This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 12/20/2017 at 18:45:58 (UTC).

ANTELOPE VS RUIZ

Case Summary

On 07/20/2017 ANTELOPE filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against RUIZ. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Murrieta Southwest Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1230

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Murrieta Southwest Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANTELOPE RIDGE APARTMENTS LLC

Defendant

RUDY RUIZ

Menifee, CA 92585

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIMBALL TIREY & STJOHN LLP

2040 Main Street Suite 500

Irvine, CA 92614

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSU

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY ANTELOPE RIDGE APARTMENTS LLC.

CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECO

CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR FILED. (APPLICABLE UNIT OF MEDIUM WAS 10/06/17 S205 JUDGE ALBERT J. WOJCIK)

JUDGMENT AFTER TRIAL BY COURT

JUDGMENT AFTER TRIAL BY COURT UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED SIGNED BY HONORABLE JUDGE ALBERT J. WOJCIK.

FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT O

FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT OF POSSESSION AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY; SATISFIED FILED.

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DET

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000.(SOUTHWEST)

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92585.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DET

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 07/20/2017 OF ANTELOPE RIDGE APARTMENTS LLC AND FILED.

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR POST

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR POSTING AND MAILING OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; HONORABLE JUDGE ALBERT J. WOJCIK FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE BY POSTING AN

PROOF OF SERVICE BY POSTING AND MAILING OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 07/20/2017 OF ANTELOPE RIDGE APARTMENTS LLC AS TO RUDY RUIZ WITH A MAILING DATE OF 07/28/17

DEMURRER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER

DEMURRER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 07/20/2017 OF ANTELOPE RIDGE APARTMENTS LLC FILED BY RUDY RUIZ REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER. ($10,000 OR UNDER) (SOUTHWEST)

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILE

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY RUDY RUIZ IS GRA; CLERK M LOPEZ (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

NOTICE OF OPPOSITION TO DEMURR

NOTICE OF OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER BY ANTELOPE RIDGE APARTMENTS LLC FILED.

NOTICE OF RULING BY ANTELOPE R

NOTICE OF RULING BY ANTELOPE RIDGE APARTMENTS LLC FILED.

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER CO

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 07/20/2017 OF ANTELOPE RIDGE APARTMENTS LLC BY RUDY RUIZ REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. (OVER $10,000)

CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECO

CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR FILED. (APPLICABLE UNIT OF MEDIUM WAS 09/15/17 S205 JUDGE ALBERT J. WOJCIK)

REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-

REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY ANTELOPE RIDGE APARTMENTS LLC - SOUTHWEST (FORM UD-150).

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2017
  • DATE TO SEND NOTICE RE OSC ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT OF POSSESSION AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY; SATISFIED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT AFTER TRIAL BY COURT UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED SIGNED BY HONORABLE JUDGE ALBERT J. WOJCIK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR FILED. (APPLICABLE UNIT OF MEDIUM WAS 10/06/17 S205 JUDGE ALBERT J. WOJCIK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY ANTELOPE RIDGE APARTMENTS LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR RIVERSIDE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • COURT TRIAL UNLAWFUL DETAINER - SOUTHWEST.; Disposition: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • COURT TRIAL UNLAWFUL DETAINER SET 10/06/17 AT 8:00 IN DEPT. S205 (SOUTHWEST).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY ANTELOPE RIDGE APARTMENTS LLC - SOUTHWEST (FORM UD-150).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR FILED. (APPLICABLE UNIT OF MEDIUM WAS 09/15/17 S205 JUDGE ALBERT J. WOJCIK)

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 07/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR POSTING AND MAILING OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; HONORABLE JUDGE ALBERT J. WOJCIK FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • FEE PAID FOR ORDER FOR POSTING/PUBLICATION (SUMMONS) BY ANTELOPE RIDGE APARTMENTS LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • HEARING RE: UD OSC SET 9/18/17 AT 8:00 IN CLES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 07/20/2017 OF ANTELOPE RIDGE APARTMENTS LLC AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92585.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000.(SOUTHWEST)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT S205 - UNLAWFUL DETAINER. (SOUTHWEST)

    Read MoreRead Less