This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 11/20/2019 at 00:12:00 (UTC).

ANDRADE VS SUPERIOR PAVING COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/02/2019 ANDRADE filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against SUPERIOR PAVING COMPANY. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0121

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOSE ANDRADE

Defendants

UNITED PAVING CO

SUPERIOR PAVING COMPANY INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF RAMIN YOUNESSI APLC

3435 Wilshire Blvd Suite 2370

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Defendant Attorney

O'HAGAN MEYER LLC

4695 Macarthur Court Ste 210

Newport Beach, CA 92660

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FI

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 01/02/2019 OF JOSE ANDRADE AND FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92879.

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (R

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (RIVERSIDE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 01/02/2019 OF JOSE ANDRADE SERVED ON SUPERIOR PAVING COMPANY INC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 01/28/19 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 01/0

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 01/02/2019 OF JOSE ANDRADE BY SUPERIOR PAVING COMPANY INC REPRESENTED BY O'HAGAN MEYER LLC FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY JOSE ANDRADE.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY S

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY SUPERIOR PAVING COMPANY INC FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 3.725.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY JOSE ANDRADE

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CL

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING.

CASE REASSIGNED TO JUDGE SUNSH

CASE REASSIGNED TO JUDGE SUNSHINE S SYKES IN DEPARTMENT 06 FOR ALL FUTURE PROCEEDINGS. (RIVERSIDE)

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY S

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY SUPERIOR PAVING COMPANY INC FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 3.725.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY JOSE ANDRADE

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE BY SUPE

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE BY SUPERIOR PAVING COMPANY INC FILED.

CLASS ACTION CASE MANAGEMENT O

CLASS ACTION CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #1; HONORABLE SUNSHINE S. SYKES

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CL

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING.

JOINT REPORT REGARDING INITIAL

JOINT REPORT REGARDING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF CL

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF CLASS ACTION CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #1 ON MATT SGNILEK WITH A MAILING DATE OF 10/04/19 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2019
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING - COMPLEX CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING - COMPLEX CASE; Disposition: Continued Not Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • JOINT REPORT REGARDING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • ESUBMIT FEE BY JOSE ANDRADE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • ESUBMIT FEE BY JOSE ANDRADE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF CLASS ACTION CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #1 ON MATT SGNILEK WITH A MAILING DATE OF 10/04/19 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLASS ACTION CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #1; HONORABLE SUNSHINE S. SYKES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING - COMPLEX CASE; Disposition: Continued Not Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • COURT ON ITS OWN MOTION: CONTINUES CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY JOSE ANDRADE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • FIRST APPEARANCE FEE PAID BY SUPERIOR PAVING COMPANY INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 01/02/2019 OF JOSE ANDRADE BY SUPERIOR PAVING COMPANY INC REPRESENTED BY O'HAGAN MEYER LLC FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • NON-PROOF OF SERVICE CLERK'S TRACKING HEARING (NON-APPEARANCE); Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 01/02/2019 OF JOSE ANDRADE SERVED ON SUPERIOR PAVING COMPANY INC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 01/28/19 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • NON-PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 3/04/19 AT 8:30 IN DEPT CLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 01/02/2019 OF JOSE ANDRADE AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92879.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 04. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNITED PAVING CO. is a litigant

Latest cases where SUPERIOR PAVING COMPANY INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA UNITED PAVING CO. is a litigant