This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 06/11/2018 at 15:05:03 (UTC).

AMERICAN CREDIT V VASQUEZ

Case Summary

On 02/22/2002 AMERICAN CREDIT filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against VASQUEZ. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Corona Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****6699

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2002

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN CREDIT AGENCIES,INC

Defendant

TITO VASQUEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF FRANKLIN J LOVE

800 S. Barranca Ave #100

Covina, CA 91723

 

Court Documents

LIMITED CIVIL - GENERAL CIVIL

LIMITED CIVIL - GENERAL CIVIL COMPLAINT UNDER $10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED.

CERTIFIED COPY(S) MADE.

CERTIFIED COPY(S) MADE.

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 02/22/2002 OF AMERICAN CREDIT AGENCIES,INC AS TO TITO VASQUEZ; MAILING DATE OF 03/28/02 FILED.

ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 02/22/2002 OF AMERICAN CREDIT AGENCIES,INC RETURNED AND FILED.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT A

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 02/22/2002 OF AMERICAN CREDIT AGENCIES,INC AS TO TITO VASQUEZ FILED.

COMPUTATION OF INTEREST FILED

COMPUTATION OF INTEREST FILED

DECLARATION RE COSTS PURSUANT

DECLARATION RE COSTS PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1033 FILED BY AMERICAN CREDIT AGENCIES,INC

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/ROES ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 02/22/2002 OF AMERICAN CREDIT AGENCIES,INC FILED.

DECLARATION OF RE ENTRY OF JUD

DECLARATION OF RE ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK F

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK FILED 07/11/02

DECLARATION AND ORDER FOR IN S

DECLARATION AND ORDER FOR IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY FEES PER 1717.5 CCP BY AMERICAN CREDIT AGENCIES,INC FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE GARY B TRANBARGER.

MEMO OF CREDITS OF $$0.00, ACC

MEMO OF CREDITS OF $$0.00, ACCRUED INTEREST OF $$205.26 AND COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT IN THE SUM OF $$0.00 FILED.

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED; OR

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED; ORA COUNTY

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FO

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FOR COUNSEL REPRESENTING AMERICAN CREDIT AGENCIES,INC. ADDRESS CHANGED FOR LAW OFFICES OF FRANKLIN J LOVE FILED.

MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $0.00

MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $0.00.

MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $0.00

MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS OF $0.00.

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED AS

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED AS TO ORA COUNTY; UNSATISFIED FILED.

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED AS

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED AS TO LA COUNTY; UNSATISFIED FILED.

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED; ORANGE COUNTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED AS TO ORA COUNTY; UNSATISFIED FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2009
  • DocketHEARING RE: CLAIM OF EXEMPTION.; Disposition: GRANTED IN PART

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED BY TITO VASQUEZ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOPY OF THE NT OF OPPOSITION TO CLAIM OF EXEMPTION RECEIVED FROM THE ORANGE SHERIFF'S OFFICE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOPY OF THE NT OF HEARING ON CLAIM OF EXEMPTION RECEIVED FROM THE ORANGE SHERIFF'S OFFICE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2009
  • DocketHEARING ON CLAIM OF EXEMPTION SET 8/27/09 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 07

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2009
  • DocketNOTICE OF OPPOSITION TO CLAIM OF EXEMPTION BY AMERICAN CREDIT AGENCIES,INC FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING ON CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2009
  • DocketREJECTED DOCUMENT: NOTICE OF OPPOSITION TO CLAIM OF EXEMPTION SUBMITTED BY AMERICAN CREDIT AGENCIES,INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 05/24/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION RE COSTS PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1033 FILED BY AMERICAN CREDIT AGENCIES,INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPUTATION OF INTEREST FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 02/22/2002 OF AMERICAN CREDIT AGENCIES,INC AS TO TITO VASQUEZ FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 02/22/2002 OF AMERICAN CREDIT AGENCIES,INC RETURNED AND FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2002
  • DocketNON-PROOF OF SERVICE (NON-APPEARANCE) HEARING; Disposition: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 02/22/2002 OF AMERICAN CREDIT AGENCIES,INC AS TO TITO VASQUEZ; MAILING DATE OF 03/28/02 FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY(S) MADE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2002
  • DocketNON PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 5/06/02 AT 8:00 IN DEPT CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2002
  • DocketDIRECTLY ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 07 FOR ALL PURPOSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIMITED CIVIL - GENERAL CIVIL COMPLAINT UNDER $10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American Credit Agencies, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LOVE, FRANKLIN J