Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 12/20/2017 at 07:09:07 (UTC).

ANSWER BAIL BONDS VS CARRAHER

Case Summary

On 03/21/2017 ANSWER BAIL BONDS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CARRAHER. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Banning Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0046

  • Filing Date:

    03/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Banning Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANSWER BAIL BONDS

474 W Orange Show Rd

San Bernardino, CA 92408

Defendants

LARRY CARRAHER

Apple Valley, CA 92307

RICHARD CARRAHER

San Bernardino, CA 92405

 

Court Documents

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF MINUTE ORDER RE:DISMISSAL.

PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - OVER $1500

PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - OVER $1500 AND LESS THAN OR EQUAL TO $5000 FILED. (BANNING)

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED)

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED) SMALL CLAIMS ON PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - BANNING FILED 03/21/2017 OF ANSWER BAIL BONDS AS TO LARRY CARRAHER, MAILING DATE OF 03/29/17 FILED. COSTS OF $75.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED)

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED) SMALL CLAIMS ON PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - BANNING FILED 03/21/2017 OF ANSWER BAIL BONDS AS TO RICHARD CARRAHER, MAILING DATE OF 03/29/17 FILED. COSTS OF $75.00.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2017
  • RETURN MAIL RECEIVED FOR MINUTE ORDER/JUDGMENT AS TO LARRY CARRAHER; REASON RETURNED: VACANT UNABLE TO FORWARD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • RETURN MAIL RECEIVED FOR RICHARD CARRAHER AS TO MINUTE ORDER/JUDGMENT FROM 4/17/17; REASON RETURNED: UNABLE TO FORWARD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF MINUTE ORDER RE:DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING - BANNING; Disposition: Hearing Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED) SMALL CLAIMS ON PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - BANNING FILED 03/21/2017 OF ANSWER BAIL BONDS AS TO LARRY CARRAHER, MAILING DATE OF 03/29/17 FILED. COSTS OF $75.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED) SMALL CLAIMS ON PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - BANNING FILED 03/21/2017 OF ANSWER BAIL BONDS AS TO RICHARD CARRAHER, MAILING DATE OF 03/29/17 FILED. COSTS OF $75.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • CLAIM AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED - BANNING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • ACTIVE MILITARY DUTY AS TO NONE (BANNING)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING SET 4/17/17, AT 13:30, IN B201

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - OVER $1500 AND LESS THAN OR EQUAL TO $5000 FILED. (BANNING)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENT B201. (BANNING)

    Read MoreRead Less