This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 04/25/2018 at 05:47:05 (UTC).

AMAYA SR VS DART CONTAINER CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 10/23/2017 AMAYA SR filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against DART CONTAINER CORPORATION. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0311

  • Filing Date:

    10/23/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROBERTO AMAYA SR

Defendant

DART CONTAINER CORPORATION OF CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RAWA LAW GROUP

5843 Pine Avenue #A

Chino Hills, CA 91709

Defendant Attorney

BEST, BEST, & KRIEGER, LLP

3390 University Ave., 5Th Fl. P.O. Box 1028

Riverside, CA 92502-1028

 

Court Documents

PLTFS NOTICE OF PAYMENT OF ADV

PLTFS NOTICE OF PAYMENT OF ADVANCE JURY FEES FILED

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY ROBERTO AMAYA SR

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DART CONTAINER CORPORATION OF CALIFORNIA

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY DART CONTAINER CORPORATION OF CALIFORNIA.

MINUTE ORDER: VACATING 04/25/1

MINUTE ORDER: VACATING 04/25/18 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF DEPARTMENT RE-ASSIGN

NOTICE OF DEPARTMENT RE-ASSIGNMENT FOR LAW AND MOTION PURPOSES

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 10/2

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 10/23/2017 OF ROBERTO AMAYA SR BY DART CONTAINER CORPORATION OF CALIFORNIA REPRESENTED BY BEST, BEST, & KRIEGER, LLP FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (R

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (RIVERSIDE)

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92880.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FI

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 10/23/2017 OF ROBERTO AMAYA SR AND FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 10/23/2017 OF ROBERTO AMAYA SR SERVED ON DART CONTAINER CORPORATION OF CALIFORNIA WITH SERVICE DATE OF 11/01/17 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTE ORDER: VACATING 04/25/18 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY DART CONTAINER CORPORATION OF CALIFORNIA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • JURY FEE DEPOSIT OF $150.00 PAID BY DART CONTAINER CORPORATION OF CALIFORNIA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DART CONTAINER CORPORATION OF CALIFORNIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • FAX FILING BY ROBERTO AMAYA SR ($2.00 PER PAGE).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY ROBERTO AMAYA SR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • JURY FEE DEPOSIT OF $150.00 PAID BY ROBERTO AMAYA SR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PLTFS NOTICE OF PAYMENT OF ADVANCE JURY FEES FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF DEPARTMENT RE-ASSIGNMENT FOR LAW AND MOTION PURPOSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • CASE REASSIGNED TO HONORABLE JUDGE RANDALL S STAMEN IN DEPARTMENT 07 FOR LAW AND MOTION PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 10/23/2017 OF ROBERTO AMAYA SR BY DART CONTAINER CORPORATION OF CALIFORNIA REPRESENTED BY BEST, BEST, & KRIEGER, LLP FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • FAX FILING BY ROBERTO AMAYA SR ($2.00 PER PAGE).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 10/23/2017 OF ROBERTO AMAYA SR SERVED ON DART CONTAINER CORPORATION OF CALIFORNIA WITH SERVICE DATE OF 11/01/17 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 10/23/2017 OF ROBERTO AMAYA SR AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • NON-PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 1/03/18 AT 8:30 IN DEPT CLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92880.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 07. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less