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 06/14/2017 OF MARIO BAUTISTA-RUANO AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT PS2. (PALM SPRINGS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • FEE WAIVER RETURNED SET 6/16/17 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. FWPS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY MARIO BAUTISTA-RUANO (FORM FW-001).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92254.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (PALM SPRINGS)

    Read MoreRead Less