Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/24/2021 at 20:56:15 (UTC).

ANCHOR GENERAL VS BRAUN

Case Summary

On 07/20/2020 ANCHOR GENERAL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against BRAUN. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Murrieta Southwest Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Candice Garcia-Rodrigo. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3368

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Murrieta Southwest Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Candice Garcia-Rodrigo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANCHOR GENERAL INSURANCE CO

Defendant

ZEV LAWRENCE BRAUN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

REESE LAW GROUP, APROFESSIONAL LAW CORPORA

3168 Lionshead Ave

Carlsbad, CA 92010

REESE LAW GROUP, A PROFESSIONAL LAW CORPORA

Attorney at REESE LAW GROUP, A PROFESSIONAL LAW CORPORA

 

Court Documents

Judgment By Default By Court on Complaint of ANCHOR GENERAL INSURANCE CO

07/12/2021: Judgment By Default By Court on Complaint of ANCHOR GENERAL INSURANCE CO

Declaration of Carrier Submitted Pursuant to CCP 585 in Support of Default Judgment

02/26/2021: Declaration of Carrier Submitted Pursuant to CCP 585 in Support of Default Judgment

Declaration of Insured in Support of Default Judgment

02/26/2021: Declaration of Insured in Support of Default Judgment

Request for Dismissal

02/26/2021: Request for Dismissal

Certificate of Mailing

05/07/2021: Certificate of Mailing

Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

05/07/2021: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

Proof of Service on the Complaint of ANCHOR GENERAL INSURANCE CO served on ZEV LAWRENCE BRAUN with service date of 08/10/20 filed.(Personal Service) on Complaint of ANCHOR GENERAL INSURANCE CO

08/20/2020: Proof of Service on the Complaint of ANCHOR GENERAL INSURANCE CO served on ZEV LAWRENCE BRAUN with service date of 08/10/20 filed.(Personal Service) on Complaint of ANCHOR GENERAL INSURANCE CO

Summons Issued on Complaint of ANCHOR GENERAL INSURANCE CO and filed.

07/20/2020: Summons Issued on Complaint of ANCHOR GENERAL INSURANCE CO and filed.

Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92544.

07/20/2020: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92544.

Declaration of Venue filed

07/20/2020: Declaration of Venue filed

System Generated Notice re: Assignment to Department for All Purposes.

07/20/2020: System Generated Notice re: Assignment to Department for All Purposes.

Limited Civil - General Civil Complaint - Over $10K/Under $25K filed. (Southwest)

07/20/2020: Limited Civil - General Civil Complaint - Over $10K/Under $25K filed. (Southwest)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2021
  • HearingType: Order to appear and show cause, if any, why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to file default judgment (CRC 3.110) as to ANCHOR GENERAL INSURANCE CO; Judicial Officer: Assigned Judge; Location/Courtroom: Department S102; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • JudgementStatus: Ordered; Type: Money; Applies to: Complaint of ANCHOR GENERAL INSURANCE CO; For/Against: For - ANCHOR GENERAL INSURANCE CO Against - ZEV LAWRENCE BRAUN; Details; Costs: $474.50; Accrued Interest: $607.70; Damages: $15,404.30; Subtotal Judgment: $16,486.50; Total: $16,486.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Judgment By Default By Court on Complaint of ANCHOR GENERAL INSURANCE CO; Filed By: ANCHOR GENERAL INSURANCE CO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • HearingType: Order to appear and show cause, if any, why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to file default judgment (CRC 3.110) as to ANCHOR GENERAL INSURANCE CO; Judicial Officer: Assigned Judge; Location/Courtroom: Department S102; Disposition: Continued Hearing Not Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • HearingType: Court on its Own Motion; Judicial Officer: Assigned Judge; Location/Courtroom: Department S102; Disposition: Held - Other pre-disposition hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Certificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Continuance of Hearing or Case Management-Stipulation and Order-Service by Posting or Publication; Amount: $20.00; Paid: $20.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 05/05/2021; Fine Description: Check #26550 Receipt No.: 20210505-00036.1; Paid: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketStatus: Receive and Forward; Description: Declaration and Order to continue Order to Show Cause on Complaint of ANCHOR GENERAL INSURANCE CO; Filed By: ANCHOR GENERAL INSURANCE CO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Declaration of Carrier Submitted Pursuant to CCP 585 in Support of Default Judgment; Filed By: ANCHOR GENERAL INSURANCE CO

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request for Entry of Default (CIV-100) on Complaint of ANCHOR GENERAL INSURANCE CO; Filed By: ANCHOR GENERAL INSURANCE CO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on the Complaint of ANCHOR GENERAL INSURANCE CO served on ZEV LAWRENCE BRAUN with service date of 08/10/20 filed.(Personal Service) on Complaint of ANCHOR GENERAL INSURANCE CO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Limited complaint or other first paper amount over $10,000 up to $25,000 (GC70613A); Amount: $395.00; Paid: $395.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 07/21/2020; Fine Description: Check #27749 Receipt No.: CV200721-0006-CK.1; Paid: $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued on Complaint of ANCHOR GENERAL INSURANCE CO and filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Declaration of Venue filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92544.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: Assignment to Department for All Purposes.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Limited Civil - General Civil Complaint - Over $10K/Under $25K filed. (Southwest)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketFilings: Complaint of ANCHOR GENERAL INSURANCE CO; Disposition: Default Judgment by Court 07/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Anchor General Insurance Co. is a litigant