This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/30/2016 at 12:46:58 (UTC).

AMERICAN RESIDENTIAL VS ARNOLD

Case Summary

On 06/04/2014 AMERICAN RESIDENTIAL filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ARNOLD. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Temecula Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1238

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN RESIDENTIAL PROPERTIES, LLC

Defendant

RONNA ARNOLD

Other

ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

H.G. LONG & ASSOCIATES

474 W Orange Show Rd

San Bernardino, CA 92408

 

Court Documents

FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT O

FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT OF POSSESSION AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY; UNSATISFIED FILED.

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSU

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY AMERICAN RESIDENTIAL PROPERTIES, LLC.

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK -

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK - POSSESSION ONLY FILED 06/25/14

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE O

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/04/2014 OF AMERICAN RESIDENTIAL PROPERTIES, LLC AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO RONNA ARNOLD; AND MAILED ON 06/06/14 FILED.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT A

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/04/2014 OF AMERICAN RESIDENTIAL PROPERTIES, LLC AS TO RONNA ARNOLD, ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR R

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE O

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/04/2014 OF AMERICAN RESIDENTIAL PROPERTIES, LLC AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS, WITH POSTING AND MAILING DATE OF 06/06/14 FILED(ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS)

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER

SUMMONS FILED.

SUMMONS FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92592.

LIMITED CIVIL UNLAWFUL DETAINE

LIMITED CIVIL UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2014
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL ENTIRE CASE - TEMECULA; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT OF POSSESSION AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY; UNSATISFIED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY AMERICAN RESIDENTIAL PROPERTIES, LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2014
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR RIVERSIDE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK - POSSESSION ONLY FILED 06/25/14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/04/2014 OF AMERICAN RESIDENTIAL PROPERTIES, LLC AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO RONNA ARNOLD; AND MAILED ON 06/06/14 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/04/2014 OF AMERICAN RESIDENTIAL PROPERTIES, LLC AS TO RONNA ARNOLD, ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/04/2014 OF AMERICAN RESIDENTIAL PROPERTIES, LLC AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS, WITH POSTING AND MAILING DATE OF 06/06/14 FILED(ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92592.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2014
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • LIMITED CIVIL UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2014
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT T1 (UNLAWFUL DETAINER (TEMECULA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2014
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE SET 8/08/14 AT 8:00 IN DEPT. T1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2014
  • PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION ATTACHED TO THE COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN RESIDENTIAL PROPERTIES LLC is a litigant