This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 12/20/2017 at 14:42:41 (UTC).

BARRUS VS MITCHELL

Case Summary

On 05/17/2017 BARRUS filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MITCHELL. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Murrieta Southwest Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0790

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Murrieta Southwest Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JERRY BARRUS

Hemet, CA 92543

Defendants

ELIZABETH MITCHELL

Fallbrook, CA 92088

GARY MITCHELL

Fallbrook, CA 92088

Other

UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DET

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000.(SOUTHWEST)

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92562.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DET

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 05/17/2017 OF JERRY BARRUS AND FILED.

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER CO

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 05/17/2017 OF JERRY BARRUS BY GARY MITCHELL, ELIZABETH MITCHELL REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. ($10,000 OR UNDER)

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF AN

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF ANSWER ON JERRY BARRUS WITH A MAILING DATE OF 05/22/17 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT)

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILE

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY GARY MITCHELL IS GRA; CLERK P.THIPHAVONG (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILE

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY ELIZABETH MITCHELL IS GRA; CLERK P.THIPHAVONG (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-

REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY JERRY BARRUS - SOUTHWEST (FORM UD-150).

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, U

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 05/17/2017 OF JERRY BARRUS AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO ELIZABETH MITCHELL WITH SERVICE DATE OF 05/18/17 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, U

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 05/17/2017 OF JERRY BARRUS AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO GARY MITCHELL WITH SERVICE DATE OF 05/18/17 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE)

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT O

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 05/17/2017 OF JERRY BARRUS AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S) FILED.

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE O

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 05/17/2017 OF JERRY BARRUS AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S), WITH POSTING AND MAILING DATE OF 05/18/17 FILED(ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS)

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 05/17/2017 OF JERRY BARRUS REMOVE ATTORNEY PRO/PER FOR PARTY(S) JERRY BARRUS AND REPLACE WITH ATTORNEY LAW OFFICES OF WILLIAM E WINDHAM

CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECO

CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR FILED. (APPLICABLE UNIT OF MEDIUM WAS 06/09/17 S205 JUDGE ALBERT J. WOJCIK)

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 05/17/2017 OF JERRY BARRUS REMOVE ATTORNEY LAW OFFICES OF WILLIAM E WINDHAM FOR PARTY(S) JERRY BARRUS AND REPLACE WITH ATTORNEY PRO/PER

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2017
  • DATE TO SEND NOTICE RE OSC ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 05/17/2017 OF JERRY BARRUS REMOVE ATTORNEY LAW OFFICES OF WILLIAM E WINDHAM FOR PARTY(S) JERRY BARRUS AND REPLACE WITH ATTORNEY PRO/PER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR FILED. (APPLICABLE UNIT OF MEDIUM WAS 06/09/17 S205 JUDGE ALBERT J. WOJCIK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • COURT TRIAL UNLAWFUL DETAINER - SOUTHWEST.; Disposition: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 05/17/2017 OF JERRY BARRUS REMOVE ATTORNEY PRO/PER FOR PARTY(S) JERRY BARRUS AND REPLACE WITH ATTORNEY LAW OFFICES OF WILLIAM E WINDHAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 05/17/2017 OF JERRY BARRUS AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S), WITH POSTING AND MAILING DATE OF 05/18/17 FILED(ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 05/17/2017 OF JERRY BARRUS AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 05/17/2017 OF JERRY BARRUS AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO GARY MITCHELL WITH SERVICE DATE OF 05/18/17 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 05/17/2017 OF JERRY BARRUS AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO ELIZABETH MITCHELL WITH SERVICE DATE OF 05/18/17 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • COURT TRIAL UNLAWFUL DETAINER SET 6/09/17 AT 8:00 IN DEPT. S205 (SOUTHWEST).

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 05/22/2017
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY GARY MITCHELL (FORM FW-001).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 05/17/2017 OF JERRY BARRUS BY GARY MITCHELL, ELIZABETH MITCHELL REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. ($10,000 OR UNDER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • HEARING RE: UD OSC SET 7/17/17 AT 8:00 IN CLES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 05/17/2017 OF JERRY BARRUS AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92562.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000.(SOUTHWEST)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT S205 - UNLAWFUL DETAINER. (SOUTHWEST)

    Read MoreRead Less