Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/29/2016 at 09:34:52 (UTC).

BANNING LEASED HOUSING ASSOCIATES VS YANG

Case Summary

On 04/02/2014 BANNING LEASED HOUSING ASSOCIATES filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against YANG. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Banning Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0326

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Banning Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

BANNING LEASED HOUSING ASSOCIATES

Defendants and Appellants

NOU YANG

Banning, CA 92220

UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)

Other

APPELLATE DIVISIONOF RIVERSIDE COUNTY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorney

KIMBALL TIREY & STJOHN LLP

5510 Trabuco Rd

Irvine, CA 92620

Other Attorney

APPELLATE DEPARTMENT OF RIVERSIDE COUNTY

4100 Main St

Riverside, CA 92501

 

Court Documents

LIMITED CIVIL UNLAWFUL DETAINE

LIMITED CIVIL UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT

SUMMONS FILED.

SUMMONS FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92220.

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED - BANNING

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER CO

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/02/2014 OF BANNING LEASED HOUSING ASSOCIATES BY NOU YANG REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. ($10,000 OR UNDER)

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF AN

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF ANSWER-UNLAWFUL DETAINER ON HELAINE S ASHTON/KIMBALL TIREY & ST JOHN LLP WITH A MAILING DATE OF 04/15/14 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT)

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE O

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/02/2014 OF BANNING LEASED HOUSING ASSOCIATES AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S), WITH POSTING AND MAILING DATE OF 04/07/14 FILED(ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS)

NOTICE OF APPEAL (APPELLATE DI

NOTICE OF APPEAL (APPELLATE DIVISION) - LIMITED CIVIL CASE

FILED: STOP NOTICE RE: MISSING

FILED: STOP NOTICE RE: MISSING DOCUMENTS

EX PARTE APPLICATION RE MOTION

EX PARTE APPLICATION RE MOTION FOR STAY OF EXECUTION (BANNING)

NOTIFICATION OF FILING NOTICE

NOTIFICATION OF FILING NOTICE OF APPEAL.

FILED: STOP NOTICE RE: INCORRE

FILED: STOP NOTICE RE: INCORRECT PROOF OF SERVICE

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF NO

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF NOTICE OF APPEAL ON RESPONDENT WITH A MAILING DATE OF 05/27/14 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT)

FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT O

FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT OF POSSESSION AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY; SATISFIED FILED.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT ON

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT ON APPEAL ENTERED AS TO NOU YANG FOR FAILURE TO FILE DESIGNATIONS FILED. (LIMITED)

ORDER FROM THE APPELLATE DIV:T

ORDER FROM THE APPELLATE DIV:THE APPEAL ON THIS MATTER IS DISMISSED FILED

RECEIPT FOR EXHIBITS FILED BY

RECEIPT FOR EXHIBITS FILED BY EXHIBITS CLERK FROM DEPARTMENT B1.

REMITTITUR FROM APPELLATE COUR

REMITTITUR FROM APPELLATE COURT FILED; RULING DISMISSED; JUDGE SHARON J. WATERS, NONE ASSIGNED, NONE ASSIGNED, JUDGE OF THE APPELLATE PANEL.

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2015
  • CLERK'S CALENDAR - REVIEW EXHIBIT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • REMITTITUR FROM APPELLATE COURT FILED; RULING DISMISSED; JUDGE SHARON J. WATERS, NONE ASSIGNED, NONE ASSIGNED, JUDGE OF THE APPELLATE PANEL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2014
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSITION - APPEALS .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2014
  • COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION - APPEALS DISMISSAL BEFORE CERTIFICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT FOR EXHIBITS FILED BY EXHIBITS CLERK FROM DEPARTMENT B1.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2014
  • CLERK'S CALENDER - REVIEW EXHIBIT STATUS SET 3/09/15 AT 8:00 IN DEPT. RIEXH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER FROM THE APPELLATE DIV:THE APPEAL ON THIS MATTER IS DISMISSED FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT ON APPEAL ENTERED AS TO NOU YANG FOR FAILURE TO FILE DESIGNATIONS FILED. (LIMITED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT OF POSSESSION AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY; SATISFIED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF DEFAULT ON APPEAL ISSUED AS TO NOU YANG FOR FAILURE TO FILE DESIGNATIONS PURSUANT TO CRC 8.831(A). (LIMITED)

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 04/15/2014
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY NOU YANG (FORM FW-001).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF ANSWER-UNLAWFUL DETAINER ON HELAINE S ASHTON/KIMBALL TIREY & ST JOHN LLP WITH A MAILING DATE OF 04/15/14 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/02/2014 OF BANNING LEASED HOUSING ASSOCIATES BY NOU YANG REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. ($10,000 OR UNDER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED - BANNING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92220.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2014
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2014
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE SET 6/04/14 AT 13:30 IN DEPT. B1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2014
  • PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION ATTACHED TO THE COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • LIMITED CIVIL UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BANNING LEASED HOUSING ASSOCIATES I is a litigant