This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 09/29/2018 at 06:45:25 (UTC).

ARMENDARIZ VS SENECA ELEMENTARY SCHOOL

Case Summary

On 04/12/2017 ARMENDARIZ filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against SENECA ELEMENTARY SCHOOL. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6394

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LETICIA ARMENDARIZ

Defendants

MALISSA WYRICK

COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE

MORENO VALLEY SCHOOL DISTRICT

SENECA ELEMENTARY SCHOOL

SAADIA CLEMENTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCCARTY LAW

240&1/2 Main St

Seal Beach, CA 90740-6318

Defendant Attorneys

WALSH & ASSOCIATESAPC

16633 Ventura Blvd., Ste. 800

Encino, CA 91436

WALSH & ASSOCIATES, APC

16633 Ventura Blvd. Ste. 800

Encino, CA 91436

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PRE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION FILED

MINUTE ORDER: CONTINUANCE OF 9

MINUTE ORDER: CONTINUANCE OF 9/18/18 HEARING

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE FILED - CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT CRC 3.1385 (05B*RMCCOND) FORM CM-200.

2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT OF LETIC

2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT OF LETICIA ARMENDARIZ FILED. (AMENDED COMPLAINT - SUPERIOR COURT)

NOTICE OF RULING RE: DEFTS DEM

NOTICE OF RULING RE: DEFTS DEMURRER TO PLFTS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED

REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION

REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS BY MORENO VALLEY SCHOOL DISTRICT FILED

OPPOSITION TO MORENO VALLEY UN

OPPOSITION TO MORENO VALLEY UNIFIED DEMURRER TO 1ST AMEN COMPL BY LETICIA ARMENDARIZ FILED UNTIMELY PER 1005CCP/3.1300(D)CRC/437C(B)CCP.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY M

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY MORENO VALLEY SCHOOL DISTRICT FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 3.725.

DEMURRER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLA

DEMURRER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF LETICIA ARMENDARIZ BY MORENO VALLEY SCHOOL DISTRICT REPRESENTED BY WALSH & ASSOCIATESAPC FILED. (OVER $25,000)

MOTION TO/FOR STRIKE PORTIONS

MOTION TO/FOR STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES BY MORENO VALLEY SCHOOL DISTRICT FILED

NOTICE OF DEPARTMENT RE-ASSIGN

NOTICE OF DEPARTMENT RE-ASSIGNMENT FOR LAW AND MOTION PURPOSES

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92553.

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OS

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OSC WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED.

DECLARATION OF KENNETH E GERTZ

DECLARATION OF KENNETH E GERTZ IN RESPONSE TO OSC WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FILED

MINUTE ORDER: CHANGES TO THE 1

MINUTE ORDER: CHANGES TO THE 10/10/17 HEARING(S)

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY LETICIA ARMENDARIZ.

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL ON TH

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 04/12/2017 OF LETICIA ARMENDARIZ SERVED ON MORENO VALLEY SCHOOL DISTRICT FILED; DATE OF MAILING 06/27/17

DECLARATION OF JOHN C MCCARTY

DECLARATION OF JOHN C MCCARTY IN RESPONSE TO ORDERS TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE FILED

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2018
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: DISMISSAL AFTER CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385(C).; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: DISMISSAL AFTER CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385(C).; Disposition: Continued Not Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: DISMISSAL AFTER CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385(C).; Disposition: Continued Not Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTE ORDER: CONTINUANCE OF 9/18/18 HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • HEARING RE: OSC RE: DISMISSAL OF ANY PARTY NOT AT-ISSUE; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NTC OF OSC HRNG RE DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE FILED - CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT CRC 3.1385 (05B*RMCCOND) FORM CM-200.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: DISMISSAL AFTER CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385(C) SET 9/18/18 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 07.

    Read MoreRead Less
66 More Docket Entries
  • 07/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF KENNETH E GERTZ IN RESPONSE TO OSC WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET 8/03/17 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 07.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OSC WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • NPSCTH HEARING SET FOR 06/12/17 AT 08:30 IS VACATED -FOR THE REASON: OSC RE:SANCTIONS SET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • NON-PROOF OF SERVICE CLERK'S TRACKING HEARING (NON-APPEARANCE); Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • NON-PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 6/12/17 AT 8:30 IN DEPT CLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 04/12/2017 OF LETICIA ARMENDARIZ AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92553.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 07. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less