This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/23/2016 at 22:36:34 (UTC).

ASHLEY HACKSHAW;ET AL VS PATTI H RICHARDSON MD;ET

Case Summary

On 05/29/2012 ASHLEY HACKSHAW filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against PATTI H RICHARDSON MD ET. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Indio Larson Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3777

  • Filing Date:

    05/29/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indio Larson Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ASHLEY HACKSHAW

BRETT HACKSHAW

Defendants

PATTI H RICHARDSON MD

ENRIQUE G JACOME MD

EISENHOWER MEDICALCENTER

EISENHOWER MEDICALCENTER PATHOLOGY DEPARTM

COACHELLA VALLEY PATHOLOGY ASSOCIATES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ALLIS, NICHOLAS R.

12121 Wilshire Blvd., Ste. 800

Los Angeles, CA 90025

LAW OFFICES OF NICHOLAS R ALLIS

12121 Wilshire Blvd Suite 800

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Defendant Attorneys

KRAMER DEBOER ENDELICATO & KEANE

74830 Highway 111 Suite 200

Indian Wells, CA 92210

KRAMER DEBOER & KEANE

74-770 Us Highway 111 Ste 201

Indian Wells, CA 92210

LA FOLLETTE JOHNSON DE HAAS FESLER & AMES

2677 N. Main Street Suite 901

Santa Ana, CA 92705

LAFOLLETE JOHNSON DE HAAS FESLER & AMES

2677 N Main St Ste 901

Santa Ana, CA 92705

AGAJANIAN MCFALL WEISS TETREAULT & CRIST LL

346 N Larchmont Blvd

Los Angeles, CA 90004

AGAJANIAN MCFALL WEISS TETREAULT & CRIST

346 N Larchmont Blvd

Los Angeles, CA 90004

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL ON TH

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 05/29/2012 OF ASHLEY HACKSHAW SERVED ON ENRIQUE G JACOME MD FILED; DATE OF MAILING 06/20/12

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED 0

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED 05/29/2012 OF ASHLEY HACKSHAW NAMING DOES 26 TO BE COACHELLA VALLEY PATHOLOGY ASSOCIATES FILED.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY EISENHOWER MEDICALCENTER

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY ENRIQUE G JACOME MD

NOTICE OF FIRM NAME CHANGE BY

NOTICE OF FIRM NAME CHANGE BY PATTI H RICHARDSON MD, COACHELLA VALLEY PATHOLOGY ASSOCIATES FILED.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY EISENHOWER MEDICALCENTER

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS BY

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS BY PATTI H RICHARDSON MD FILED.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ON COMPL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ON COMPLAINT FILED 05/29/2012 OF ASHLEY HACKSHAW AS TO DEFENDANT EISENHOWER MEDICALCENTER FILED WITH PREJUDICE.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL A

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED.

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT FILED 05/29/2012 OF ASHLEY HACKSHAW BY ENRIQUE G JACOME MD FILED

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF OF UNDIS

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS FILED BY ENRIQUE G JACOME MD.

FILED: ENRIQUE G JACOME MD SEP

FILED: ENRIQUE G JACOME MD SEPARATELY BOUND DOCUMENTARY EVIDENCE VOL IV OF IV(EX R-S)

MOTION IN LIMINE RE: NO 5 PREC

MOTION IN LIMINE RE: NO 5 PRECLUDING EXPERTS FROM TESTIFYING REGARDING THEIR PERSONAL PRACTICE FILED.

MOTION IN LIMINE RE: NO 6 RE:

MOTION IN LIMINE RE: NO 6 RE: EVIDENCE OF OTHER LAWSUITS SETTLEMENTS AND CALIFORNIA MEDICAL BOARD FILED.

MOTION IN LIMINE RE: NUMBER #3

MOTION IN LIMINE RE: NUMBER #3 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE AS TO WHETHER MEDICAL DOCTORS OTHER THAN DEFTS ACTED BELOW FILED.

MOTION IN LIMINE RE: NUMBER #4

MOTION IN LIMINE RE: NUMBER #4 EXCLUDE EVIDENCE THAT PLTFS EXPERT ONCOLOGIST HAS SYMPATHY FOR DEFTS FILED.

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE FILED - UNCONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT CRC 3.1385 [FORM CM 200].

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ON COMPL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ON COMPLAINT FILED 05/29/2012 OF ASHLEY HACKSHAW AS TO DEFENDANT PATTI H RICHARDSON MD FILED WITH PREJUDICE.

49 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2016
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: DISMISSAL AFTER UNCONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385(B).; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2014
  • --ALSO DISMISSAL ON COMPLAINT FILED 05/29/2012 OF ASHLEY HACKSHAW AS TO COACHELLA VALLEY PATHOLOGY ASSOCIATES FILED WITH PREJUDICE--

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ON COMPLAINT FILED 05/29/2012 OF ASHLEY HACKSHAW AS TO DEFENDANT PATTI H RICHARDSON MD FILED WITH PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2014
  • RETURN TO COURT'S CONTROL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2014
  • JURY TRIAL; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING REGARDING DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2014
  • FAX FILING BY ASHLEY HACKSHAW, BRETT HACKSHAW ($1.50 PER PAGE).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2014
  • RETURN TO COURT'S CONTROL

    Read MoreRead Less
76 More Docket Entries
  • 07/12/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 05/29/2012 OF ASHLEY HACKSHAW SERVED ON EISENHOWER MEDICALCENTER PATHOLOGY DEPARTM WITH SERVICE DATE OF 06/28/12 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF LAW OFFICES OF NICHOLAS R ALLIS FILED (ADDRESS PREVIOUSLY CHANGED ON SYSTEM)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDED SUMMONS FILED BY ASHLEY HACKSHAW, BRETT HACKSHAW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 05/29/2012 OF ASHLEY HACKSHAW SERVED ON ENRIQUE G JACOME MD FILED; DATE OF MAILING 06/20/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED 05/29/2012 OF ASHLEY HACKSHAW AS TO ENRIQUE G JACOME MD WITH RECEIPT DATE OF 06/14/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 05/29/2012 OF ASHLEY HACKSHAW BY ENRIQUE G JACOME MD REPRESENTED BY LAFOLLETE JOHNSON DE HAAS FESLER & AMES FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 05/29/2012 OF ASHLEY HACKSHAW FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE OR CITY/COMMUNITY IS 92270.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 2H FOR CASE MANAGEMENT PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less