This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 11/29/2018 at 22:49:36 (UTC).

ARCIGA VS KB HOME COASTAL INC

Case Summary

On 08/14/2013 ARCIGA filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against KB HOME COASTAL INC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Temecula Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1192

  • Filing Date:

    08/14/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JIANHUA HUANG

VANESSA GOMEZ

DELESHIA HORNE

ZAHIR HUSSAIN

CHANTI PAGE

TERESA HARRY

MTOC OANH DONG LE

GLORIA SANCHEZ

GABRIELA GUERRERO

Defendants and Cross Defendants

AMERICAN COATINGS INC

GOLDEN STATE FENCECOMPANY

WESTERN INSULATIONLP

STAR SHEET METAL INC

SANTANA CONCRETE INC

DYNAMIC PLUMBING SYSTEMS INC

JAMAR ELECTRIC TEMECULA INC

GYPSUM CONSTRUCTION

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

DYNAMIC PLUMBING SYSTEMS INC

Cross Defendants and Defendants

SAFE N SECURE GARAGE DOOR SPECIALISTS INC

AMERICAN COATINGS INC

CROWTHER PRENTISS CORPORATION

WESTERN INSULATIONLP

STAR SHEET METAL INC

FENCEWORKS INC

SANTANA CONCRETE INC

DYNAMIC PLUMBING SYSTEMS INC

JAMAR ELECTRIC TEMECULA INC

293 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHINNICK & RYAN LLP

1650 Hotel Circle North Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92108

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

FREDRICKSON, MAZEIKA & GRANT, LLP

5720 Oberlin Dr.

San Diego, CA 92121-1723

KOLETSKY MANCINI FELDMAN & MORROW

3460 Wilshire Blvd Eighth Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90010

BREMER, WHYTE, BROWN OMEARA LLP

21271 Burbank Blvd Suite 110

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

Other Attorneys

LAW OFFICE OF LAWRENCE M BUREK

550 North Parkcenter Drive Suite 204

Santa Ana, CA 92705

MARSHALL & FRENCH

17901 Von Karman Ave Ste 300

Irvine, CA 92614-7235

LIEDLE LARSON LIDL& VAIL

12520 High Bluff Dr #200

San Diego, CA 92130

PRENOVOST NORMANDIN BERGH & DAWE

2122 North Broadway Suite 200

Santa Ana, CA 92706-2614

LAW OFFICES OF MELISSA M BALLARD

1551 North Tustin Ave,Ste 100

Santa Ana, CA 92705

BRAUN & MELUCCI, LLP

7855 Ivanhoe Ave. Ste 400

La Jolla, CA 92037

BASSI EDLIN HUIE & BLUM LLP

515 S. Flower St #1020

Los Angeles, CA 90071

DIEDERICH & ASSOCIATES

9325 Sky Park Ct #230

San Diego, CA 92123

MCMAHON LYNCH LAW FIRM, INC

1250 Corona Pointe Ct, Ste 407

Corona, CA 92879

LAW OFFICES OF KEVIN PEGAN

One Macarthur Place Suite 650

Santa Ana, CA 92707

LAW OFFICES OF MARK S SIEGEL

401 West A St, Ste 1730

San Diego, CA 92101

TARLE LAW PC

5963 La Place Court #309

Carlsbad, CA 92008

LAW OFFICES OF RICHARD E BISHOP

One Mac Arthur Place #650

Santa Ana, CA 92707

ARCHER NORRIS

4695 Macarthur Court #350

Newport Beach, CA 92660

LETOFSKY * MCLAIN

3655 Nobel Dr Ste 400

San Diego, CA 92122

NEWMEYER & DILLIONLLP

895 Dove Street Fifth Floor

Newport Beach, CA 92660

10 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAIN

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF AGUSTIN ARCIGA BY PRECISION HOLDINGSINC REPRESENTED BY SCHAFFER, LAX, MCNAUGHTON & CHEN FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

MOTION TO/FOR VACATE DISMISSAL

MOTION TO/FOR VACATE DISMISSAL OF SELECTED CROSS DEFENDANTS PURSUANT TO SECTION 473 BY KB HOME COASTAL INC FILED

PROOF OF SERVICE OF MTN TO VAC

PROOF OF SERVICE OF MTN TO VACATE COURTS DISMISSAL SERVED ON SERVICE LIST SERVED 07/21/16 FILED (NON-COMPLAINT)

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRO

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE OF MINUTE ORDER DATED 07/25/16

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CL

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING.

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAIN

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF AGUSTIN ARCIGA BY WESTERN INSULATIONLP REPRESENTED BY FREDRICKSON, MAZEIKA & GRANT, LLP FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

PROOF OF SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC

PROOF OF SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC SERVICE OF ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT ON FILE&SERVE XPRESS SERVICE LIST WITH A SERVICE DATE OF 07/27/16 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT)

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NO

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING.

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CL

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING.

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE 1ST AM

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF AGUSTIN ARCIGA SERVED ON EDGE METALWORKS INC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 08/05/16 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE 1ST AM

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF AGUSTIN ARCIGA SERVED ON AQUATIC CO WITH SERVICE DATE OF 08/05/16 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE 1ST AM

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF AGUSTIN ARCIGA SERVED ON PACIFIC PRODUCTIONPLUMBING WITH SERVICE DATE OF 08/05/16 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

DECLARATION OF DILIGENCE AS TO

DECLARATION OF DILIGENCE AS TO AMERICAN COATINGS INC FILED

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE 1ST AM

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF AGUSTIN ARCIGA SERVED ON SANTANA CONCRETE INC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 08/05/16 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE 1ST AM

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF AGUSTIN ARCIGA SERVED ON BANKER INSULATION OF CALIFORNIAINC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 08/05/16 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE 1ST AM

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF AGUSTIN ARCIGA SERVED ON GYPSUM CONSTRUCTION WITH SERVICE DATE OF 08/05/16 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE 1ST AM

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF AGUSTIN ARCIGA SERVED ON ALLIANCE MECHANICALHEATING ANDAIR CONDITI WITH SERVICE DATE OF 08/05/16 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

DECLARATION OF DILIGENCE AS TO

DECLARATION OF DILIGENCE AS TO JAMAR ELECTRIC TEMECULA INC FILED

419 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: DISMISSAL AFTER CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385(C).; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER OF DISMISSAL; HONORABLE JUDGE CRAIG G. RIEMER.; Disposition: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF LORI J. GUTHRIE ESQ RE:OSC RE:DISMISSAL FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (OTHER) WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO AGUSTIN ARCIGA, CARLOS HI ACOSTA, ROBERT J ACOSTA FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: DISMISSAL AFTER CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385(C).; Disposition: Continued Not Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE OF MINUTE ORDERE DATED 12/18/17

    Read MoreRead Less
626 More Docket Entries
  • 01/24/2014
  • JURY FEE DEPOSIT OF $150.00 PAID BY AGUSTIN ARCIGA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF AGUSTIN ARCIGA BY KB HOME COASTAL INC REPRESENTED BY NEWMEYER & DILLIONLLP FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF AGUSTIN ARCIGA SERVED ON KB HOME COASTAL INC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 11/12/13 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF AGUSTIN ARCIGA FILED. (AMENDED COMPLAINT - SUPERIOR COURT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ON COMPLAINT FILED 08/14/2013 OF AGUSTIN ARCIGA AS TO PLAINTIFF SONIA SANCHEZ FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2013
  • COMPLEX CASE DESIGNATION FEE PAID ON COMPLAINT FILED 08/14/2013 OF AGUSTIN ARCIGA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92571.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED - COMPLEX CASE - SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2013
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (SOUTHWEST) SET 2/10/14 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. S303.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SAFE N SECURE GARAGE DOOR SPECIALISTS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where DYNAMIC PLUMBING SYSTEMS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where STAR SHEET METAL INC is a litigant

Latest cases where GYPSUM CONSTRUCTION is a litigant