This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/29/2016 at 13:16:55 (UTC).

BANNING LEASED HOUSING ASSOCIATES VS TENNANT

Case Summary

On 06/25/2014 BANNING LEASED HOUSING ASSOCIATES filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against TENNANT. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Banning Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0656

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Banning Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANNING LEASED HOUSING ASSOCIATES I

Defendant

CHARLENE TENNANT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KIMBALL, TIREY & ST. JOHN LLP

5510 Trabuco Road

Irvine, CA 92620

KIMBALL TIREY & STJOHN LLP

5510 Trabuco Rd

Irvine, CA 92620

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DET

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000. (BANNING)

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92220.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWF

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/25/2014 OF BANNING LEASED HOUSING ASSOCIATES I SERVED ON CHARLENE TENNANT WITH SERVICE DATE OF 06/26/14 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSU

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY BANNING LEASED HOUSING ASSOCIATES I.

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK -

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK - POSSESSION ONLY FILED 07/02/14

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR R

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT A

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/25/2014 OF BANNING LEASED HOUSING ASSOCIATES I AS TO CHARLENE TENNANT

FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT O

FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT OF POSSESSION AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY; SATISFIED FILED.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES 1-10 BY BANNING LEASED HOUSING ASSOCIATES I FILED.

DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGME

DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER CCP 585(D)) FILED.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF COURT DEF

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT (DEFAULT POSSESSION ONLY PREVIOUSLY ENTERED) FILED.

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FO

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FOR COUNSEL REPRESENTING BANNING LEASED HOUSING ASSOCIATES I. ADDRESS CHANGED FOR: KIMBALL TIREY & STJOHN LLP FILED.

DECLARATION AND ORDER FOR COPI

DECLARATION AND ORDER FOR COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS / RENTAL AGREEMENT BY BANNING LEASED HOUSING ASSOCIATES I FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE GORDON R. BURKHART.

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY COURT U

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY COURT UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED . SIGNED BY HONORABLE JUDGE GORDON R. BURKHART.

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY COURT UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED . SIGNED BY HONORABLE JUDGE GORDON R. BURKHART.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION AND ORDER FOR COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS / RENTAL AGREEMENT BY BANNING LEASED HOUSING ASSOCIATES I FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE GORDON R. BURKHART.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FOR COUNSEL REPRESENTING BANNING LEASED HOUSING ASSOCIATES I. ADDRESS CHANGED FOR: KIMBALL TIREY & STJOHN LLP FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2014
  • SIGNED DECL OR ORDER/SIGNED DEFAULT JUDGMENT RECEIVED AND FORWARDED TO ORIGINATING COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2014
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT REVIEW - WESTERN (NON-APPEARANCE) SET 9/04/14 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. DJW.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT (DEFAULT POSSESSION ONLY PREVIOUSLY ENTERED) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER CCP 585(D)) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES 1-10 BY BANNING LEASED HOUSING ASSOCIATES I FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2014
  • DATE TO SEND NOTICE RE OSC ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT OF POSSESSION AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY; SATISFIED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 07/02/2014
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR RIVERSIDE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/25/2014 OF BANNING LEASED HOUSING ASSOCIATES I SERVED ON CHARLENE TENNANT WITH SERVICE DATE OF 06/26/14 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92220.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2014
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2014
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT B1 - UNLAWFUL DETAINER. (BANNING)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000. (BANNING)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2014
  • HEARING RE: UD OSC SET 8/25/14 AT 8:00 IN BCLRK

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.