This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 01/06/2023 at 11:52:27 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS VS YOUNGHORSE

Case Summary

On 10/13/2020 AMERICAN EXPRESS filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against YOUNGHORSE. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Murrieta Southwest Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4818

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

Defendants

GEORGE YOUNGHORSE

GEROGE M YOUNGHORSE

GEORGE P MAGANA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHAEL & ASSOCIATES

Attorney at MICHAEL & ASSOCIATES

555 St. Charles Drive Suite 204

Thousand Oaks, CA 91360

Defendant Attorney

Joseph Arthur Weber

 

Court Documents

Limited Civil-General Civil Complaint for Collections Over $10K/Under $25K CRC 3.740 filed. (Southwest)

10/13/2020: Limited Civil-General Civil Complaint for Collections Over $10K/Under $25K CRC 3.740 filed. (Southwest)

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

10/13/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Summons Issued on Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK and filed.

10/13/2020: Summons Issued on Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK and filed.

System Generated Notice re: Department Assignment.

10/13/2020: System Generated Notice re: Department Assignment.

System Generated Notice re: Order to Show Cause.

10/13/2020: System Generated Notice re: Order to Show Cause.

Proof of Service (Sub-Served and Mailed) on Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK as to GEORGE YOUNGHORSE; mailing date of 10/21/20 filed.

10/26/2020: Proof of Service (Sub-Served and Mailed) on Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK as to GEORGE YOUNGHORSE; mailing date of 10/21/20 filed.

Defendant's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint on Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

11/17/2020: Defendant's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint on Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference and Court Trial - Collections on Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

12/24/2020: Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference and Court Trial - Collections on Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference and Trial

04/09/2021: Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference and Trial

Request for Dismissal

05/26/2021: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing re: Order to Show Cause why sanctions should not be issued against Plaintiff for Failure to file Default Judgment pursuant to CRC 3.740 (Southwest); Location/Courtroom: Department S102; Disposition: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • HearingType: Court Trial - Short Cause; Judicial Officer: Assigned Judge; Location/Courtroom: Department S102; Disposition: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • HearingType: Mandatory Settlement Conference Collections; Judicial Officer: Assigned Judge; Location/Courtroom: Department S102; Disposition: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request for Dismissal; Filed By: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference and Trial; Filed By: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Limited response: answer or other first paper filed by each party other than plaintiff amount over $10,000 up to $25,000 including unlawful detainer (GC70614A); Amount: $395.00; Paid: $395.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 12/24/2020; Fine Description: eSubmit *4359 Receipt No.: 20201224-00099.1; Paid: $395.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference and Court Trial - Collections on Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Defendant's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint on Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK; Filed By: GEORGE YOUNGHORSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service (Sub-Served and Mailed) on Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK as to GEORGE YOUNGHORSE; mailing date of 10/21/20 filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Limited complaint or other first paper amount over $10,000 up to $25,000 (GC70613A); Amount: $395.00; Paid: $395.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 10/13/2020; Fine Description: Check Bank Adjustment #1004 Receipt No.: CV201013-0272-FE.1; Paid: $395.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: Order to Show Cause.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: Department Assignment.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued on Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK and filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Limited Civil-General Civil Complaint for Collections Over $10K/Under $25K CRC 3.740 filed. (Southwest)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketFilings: Complaint (Collection - Southwest) of AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK; Disposition: Dismissal No ADR 05/26/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK is a litigant