Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/31/2021 at 09:28:19 (UTC).

ARCHITECTURAL DESIGN VS M.S. INDUSTRIAL

Case Summary

On 07/20/2020 ARCHITECTURAL DESIGN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against M S INDUSTRIAL. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Corona Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Christopher B. Harmon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3100

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Corona Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Christopher B. Harmon

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ARCHITECTURAL DESIGN & SIGNS INC.

ARCHITECTURAL DESIGN & SIGNS INC

Defendants

M.S. INDUSTRIAL SHEET METAL INCORPORATED

BAGHOUSE & INDUSTRIAL SHEET METAL SERVICES INC

BAGHOUSE AND INDUSTRIAL SHEET METAL SERVICE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BUCHALTER

18400 Von Karman Ave Ste 800

Irvine, CA 20512

BUCHALTER, A Professional Law Corp.

Attorney at BUCHALTER, A Professional Law Corp.

Defendant Attorney

JACOBS & DODDS

Attorney at JACOBS & DODDS

2151 Michelson Drive Ste 168

Irvine, CA 92612

 

Court Documents

Minute Order: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal After Settlement pursuant to Rule 3.1385(b)

07/28/2021: Minute Order: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal After Settlement pursuant to Rule 3.1385(b)

Notice of Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal After Settlement (CRC 3.1385)

01/19/2021: Notice of Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal After Settlement (CRC 3.1385)

Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil.

01/19/2021: Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil.

Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint of ARCHITECTURAL DESIGN & SIGNS INC.

12/28/2020: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint of ARCHITECTURAL DESIGN & SIGNS INC.

Notice of Document Return.

11/25/2020: Notice of Document Return.

Amended ANSWER filed by M.S. INDUSTRIAL SHEET METAL INCORPORATED

11/05/2020: Amended ANSWER filed by M.S. INDUSTRIAL SHEET METAL INCORPORATED

Declaration of MARK M SCOTT RE COMPLAINCE WITH CODE OF CCP 435.5 W/ RESPECT TO PLAINTIFFS DEMURRER TO ANSWER filed

10/15/2020: Declaration of MARK M SCOTT RE COMPLAINCE WITH CODE OF CCP 435.5 W/ RESPECT TO PLAINTIFFS DEMURRER TO ANSWER filed

Demurrer to Answer of Complaint of ARCHITECTURAL DESIGN & SIGNS INC. as to M.S. INDUSTRIAL SHEET METAL INCORPORATED filed by ARCHITECTURAL DESIGN & SIGNS INC..

10/15/2020: Demurrer to Answer of Complaint of ARCHITECTURAL DESIGN & SIGNS INC. as to M.S. INDUSTRIAL SHEET METAL INCORPORATED filed by ARCHITECTURAL DESIGN & SIGNS INC..

Answer to Complaint of ARCHITECTURAL DESIGN & SIGNS INC. by M.S. INDUSTRIAL SHEET METAL INCORPORATED represented by JACOBS & DODDS filed. ($10,000 or Under)

09/30/2020: Answer to Complaint of ARCHITECTURAL DESIGN & SIGNS INC. by M.S. INDUSTRIAL SHEET METAL INCORPORATED represented by JACOBS & DODDS filed. ($10,000 or Under)

Notice OF ASSIGNMENT AND TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE by ARCHITECTURAL DESIGN & SIGNS INC. filed.

07/29/2020: Notice OF ASSIGNMENT AND TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE by ARCHITECTURAL DESIGN & SIGNS INC. filed.

Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92880.

07/20/2020: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92880.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

07/20/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2021
  • HearingType: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal After Settlement pursuant to Rule 3.1385(b); Judicial Officer: Christopher B. Harmon; Location/Courtroom: Department C1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • HearingType: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal After Settlement pursuant to Rule 3.1385(b); Judicial Officer: Christopher B. Harmon; Location/Courtroom: Department C1; Disposition: Held - Pre-disposition OSC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal After Settlement pursuant to Rule 3.1385(b)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint of ARCHITECTURAL DESIGN & SIGNS INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • HearingType: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal After Settlement pursuant to Rule 3.1385(b); Judicial Officer: Christopher B. Harmon; Location/Courtroom: Department C1; Disposition: Held - Other pre-disposition hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal After Settlement pursuant to Rule 3.1385(b)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint of ARCHITECTURAL DESIGN & SIGNS INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • HearingType: Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil.; Judicial Officer: Christopher B. Harmon; Location/Courtroom: Department C1; Disposition: Held - Other pre-disposition hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal After Settlement (CRC 3.1385)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil.

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 09/30/2020
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Limited response: answer or other first paper filed by each party other than plaintiff amounts up to $10,000 including unlawful detainer (GC70614B); Amount: $255.00; Paid: $255.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 09/30/2020; Fine Description: Visa Receipt No.: CV200930-0258-V.1; Paid: $255.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Answer to Complaint of ARCHITECTURAL DESIGN & SIGNS INC. by M.S. INDUSTRIAL SHEET METAL INCORPORATED represented by JACOBS & DODDS filed. ($10,000 or Under); Filed By: M.S. INDUSTRIAL SHEET METAL INCORPORATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice OF ASSIGNMENT AND TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE by ARCHITECTURAL DESIGN & SIGNS INC. filed.; Filed By: ARCHITECTURAL DESIGN & SIGNS INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Limited complaint or other first paper amount up to $10,000 (GC70613B); Amount: $255.00; Paid: $255.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 07/21/2020; Fine Description: Master Card Receipt No.: CV200721-0125-MC.1; Paid: $255.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO DEPT FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92880.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued on Complaint of ARCHITECTURAL DESIGN & SIGNS INC. and filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Limited Civil - General Civil Complaint - Under $10K filed. (Corona)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketFilings: Complaint of ARCHITECTURAL DESIGN & SIGNS INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BAGHOUSE & INDUSTRIAL SHEET METAL SERVICES INC is a litigant

Latest cases where M.S. INDUSTRIAL SHEET METAL INCORPORATED is a litigant

Latest cases where ARCHITECTURAL DESIGN & SIGNS INC is a litigant