Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/28/2016 at 12:55:46 (UTC).

AMALGAMATED TRANSIT UNION, LOCAL 1277 VS PARKING C

Case Summary

On 04/28/2004 AMALGAMATED TRANSIT UNION, LOCAL 1277 filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against PARKING C. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2020

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2004

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CHERIE MARTIN

AFL-CIO

AMALGAMATED TRANSIT UNION, LOCAL 1277,

LISA SAMIS

MICHAEL CHRISTENSEN

DONALD SNYDER

Defendants

TRANSPORTATION CONCEPTS

PARKING CONCEPTS,INC.

LAIDLAW

PARKING CONCEPTS, INC

RIVERSIDE TRANSIT AGENCY

LAIDLAW TRANSIT SERVICES, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

NEYHART ANDERSON FLYNN & GROSBOLL

44 Montgomery Street Suite 2080

San Francisco, CA 94104

NEYHART, ANDERSON,FREITAS, FLYNN & GROSBOL

44 Montgomery Street Suite 2080

San Francisco, CA 94104

Defendant Attorneys

HOFFMAN, SAMANTHA

5000 Birch St Suite 4800

New Port Beach, CA 92660

JACKSON LEWIS PC

5000 Birch St Suite 5000

Newport Beach, CA 92660

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF AMALGAMATED TRANSITUNION, LOCAL 1277, AS TO PARKING CONCEPTS,INC.; MAILING DATE OF 06/18/04 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF AMALGAMATED TRANSITUNION, LOCAL 1277, AS TO PARKING CONCEPTS, INC; MAILING DATE OF 06/18/04 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF AMALGAMATED TRANSITUNION, LOCAL 1277, AS TO TRANSPORTATION CONCEPTS; MAILING DATE OF 06/18/04 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AN

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT RE: LAIDLAW TRANSIT FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AN

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT RE: PARKING CONCEPTS, INC. FILED.

AMENDED DECL OF SCOTT DE NARDO

AMENDED DECL OF SCOTT DE NARDO IN SUPPORT OF MTN FOR LEAVE FILED BY AMALGAMATED TRANSITUNION, LOCAL 1277,

2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT OF AMALG

2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT OF AMALGAMATED TRANSITUNION, LOCAL 1277, FILED. (AMENDED COMPLAINT - SUPERIOR COURT)

DOCUMENTS FILED WITH SAN DIEGO

DOCUMENTS FILED WITH SAN DIEGO COURT - PROOF OF SE RVICE OF MOTION AND SUPPORTING DOUCMENTS

DOCUMENT FILED WITH SAN DIEGO

DOCUMENT FILED WITH SAN DIEGO COURT - DECLARATION OF SCOTT M DE NARDO IN SUPPORT OF MOTION

DOCUMENTS FILED WITH SAN DIEGO

DOCUMENTS FILED WITH SAN DIEGO COURT - PROPOSED OR DER FOR MOTION FOR TRANSFER/COORIDINATION

DOCUMENT FILED IN SAN DIEGO CO

DOCUMENT FILED IN SAN DIEGO COUNTY- SECOND AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION FOR TRANSFER

DOCUMENT FILED IN SAN DIEGO CO

DOCUMENT FILED IN SAN DIEGO COUNTY - SECOND SUPPLE MENTAL NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR STAY

STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR STAYING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS IN THIS ACTION IS GRA; HONORABLE JUDGE ROGER A LUEBS.

NOTICE OF HEARING PETITION FOR

NOTICE OF HEARING PETITION FOR COORDINATION TO BE HEARD IN SAN DIEGO COUNTY JCCP4426

STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR FILE

STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR FILE 4TH AMENDED COMPLAINT/STAY ENTIRE ACTION IS GRA; HONORABLE COMMISSIONER JOAN F BURGESS.

OPPOSITION TO PETITION FOR COO

OPPOSITION TO PETITION FOR COORDINATION BY PARKING CONCEPTS,INC. FILED

ORDER FOR COORIDNATION - JCCP4

ORDER FOR COORIDNATION - JCCP4531 LOS ANGELES COUNTY

NOTICE OF INTIAL STATUS CONFER

NOTICE OF INTIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER BY AMALGAMATED TRANSITUNION, LOCAL 1277, FILED.

83 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2015
  • RETURN MAIL RECEIVED FOR NOTI OF RE-ASSIGN TO DEPT AS TO RETURN TO SENDER; REASON RETURNED: ATTEMP NOT KNOWN UNABLE TO FORWARD LISA SAMIS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2015
  • RETURN MAIL RECEIVED FOR NOTI OF RE-ASSIGN TO DEPT AS TO RETURN TO SENDER; REASON RETURNED: ATTEMP NOT KNOWN UNABLE TO FORWARD AFL-CIO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE REASSIGNED TO JUDGE SHARON J. WATERS IN DEPARTMENT 10 FOR ALL FUTURE PROCEEDINGS. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2010
  • STATUS HEARING/CASE PENDING RE: PETITION FOR COORDINATION JCCP4531; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CONTINUED STAY AND VACATING OF FUTURE HEARING DATES BY PARKING CONCEPTS,INC., PARKING CONCEPTS, INC FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ORDER GRANTING PETITION FOR COORDINATION AND REQUEST TO VACATE HRG DATES BY PARKING CONCEPTS,INC., PARKING CONCEPTS, INC FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2009
  • STATUS HEARING/CASE PENDING PETITION FOR COORDINATION JCCP4531 SET 02/11/09, @ 08:30 IN DEPT. 02; Disposition: Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2009
  • STATUS HEARING/CASE PENDING PETITION FOR COORDINATION JCCP4531 SET 02/11/09, @ 08:30 IN DEPT. 02; Disposition: Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF INTIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER BY AMALGAMATED TRANSITUNION, LOCAL 1277, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2008
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
152 More Docket Entries
  • 06/28/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF AMALGAMATED TRANSITUNION, LOCAL 1277, AS TO PARKING CONCEPTS, INC; MAILING DATE OF 06/18/04 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF AMALGAMATED TRANSITUNION, LOCAL 1277, AS TO PARKING CONCEPTS,INC.; MAILING DATE OF 06/18/04 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF AMALGAMATED TRANSITUNION, LOCAL 1277, RETURNED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2004
  • NON PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET ON 7/15/04 @ 8:00 IN DEPARTMENT CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF AMALGAMATED TRANSITUNION, LOCAL 1277, FILED. (AMENDED COMPLAINT - SUPERIOR COURT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2004
  • COPIES MADE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2004
  • DIRECTLY ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 06 FOR ALL PURPOSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2004
  • NON PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 7/29/04 AT 8:00 IN DEPT CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Laidlaw & Company (UK) LTD is a litigant

Latest cases where TRANSPORTATION CONCEPTS is a litigant

Latest cases where PARKING CONCEPTS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where AFL-CIO is a litigant