This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 12/24/2017 at 17:35:28 (UTC).

ANDRADE VS TWC ADMINISTRATION

Case Summary

On 06/20/2017 ANDRADE filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against TWC ADMINISTRATION. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1065

  • Filing Date:

    06/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ERNESTO ANDRADE

Defendants

SHANE GRAHAM

LILLIAN GOMEZ

DALE DRYSDALE

TWC ADMINISTRATIONLLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REYES & ASSOCIATESPC

3055 Wilshire Blvd., Ste 600

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Defendant Attorney

KABAT CHAPMAN & OZMER LLP

515 Flower Street 36Th Flr

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: DE

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: DEPARTMENT ASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES.

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 06/20/2017 OF ERNESTO ANDRADE SERVED ON TWC ADMINISTRATIONLLC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 08/03/17 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 06/20/2017 OF ERNESTO ANDRADE SERVED ON SHANE GRAHAM WITH SERVICE DATE OF 08/07/17 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 06/20/2017 OF ERNESTO ANDRADE SERVED ON DALE DRYSDALE WITH SERVICE DATE OF 08/08/17 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 06/20/2017 OF ERNESTO ANDRADE SERVED ON LILLIAN GOMEZ WITH SERVICE DATE OF 08/22/17 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 06/2

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 06/20/2017 OF ERNESTO ANDRADE BY TWC ADMINISTRATIONLLC, SHANE GRAHAM, DALE DRYSDALE, LILLIAN GOMEZ REPRESENTED BY KABAT CHAPMAN & OZMER LLP FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

170.6 CCP FILED BY TWC ADMINIS

170.6 CCP FILED BY TWC ADMINISTRATIONLLC, SHANE GRAHAM, DALE DRYSDALE, LILLIAN GOMEZ AGAINST JUDGE JOHN W VINEYARD IS GRANTED.

MINUTE ORDER: CHANGES TO THE 1

MINUTE ORDER: CHANGES TO THE 12/18/17 HEARING

APPLICATION TO APPEAR AS COUNS

APPLICATION TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE FOR TWC ADMINISTRATIONLLC, SHANE GRAHAM, DALE DRYSDALE, LILLIAN GOMEZ FILED BY NATHAN D CHAPMAN.

ORDER GRANTING VERIFIED APPLIC

ORDER GRANTING VERIFIED APPLICATION OF NATHAN D. CHAPMAN FOR; HONORABLE JUDGE SUNSHINE S SYKES.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY TWC ADMINISTRATIONLLC, SHANE GRAHAM, DALE DRYSDALE, LILLIAN GOMEZ

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY E

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY ERNESTO ANDRADE FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 3.725.

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (R

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (RIVERSIDE)

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92879.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FI

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 06/20/2017 OF ERNESTO ANDRADE AND FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILE

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY ERNESTO ANDRADE IS GRANTED; CLERK S.ACOSTA (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2018
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY ERNESTO ANDRADE FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 3.725.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY TWC ADMINISTRATIONLLC, SHANE GRAHAM, DALE DRYSDALE, LILLIAN GOMEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING; Disposition: Continued Not Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER GRANTING VERIFIED APPLICATION OF NATHAN D. CHAPMAN FOR; HONORABLE JUDGE SUNSHINE S SYKES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • HEARING RE: NATHAN D CHAPMAN TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE FOR TWC ADMINISTRATIONLLC, SHANE GRAHAM, DALE DRYSDALE, LILLIAN GOMEZ BY NATHAN D CHAPMAN.; Disposition: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • POS TIMELY/WAIVED - PROOF OF SERVICE ON MOTION TO/FOR APPEAR PRO HAC VICE ON CALENDAR 12/11/17 IS TIMELY/WAIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • COURT REPORTER FEE (UNDER ONE HOUR) PAID BY DEFT FOR HEARING 12/11/17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • HEARING RE: PRO HAC VICE SET 12/11/17 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 06

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE FOR TWC ADMINISTRATIONLLC, SHANE GRAHAM, DALE DRYSDALE, LILLIAN GOMEZ FILED BY NATHAN D CHAPMAN.

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 06/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: DEPARTMENT ASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • NON-PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 8/21/17 AT 8:30 IN DEPT CLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • FAX FILING BY ERNESTO ANDRADE ($2.00 PER PAGE).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • FEE WAIVER FOR ERNESTO ANDRADE WAS GRANTED FOR INITIAL COMPLAINT; $450.00 WAIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY ERNESTO ANDRADE IS GRANTED; CLERK S.ACOSTA (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY ERNESTO ANDRADE (FORM FW-001).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 06/20/2017 OF ERNESTO ANDRADE AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92879.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 07. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less