Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 12/20/2017 at 16:50:36 (UTC).

ANTELOPE RIDGE VS ARRIOLA

Case Summary

On 06/21/2017 ANTELOPE RIDGE filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ARRIOLA. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Murrieta Southwest Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1028

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Murrieta Southwest Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANTELOPE RIDGE APARTMENTS LLC

Defendants

ROSANGELICA ARRIOLA

ALINA BACH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIMBALL TIREY & STJOHN LLP

2040 Main Street Suite 500

Irvine, CA 92614

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DET

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000.(SOUTHWEST)

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92585.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DET

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/21/2017 OF ANTELOPE RIDGE APARTMENTS LLC AND FILED.

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR POST

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR POSTING AND MAILING OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; HONORABLE JUDGE ALBERT J. WOJCIK FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE BY POSTING AN

PROOF OF SERVICE BY POSTING AND MAILING OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/21/2017 OF ANTELOPE RIDGE APARTMENTS LLC AS TO ROSANGELICA ARRIOLA WITH A MAILING DATE OF 06/29/17

PROOF OF SERVICE BY POSTING AN

PROOF OF SERVICE BY POSTING AND MAILING OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/21/2017 OF ANTELOPE RIDGE APARTMENTS LLC AS TO ALINA BACH WITH A MAILING DATE OF 06/29/17

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT A

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/21/2017 OF ANTELOPE RIDGE APARTMENTS LLC AS TO ROSANGELICA ARRIOLA, ALINA BACH

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR R

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK -

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK - POSSESSION ONLY FILED 07/18/17

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSU

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY ANTELOPE RIDGE APARTMENTS LLC.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2017
  • DATE TO SEND NOTICE RE OSC ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR RIVERSIDE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY ANTELOPE RIDGE APARTMENTS LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK - POSSESSION ONLY FILED 07/18/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/21/2017 OF ANTELOPE RIDGE APARTMENTS LLC AS TO ROSANGELICA ARRIOLA, ALINA BACH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY POSTING AND MAILING OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/21/2017 OF ANTELOPE RIDGE APARTMENTS LLC AS TO ALINA BACH WITH A MAILING DATE OF 06/29/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY POSTING AND MAILING OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/21/2017 OF ANTELOPE RIDGE APARTMENTS LLC AS TO ROSANGELICA ARRIOLA WITH A MAILING DATE OF 06/29/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR POSTING AND MAILING OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; HONORABLE JUDGE ALBERT J. WOJCIK FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • FEE PAID FOR ORDER FOR POSTING/PUBLICATION (SUMMONS) BY ANTELOPE RIDGE APARTMENTS LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • HEARING RE: UD OSC SET 8/21/17 AT 8:00 IN CLES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/21/2017 OF ANTELOPE RIDGE APARTMENTS LLC AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92585.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000.(SOUTHWEST)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT S205 - UNLAWFUL DETAINER. (SOUTHWEST)

    Read MoreRead Less