This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 11/03/2018 at 12:33:18 (UTC).

ANDRADE VS HEMATOLOGY-ONCOLOGY

Case Summary

On 08/14/2017 ANDRADE filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against HEMATOLOGY-ONCOLOGY. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0909

  • Filing Date:

    08/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PAULINA ANDRADE

Murrieta, CA 92563

Defendant

HEMATOLOGY-ONCOLOGY CONSULTANTS INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROBINSON BRADFORD LLP

43471 Ridge Park Dr.,Ste. C

Temecula, CA 92590

Defendant Attorney

TREDWAY LUMSDAINE & DOYLE

2010 Main St., Ste. 1000

Irvine, CA 92614

 

Court Documents

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL/ 10/16/18 MINUTE ORDER.

NOTICE OF RULING RE: TRIAL SET

NOTICE OF RULING RE: TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE FILED

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (SUMMARY)

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (SUMMARY) IN THE AMOUNT OF $$3,148.00 BY HEMATOLOGY-ONCOLOGYCONSULTANTSINC FILED.

NOTICE OF RULING RE: MOTIONS T

NOTICE OF RULING RE: MOTIONS TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSES FILED

NOTICE OF NON OPPOSITION TO MO

NOTICE OF NON OPPOSITION TO MOTIONS TO COMPEL BY HEMATOLOGY-ONCOLOGYCONSULTANTSINC FILED.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF MINUTE ORDER DATED 8/13/18.

MOTION TO/FOR COMPEL RESPONSES

MOTION TO/FOR COMPEL RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES SET ONE AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS BY HEMATOLOGY-ONCOLOGYCONSULTANTSINC FILED

MOTION TO/FOR DEEM THE TRUTH O

MOTION TO/FOR DEEM THE TRUTH OF THE MATTERS AND GENUINENESS OF DOCUMENTS SPECIFIED BY HEMATOLOGY-ONCOLOGYCONSULTANTSINC FILED

ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEY'S MOTI

ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FILED. HONORABLE JUDGE ANGEL M. BERMUDEZ. ATTORNEY IS RELIEVED AS COUNSEL EFFECTIVE: UPON FILING OF PROOF OF SERVICE.

DECLARATION OF MATTHEW C BRADF

DECLARATION OF MATTHEW C BRADFORD IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL FILED

MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNS

MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FOR PAULINA ANDRADE BYROBINSON BRADFORD LLP FILED (FORM MC-051).

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAIN

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF PAULINA ANDRADE BY HEMATOLOGY-ONCOLOGYCONSULTANTSINC REPRESENTED BY TREDWAY LUMSDAINE &DOYLE FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY P

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY PAULINA ANDRADE FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 3.725.

DECLARATION OF SHANNON MARIE J

DECLARATION OF SHANNON MARIE JENKINS ESQ RE: COURTS ORDER MEET AND CONFER FILED

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY HEMATOLOGY-ONCOLOGYCONSULTANTSINC.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY HEMATOLOGY-ONCOLOGYCONSULTANTSINC

NOTICE OF RULING RE: DEMURRER

NOTICE OF RULING RE: DEMURRER FILED

OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO 1ST

OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT BY PAULINA ANDRADE FILED

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY HEMATOLOGY-ONCOLOGYCONSULTANTSINC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (SUMMARY) IN THE AMOUNT OF $$3,148.00 BY HEMATOLOGY-ONCOLOGYCONSULTANTSINC FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RULING RE: TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL/ 10/16/18 MINUTE ORDER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL BY COURT; HONORABLE JUDGE RAQUEL A MARQUEZ FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Hearing Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • PAULINA ANDRADE/PRO/PER IS ORDERED TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE, IF ANY, WHY SANCTIONS NOT TO EXCEED $1500.00 OR DISMISSAL SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR AT TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE.; Disposition: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RULING RE: MOTIONS TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSES FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • RETURNED DOCUMENT: NTC OF RULING SUBMITTED BY HEMATOLOGY-ONCOLOGYCONSULTANTSINC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • HEARING RESERVED FOR: MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS - RES80592; Disposition: Calendared (Reservation Hearings)

    Read MoreRead Less
73 More Docket Entries
  • 10/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF PAULINA ANDRADE FILED. (AMENDED COMPLAINT - SUPERIOR COURT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • --ALSO SERVED 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF PAULINA ANDRADE ON HEMATOLOGY-ONCOLOGYCONSULTANTSINC WITH DATE OF MAILING 10/20/17--

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF PAULINA ANDRADE AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • NON-PROOF OF SERVICE CLERK'S TRACKING HEARING (NON-APPEARANCE); Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 08/14/2017 OF PAULINA ANDRADE SERVED ON HEMATOLOGY-ONCOLOGYCONSULTANTSINC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 09/11/17 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • NON-PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 10/13/17 AT 8:30 IN DEPT CLES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 08/14/2017 OF PAULINA ANDRADE AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92563.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (SOUTHWEST)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT S302. (SOUTHWEST)

    Read MoreRead Less