This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/06/2018 at 18:48:59 (UTC).

ARROW FINANCIAL SERVICES VS WASHINGTON

Case Summary

On 05/12/2008 ARROW FINANCIAL SERVICES filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against WASHINGTON. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Blythe Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4310

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ARROW FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC

Defendants

YSABELE MUNOZ

VERONICA A WASHINGTON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MANN BRACKEN LLC

2325 Clayton Road

Concord, CA 94520

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK F

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK FILED (ENTIRE ACTION)

REQUEST FOR CLERK JUDGMENT ON

REQUEST FOR CLERK JUDGMENT ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF ARROW FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC AS TO VERONICA A WASHINGTON FILED

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/ROES ON THE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF ARROW FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC FILED.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ON 1ST A

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF ARROW FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC AS TO DEFENDANT YSABELE MUNOZ FILED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT O

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF ARROW FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC AS TO VERONICA A WASHINGTON FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF ARROW FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC AS TO VERONICA A WASHINGTON; MAILING DATE OF 01/02/09 FILED.

DECLARATION RE NON SERVICE OF

DECLARATION RE NON SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON YSABELE MUNOZ FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED ON 1ST AMENDED

SUMMONS ISSUED ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF ARROW FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC AND FILED.

1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF ARROW

1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF ARROW FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC FILED. (AMENDED COMPLAINT - SUPERIOR COURT)

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME FILED; CHANGE FIRM ESKANOS & ADLER FOR PARTY(S) ARROW FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC TO FIRM MANN BRACKEN LLC.

AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE FILED

AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON COMPLAINT FILED 05/12/2008 OF ARROW FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC AS TO VERONICA A WASHINGTON WITH SERVICE DATE OF 05/21/08.

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 05/12/2008 OF ARROW FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC AS TO VERONICA A WASHINGTON; MAILING DATE OF 05/30/08 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 05/12/2008 OF ARROW FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC SERVED ON VERONICA A WASHINGTON WITH SERVICE DATE OF 05/21/08 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FI

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 05/12/2008 OF ARROW FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC AND FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

LIMITED CIVIL - GENERAL CIVIL

LIMITED CIVIL - GENERAL CIVIL COMPLAINT OVER $10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED.

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2019
  • DocketDATE TO SET OSC RE DESTRUCTION OF FILE (JUDGMENT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2009
  • DocketABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2009
  • DocketDATE TO SET OSC FOR FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT.; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK FILED (ENTIRE ACTION)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR CLERK JUDGMENT ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF ARROW FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC AS TO VERONICA A WASHINGTON FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/ROES ON THE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF ARROW FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF ARROW FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC AS TO DEFENDANT YSABELE MUNOZ FILED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2009
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF ARROW FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC AS TO VERONICA A WASHINGTON (SINGLE DEFENDANT ONLY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF ARROW FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC AS TO VERONICA A WASHINGTON FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF ARROW FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC AS TO VERONICA A WASHINGTON; MAILING DATE OF 01/02/09 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 08/15/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON COMPLAINT FILED 05/12/2008 OF ARROW FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC AS TO VERONICA A WASHINGTON WITH SERVICE DATE OF 05/21/08.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 05/12/2008 OF ARROW FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC AS TO VERONICA A WASHINGTON; MAILING DATE OF 05/30/08 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 05/12/2008 OF ARROW FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC SERVED ON VERONICA A WASHINGTON WITH SERVICE DATE OF 05/21/08 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 05/12/2008 OF ARROW FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2008
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 260 - BLYTHE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2008
  • DocketNON PROOF OF SERVICE (NON-APPEARANCE) HEARING (ASSIGNEE COLLECTION) SET 11/14/08 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT 260.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2008
  • DocketDATE TO SET OSC FOR FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT SET 5/08/09 AT 10:00 IN DEPT. CLKB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2008
  • DocketBNPS HEARING SET FOR 11/21/08 AT 10:00 IS VACATED -FOR THE REASON: SET WRONG HRG CODE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIMITED CIVIL - GENERAL CIVIL COMPLAINT OVER $10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ARROW FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC is a litigant