This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/08/2020 at 19:21:12 (UTC).

ANESKO vs DEVITIS

Case Summary

On 01/15/2019 ANESKO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DEVITIS. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0351

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Palm Springs Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NICOLE WEBSTER ANESKO

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

VALIA E DEVITIS

CHARLES DEVITIS

AVNEESH GILL

HERTZ VEHICLES LLC

CHARVAL DOUBLE D ANIMAL RESCUE

CHARVAL DOUBLE D ANIMAL RESCUERANCH INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF MICHAEL R KAISER

801 E Tahquitz Canyon Way Ste 101

Palm Springs, CA 92262

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

WESIERSKI & ZUREK LLP

One Corporate Park Ste 200

Irvine, CA 92606

FORD, WALKER, HAGGERTY & BEHAR

One World Trade Center Twenty-Seventh Floor

Long Beach, CA 90831-2700

 

Court Documents

MOTION TO DETERMINE GOOD FAITH

MOTION TO DETERMINE GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT BY AVNEESH GILL, HERTZ VEHICLES LLC FILED.

NOTICE OF RULING RE: MOTION FO

NOTICE OF RULING RE: MOTION FOR COURT DETERMINATION 6/4/2020 FILED

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE 1ST AM

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF NICOLE ANESKO SERVED ON CHARVAL DOUBLE D ANIMAL RESCUERANCH INC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 02/11/20 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ON 1ST A

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF NICOLE ANESKO AS TO DEFENDANT AVNEESH GILL, HERTZ VEHICLES LLC FILED WITH PREJUDICE.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF MINUTE ORDER DATED 01/21/2020.

AMENDMENT TO 1ST AMENDED COMPL

AMENDMENT TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF NICOLE ANESKO NAMING DOES 4 TO BE CHARVAL DOUBLE D ANIMAL RESCUERANCH INC FILED.

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILE

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 06/04/2019 OF VALIA DEVITIS BY AVNEESH GILL, HERTZ VEHICLES LLC REPRESENTED BY FORD, WALKER, HAGGERTY & BEHAR FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILE

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 07/25/2019 OF AVNEESH GILL BY VALIA E DEVITIS, CHARLES DEVITIS REPRESENTED BY WESIERSKI & ZUREK LLP FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

STIPULATION & ORDER TO SET ASI

STIPULATION & ORDER TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF NICOLE ANESKO AS TO HERTZ VEHICLES LLC; HONORABLE JUDGE DAVID M. CHAPMAN.

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAIN

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF NICOLE ANESKO BY AVNEESH GILL, HERTZ VEHICLES LLC REPRESENTED BY FORD, WALKER, HAGGERTY & BEHAR FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF AVNEESH GIL

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF AVNEESH GILL, HERTZ VEHICLES LLC REPRESENTED BY FORD, WALKER, HAGGERTY & BEHAR FILED (SUPERIOR COURT)

SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS COMPLA

SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 07/25/2019 OF AVNEESH GILL AND FILED.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT O

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF NICOLE ANESKO AS TO HERTZ VEHICLES LLC FILED.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY VALIA E DEVITIS, CHARLES DEVITIS.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY NICOLE WEBSTER ANESKO

STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR PERM

STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR PERMIT FILING OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINTAND PERMIT FILING OF CROSS COMPLAINT IS GRA; HONORABLE JUDGE DAVID M. CHAPMAN.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON 1ST AMENDED

SUMMONS ISSUED ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF NICOLE ANESKO AND FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE 1ST AM

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF NICOLE ANESKO SERVED ON HERTZ VEHICLES LLC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 06/04/19 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

46 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2020
  • HearingDept: PS2; Action text: HEARING RE STATUS CONFERENCE AS TO BANKRUPTCY OF HERTZ SHOULD STAY APPLY TO ANY OTHER PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • HearingDept: PS2; Action text: TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketHEARING RE STATUS CONFERENCE AS TO BANKRUPTCY OF HERTZ SHOULD STAY APPLY TO ANY OTHER PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketTRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • HearingDept: PS2; Action text: HEARING RE: MOTION TO DETERMINE GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT BY AVNEESH GILL, HERTZ VEHICLES LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • HearingDept: PS2; Action text: HEARING RESERVED FOR: MOTION FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT - RES103284; Disposition: Calendared (Reservation Hearings)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketHEARING RE: MOTION TO DETERMINE GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT BY AVNEESH GILL, HERTZ VEHICLES LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketHEARING RESERVED FOR: MOTION FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT - RES103284; Disposition: Calendared (Reservation Hearings)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE FOR HEARING RE: MOTION TO DETERMINE GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT ON 07/30/20 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT PS2.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketRETURNED DOCUMENT: NOTICE OF STAY RECEIVED ON 06/25/20 SUBMITTED BY HERTZ VEHICLES LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
125 More Docket Entries
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 01/15/2019 OF NICOLE ANESKO BY VALIA E DEVITIS, CHARLES DEVITIS REPRESENTED BY WESIERSKI & ZUREK LLP FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 01/15/2019 OF NICOLE ANESKO SERVED ON VALIA E DEVITIS WITH SERVICE DATE OF 01/19/19 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 01/15/2019 OF NICOLE ANESKO SERVED ON CHARLES DEVITIS WITH SERVICE DATE OF 01/19/19 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 01/15/2019 OF NICOLE ANESKO AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketCMC HEARING SET FOR 07/15/19 AT 08:30 IS VACATED -FOR THE REASON: SET IN ERROR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (PALM SPRINGS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT PS2. (PALM SPRINGS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • DocketNON-PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 3/18/19 AT 8:30 IN DEPT CLKP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92240.

    Read MoreRead Less