This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 06/11/2018 at 23:24:10 (UTC).

ALPINE SECURITY INC VS PORTER

Case Summary

On 11/27/2002 ALPINE SECURITY INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PORTER. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Temecula Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8232

  • Filing Date:

    11/27/2002

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALPINE SECRUITY INC

Defendant

DENISE PORTER

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE-SMALL CLAIMS

PROOF OF SERVICE-SMALL CLAIMS ON THE PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - TEMECULA FILED 11/27/2002 OF ALPINE SECRUITY INC SERVED ON DENISE PORTER WITH SERVICE DATE OF 12/29/02 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE) SERVICE FEE OF $65.00.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - TEMECULA FILED 11/27/2002 OF ALPINE SECRUITY INC FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE PLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - TEMECULA FILED 11/27/2002 OF ALPINE SECRUITY INC SERVED ON DENISE PORTER WITH SERVICE DATE OF 12/29/02 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED.

PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2003
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS HEARING - TEMECULA; Disposition: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE-SMALL CLAIMS ON THE PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - TEMECULA FILED 11/27/2002 OF ALPINE SECRUITY INC SERVED ON DENISE PORTER WITH SERVICE DATE OF 12/29/02 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE) SERVICE FEE OF $65.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - TEMECULA FILED 11/27/2002 OF ALPINE SECRUITY INC FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE ON THE PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - TEMECULA FILED 11/27/2002 OF ALPINE SECRUITY INC SERVED ON DENISE PORTER WITH SERVICE DATE OF 12/29/02 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2002
  • DocketDECLARATION OF NON MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2002
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS HEARING TEMECULA SET 1/29/03 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. T1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALPINE SECURITIES CORP. is a litigant