Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 01/04/2018 at 23:01:33 (UTC).

AMERICAN RECOVERY SERVICE INC VS MILLER

Case Summary

On 03/21/2017 AMERICAN RECOVERY SERVICE INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MILLER. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5344

  • Filing Date:

    03/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN RECOVERY SERVICE INCORPORATED

Defendant

JIMMY MILLER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF ALAN D WILNER

847 N Hollywood Way #201

Burbank, CA 91505

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE FILED - CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT CRC 3.1385 (05A*RMCCOND) FORM CM-200.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92562.

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - RIVERSIDE) FILED 03/21/2017 OF AMERICAN RECOVERY SERVICE INCORPORATED AS TO JIMMY MILLER; MAILING DATE OF 05/06/17 FILED.

LIMITED CIVIL-GENERAL CIVIL CO

LIMITED CIVIL-GENERAL CIVIL COMPLAINT FOR COLLECTIONS OVER $10K/UNDER $25K CRC 3.740 FILED. (RIVERSIDE)

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (C

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - RIVERSIDE) FILED 03/21/2017 OF AMERICAN RECOVERY SERVICE INCORPORATED AND FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2018
  • HEARING RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE ISSUED AGAINST PLAINTIFF FOR FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740 (RIVERSIDE); Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: DISMISSAL AFTER CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385(C).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: DISMISSAL AFTER CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385(C) SET 1/29/18 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 11.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE FILED - CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT CRC 3.1385 (05A*RMCCOND) FORM CM-200.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - RIVERSIDE) FILED 03/21/2017 OF AMERICAN RECOVERY SERVICE INCORPORATED AS TO JIMMY MILLER; MAILING DATE OF 05/06/17 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED (COLLECTION) (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET 4/26/18 AT 8:30 IN DEPARTMENT 11.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - RIVERSIDE) FILED 03/21/2017 OF AMERICAN RECOVERY SERVICE INCORPORATED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • DIRECTLY ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 11 FOR CASE MANAGEMENT PURPOSES (COLLECTION).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92562.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • LIMITED CIVIL-GENERAL CIVIL COMPLAINT FOR COLLECTIONS OVER $10K/UNDER $25K CRC 3.740 FILED. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less