Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/05/2016 at 17:05:29 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA VS. HERMILO ANDRADE

Case Summary

On 10/14/2011 BANK OF AMERICA filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against HERMILO ANDRADE. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0230

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

BANK OF AMERICA

Defendant and Appellant

HERMILO ANDRADE

Corona, CA 92879

Other

RIVERSIDE SUPERIORCOURT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorney

TFLG

202 Cousteau Place, Ste. 260

Davis, CA 95618

Other Attorney

RIVERSIDE JUDICIALDISTRICT - CIVIL

4050 Main Street

Riverside, CA 92501

 

Court Documents

NOTIFICATION OF FILING APPELLA

NOTIFICATION OF FILING APPELLATE CASE.

NOTICE OF FILING RECORD ON APP

NOTICE OF FILING RECORD ON APPEAL AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE FILED.

FILE: NTC OF FAILURE/FILE APP

FILE: NTC OF FAILURE/FILE APP OPENING BRIEF

FILE: APPLICATION FOR EXT/TIME

FILE: APPLICATION FOR EXT/TIME TO FILE BRIEF

APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF FILE

APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF FILED BY HERMILO ANDRADE.

FILE: RESPONDENTS MTN TO PURCH

FILE: RESPONDENTS MTN TO PURCHASE CLERKS TRANS

FILE: NTC OF FAILURE/FILE RESP

FILE: NTC OF FAILURE/FILE RESPONDENTS BRIEF

REQUEST FOR EXT/TIME TO FILE R

REQUEST FOR EXT/TIME TO FILE RESPONDENTS BRIEF BY RESPONDENT FILED.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF ORDER GRANTING EXT/TIME FILE BRIEF.

RESPONDENT'S BRIEF FILED BY BA

RESPONDENT'S BRIEF FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON APPEAL FI

NOTICE OF HEARING ON APPEAL FILED.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; ON APPEAL FILED 10/14/2011 OF HERMILO ANDRADE REMOVE ATTORNEY BARRETT DAFFIN FRAPPIER TREDER& WEISS LLP FOR PARTY(S) BANK OF AMERICA AND REPLACE WITH ATTORNEY TFLG

PER CURIAM OPINION FILED [LIMI

PER CURIAM OPINION FILED [LIMITED CIVIL]

REMITTITUR ISSUED BY APPELLATE

REMITTITUR ISSUED BY APPELLATE DEPARTMENT (DECISION OR ORDER OF 01/03/13 HAS NOW BECOME FINAL. BANK OF AMERICA SHALL RECOVER ITS COSTS ON APPEAL)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • REMITTITUR ISSUED BY APPELLATE DEPARTMENT (DECISION OR ORDER OF 01/03/13 HAS NOW BECOME FINAL. BANK OF AMERICA SHALL RECOVER ITS COSTS ON APPEAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PER CURIAM OPINION FILED [LIMITED CIVIL]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2013
  • PER CURIAM OPINION/JUDGMENT ON APPEAL IS AFFIRMED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2013
  • RULING ON MATTER SUBMITTED 11/09/12 RE: APPELLATE HEARING; Disposition: Court's Ruling on Submitted Matter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2012
  • HEARING ON APPEAL FROM JUDGMENT OF 09/06/11 (MVC1101180) (RIVERSIDE).; Disposition: Taken Under Submissio

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; ON APPEAL FILED 10/14/2011 OF HERMILO ANDRADE REMOVE ATTORNEY BARRETT DAFFIN FRAPPIER TREDER& WEISS LLP FOR PARTY(S) BANK OF AMERICA AND REPLACE WITH ATTORNEY TFLG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2012
  • HEARING ON APPEAL (RIVERSIDE) SET 11/09/12 AT 13:30 IN DEPT. 10A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON APPEAL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • NO REPLY BRIEF FILED/ FULLY BRIEFED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2012
  • APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF DUE 8/22/12 AT 8:00 IN DEPTAPP.

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 01/10/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF FILING RECORD ON APPEAL AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2012
  • APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF DUE 2/09/12 AT 8:00 IN DEPT. APP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2011
  • FILE: CERTIFIED RECORD ON APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2011
  • RECEIVED: CERTIFIED RECORD OF APPEAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2011
  • DESIGNATION OF RECORD ON APPEAL BY HERMILO ANDRADE DUE 10/24/11; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTIFICATION OF FILING APPELLATE CASE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2011
  • DESIGNATION OF RECORD ON APPEAL SET 10/24/11, @ 8:00, IN DEPARTMENT APP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2011
  • APPEAL FROM JUDGMENT OF 09/16/11 (MVC1101180)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2011
  • RECORD ON APPEAL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2011
  • MORENO VALLEY JUDICIAL DISTRICT (MVC1101180).

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RIVERSIDE SUPERIORCOURT is a litigant

Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant