This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/26/2016 at 08:19:09 (UTC).

AMERICAN TECHNOLOGIES INC VS PALMYRITA PROPERTIES

Case Summary

On 11/21/2012 AMERICAN TECHNOLOGIES INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PALMYRITA PROPERTIES. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******7147

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2012

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN TECHNOLOGIES INC

Defendants

SCOTT LEIGH BAUMANN

PALMYTITA PROPERTIES LLC

SIGNATURE INTERIORS INC

ALTA FINISH INC

APEL INTERIORS INC

APEL CONSTRUCTIONMANAGERS INC

FRANK APELDOORN

JOHN W FRENCH

JODY L FRENCH

MARTIN BOIKO

PALMYRITA PROPERTYLLC

ALTA INTERIORS INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CUMMINS & WHITE

2424 S.E. Bristol Suite 300

Newport Beach, CA 92660-0757

Defendant Attorney

HINES CARDER

3090 Bristol St., Ste. 300

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

 

Court Documents

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 11/2

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 11/21/2012 OF AMERICAN TECHNOLOGIES INC BY FRANK APELDOORN REPRESENTED BY HINES CARDER FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

MEMO OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES I

MEMO OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF/TO DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT BY SIGNATURE INTERIORSINC FILED.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY AMERICAN TECHNOLOGIES INC

DECLARATION OF OF CHARLES P MU

DECLARATION OF OF CHARLES P MURAWSKI IN SUPPORT OF MTN TO COMPEL SIGNATURE INTERIORS TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS FILED

SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT

SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MTN TO COMPEL SIG NATURE INTERIORS TO RESPOND TO INTERROGATORIES

DECLARATION OF OF CHARLES P MU

DECLARATION OF OF CHARLES P MURAWSKI IN SUPPORT OF MTN TO COMPEL SIGNATURE INTERORIES TO RESPOND TO INTERROG FILED

SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT

SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MTN TO COMPEL PAL MYRITA

DECLARATION OF OF CHARLES P MU

DECLARATION OF OF CHARLES P MURAWSKI IN SUPPORT OF MTN TO COMPEL FRANK APELDOORN TO RESPOND TO INTERROGATORIES FILED

OPPOSITION TO AMERICAN TECHNOL

OPPOSITION TO AMERICAN TECHNOLOGIES SEPARATE STATEMENT BY PALMYRITA PROPERTYLLC, SIGNATURE INTERIORSINC, FRANK APELDOORN, JOHN W FRENCH, JODY L FRENCH FILED

DECLARATION OF OF MAHAHDI CORZ

DECLARATION OF OF MAHAHDI CORZANO IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MTN TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL FILED

OPPOSITION TO SEPARATE STATEME

OPPOSITION TO SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF ITS MTN BY PALMYRITA PROPERTYLLC, SIGNATURE INTERIORSINC, FRANK APELDOORN, JOHN W FRENCH, JODY L FRENCH FILED

REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION

REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST BY AMERICAN TECHNOLOGIES INC FILED

REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO SIGNATU

REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO SIGNATURE INTERIORS INC TO MOTION TO COMPEL BY AMERICAN TECHNOLOGIES INC FILED

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY A

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY AMERICAN TECHNOLOGIES INC FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 3.725.

DECLARATION OF OF MAHADHI CORZ

DECLARATION OF OF MAHADHI CORZANO IN SUPPORT OF MSJ FILED

PLAINTIFFS SEPARATE STATEMENT

PLAINTIFFS SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS

EX PARTE APPLICATION TO/FOR FO

EX PARTE APPLICATION TO/FOR FOR LEAVE TO FILE LATE OPPOSITON BY PALMYRITA PROPERTYLLC FILED

REPLY TO TO MOTION FOR TERMINA

REPLY TO TO MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS BY AMERICAN TECHNOLOGIES INC FILED

118 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2018
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: DISMISSAL AFTER CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385(C).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2015
  • JURY TRIAL; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2015
  • HEARING RE: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF AMERICAN TECHNOLOGIES INC BY SIGNATURE INTERIORSINC, FRANK APELDOORN, JOHN W FRENCH, JODY L FRENCH; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2015
  • MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2015
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: DISMISSAL AFTER CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385(C) SET 5/15/18 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 10.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE FILED - CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT CRC 3.1385 (05B*RMCCOND) FORM CM-200.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ON THE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF AMERICAN TECHNOLOGIES INC AS TO JODY L FRENCH FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2015
  • JURY TRIAL; Disposition: Continued Not Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2014
  • MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2014
  • HEARING RESERVED FOR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT.; Disposition: Calendared (Reservation Hearings)

    Read MoreRead Less
252 More Docket Entries
  • 01/24/2013
  • CASE RE-ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 10 FOR CASE MANAGEMENT PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 11/21/2012 OF AMERICAN TECHNOLOGIES INC BY PALMYRITA PROPERTYLLC REPRESENTED BY HINES CARDER FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2013
  • NON-PROOF OF SERVICE (NON-APPEARANCE) HEARING; Disposition: OSC SET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 11/21/2012 OF AMERICAN TECHNOLOGIES INC AS TO PALMYRITA PROPERTYLLC; MAILING DATE OF 12/11/12 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED 11/21/2012 OF AMERICAN TECHNOLOGIES INC FILED CHANGING NAME OF PALMYRITA PROPERTIES, LLC TO PALMYRITA PROPERTY LLC; HONORABLE JUDGE DALLAS SCOTT HOLMES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 11/21/2012 OF AMERICAN TECHNOLOGIES INC FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92507.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2012
  • CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 02 FOR LAW AND MOTION PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2012
  • DIRECTLY ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 04. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less