Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/24/2021 at 05:49:14 (UTC).

AMASS vs PULTE HOME COMPANY LLC

Case Summary

On 09/22/2020 AMASS filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against PULTE HOME COMPANY LLC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Sunshine Sykes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3762

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Sunshine Sykes

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DEBBIE BOWEN

MARCIA J. MEAKIM

LAYTON BLAIR GIEM

IAN A. GUNN

WILLIAM J. MEAKIM

TERRI GINSBERG

STACEY AMASS

CONSTANCE D. MELVIN

KAY L. BAIRD

KAREN BILUSACK-GIEM

IRVING H. TOLBERT & LAVERNE A.TOLBERT

PATRICIA GUNN

Defendant

PULTE HOME COMPANYLLC

Cross Defendants

XCEL BUILDING GROUP, INC.

THE BIG COMPANY, INC.

RSI HOLDING

QUAD COUNTY WINDOW & DOOR, INC.

PSLQ, INC.

RANDY JEMIOLA

T&R CONSTRUCTION GROUP

23 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHINNICK & RYAN LLP

Attorney at SHINNICK & RYAN LLP

1650 Hotel Circle North Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92108

Cross Defendant Attorneys

Matthew J Liedle

Julie Diane McElroy

Other Attorneys

Edward Walter Schmitt

Brendon Thomas Dalrymple

Letofsky McClain

Eric John Larson

Kimberly Ann Blake

 

Court Documents

Substitution of Attorney

05/14/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Notice of Document Return.

06/18/2021: Notice of Document Return.

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

04/14/2021: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

04/14/2021: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

Proof of Service on Cross-Complaint of PULTE HOME COMPANY LLC

03/09/2021: Proof of Service on Cross-Complaint of PULTE HOME COMPANY LLC

Answer of Cross-Defendant, GW SURFACES to Cross-Complaint of Pulte Home Company LLC on Cross-Complaint of PULTE HOME COMPANY LLC

03/08/2021: Answer of Cross-Defendant, GW SURFACES to Cross-Complaint of Pulte Home Company LLC on Cross-Complaint of PULTE HOME COMPANY LLC

Answer to Complaint on Cross-Complaint of PULTE HOME COMPANY LLC

03/03/2021: Answer to Complaint on Cross-Complaint of PULTE HOME COMPANY LLC

Answer to Complaint on Cross-Complaint of PULTE HOME COMPANY LLC

03/02/2021: Answer to Complaint on Cross-Complaint of PULTE HOME COMPANY LLC

Notice of Document Return.

03/01/2021: Notice of Document Return.

Notice of Document Return.

02/09/2021: Notice of Document Return.

Notice of Document Return.

02/08/2021: Notice of Document Return.

Milgard Manufacturing, Inc's Notice of Posting Jury Fees and Request for Jury Trial on Cross-Complaint of PULTE HOME COMPANY LLC

01/26/2021: Milgard Manufacturing, Inc's Notice of Posting Jury Fees and Request for Jury Trial on Cross-Complaint of PULTE HOME COMPANY LLC

Request for Dismissal

12/18/2020: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Status Conference Hearing

11/23/2020: Notice of Status Conference Hearing

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File

11/23/2020: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File

49 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing re: OSC re Dismissal of Any Party Not-Issue; Judicial Officer: Sunshine Sykes; Location/Courtroom: Department 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • HearingType: Status Conference Hearing; Judicial Officer: Sunshine Sykes; Location/Courtroom: Department 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Return.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Association of Counsel on Cross-Complaint of PULTE HOME COMPANY LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • HearingType: Order to Show Cause as to why sanctions not to exceed $1,500.00 or dismissal should not be imposed for Failure to File Proof of Service as to Brendon Thomas Dalrymple, MILGARD MANUFACTURING, LLC; Judicial Officer: Sunshine Sykes; Location/Courtroom: Department 6; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • HearingType: Court on its Own Motion; Judicial Officer: Sunshine Sykes; Location/Courtroom: Department 6; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Return.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Declaration of Brendon T Dalrymple in response to OSC re sanctions for failure to serve cross-complaint of Milgard Manufacturing LLC; Filed By: MILGARD MANUFACTURING, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Substitution of Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
147 More Docket Entries
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketFilings: Cross-Complaint of PULTE HOME COMPANY LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on the Complaint of AMASS served on PULTE HOME COMPANY LLC with service date of 10/13/20 filed.(Personal Service) on Complaint of STACEY AMASS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Additional fee for case designated as complex - Plaintiff (GC70616A); Amount: $1,000.00; Paid: $1,000.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 09/25/2020; Fine Description: Check Bank Adjustment #3511 Receipt No.: CV200925-0016-FE.1; Paid: $1,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 09/25/2020; Fine Description: Check Bank Adjustment #3511 Receipt No.: CV200925-0008-FE.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: Notice of assignment to department and case management conference (CRC 3.722).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92203.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued on Complaint of AMASS and filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint Filed - Complex Case. (Riverside)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketFilings: Complaint of STACEY AMASS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where T&R CONSTRUCTION GROUP INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where RSI Holding LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where PSLQ INC is a litigant

Latest cases where QUAD COUNTY WINDOW AND DOOR INC is a litigant